Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2022-053785 | Judge: | Gordon, Michael |
File Date: | 11/29/2022 | Location: | Northeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Josh Barnett | Plaintiff | Male | Pro Per |
Katie Hobbs | Defendant | Female | David Gaona |
Jack Sellers | Defendant | Male | Karen Hartman-Tellez |
Thomas Galvin | Defendant | Male | Karen Hartman-Tellez |
Bill Gates | Defendant | Male | Karen Hartman-Tellez |
Clint Hickman | Defendant | Male | Karen Hartman-Tellez |
Steve Gallardo | Defendant | Male | Karen Hartman-Tellez |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/5/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
12/6/2022 | RNM - Returned Mail | 12/6/2022 | |
NOTE: | |||
12/6/2022 | RNM - Returned Mail | 12/6/2022 | |
NOTE: | |||
12/5/2022 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 12/5/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/5/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | MEM - Memorandum | 12/5/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM | |||
12/5/2022 | MEM - Memorandum | 12/5/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM | |||
12/4/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/5/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: EMERGENCY MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE DISMISSAL FOR FRAUD ON THE COURT AS PER RULE 60(D)(3) OR TO REVERSE THE ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR MISREPRESENTATION OR FRAUD OR JUDICIAL MISTAKE AS PER 60(B); AND A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; AND AN EMERGENCY STAY | |||
12/2/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/2/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
12/2/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/2/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Notice of Appearance | |||
12/2/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/2/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Brief re: Timelines | |||
12/2/2022 | NOT - Notice | 12/2/2022 | |
NOTE: Defendant Secretary of State Katie Hobb's Brief Regarding Prematurity of Plaintiff's Action | |||
12/2/2022 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full | 12/2/2022 | |
12/2/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: CLINT HICKMAN | |||
12/2/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: KATIE HOBBS | |||
12/2/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: JACK SELLERS | |||
12/2/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: THOMAS GALVIN | |||
12/2/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: BILL GATES | |||
12/2/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: STEVE GALLARDO | |||
12/2/2022 | EMF - Email Filed | 12/5/2022 | |
12/2/2022 | ORD - Order | 12/5/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO APPEAR | |||
11/29/2022 | COM - Complaint | 11/30/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT | |||
11/29/2022 | APL - Application | 11/30/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: TRO | |||
11/29/2022 | CSH - Coversheet | 11/30/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
11/29/2022 | SUM - Summons | 11/30/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: Summons | |||
11/29/2022 | SUM - Summons | 11/30/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: Summons | |||
11/29/2022 | SUM - Summons | 11/30/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: Summons | |||
11/29/2022 | SUM - Summons | 11/30/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: Summons | |||
11/29/2022 | SUM - Summons | 11/30/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: Summons | |||
11/29/2022 | SUM - Summons | 11/30/2022 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: Summons |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
12/2/2022 | 11:30 | Order To Show Cause |
12/2/2022 | 16:00 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |