« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2022-052156
Judge:
Julian, Melissa
File Date:
7/9/2022
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
James Felix
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brian Weinberger
Party Name
Kimberly Felix
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Brian Weinberger
Party Name
Jason Valasek
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Cloud L G S Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2024
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
8/26/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2024
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Entry of Default
Filing Date
1/26/2024
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
1/30/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS DEFENDANT JASON VALASEK
Filing Date
1/8/2024
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
1/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2023
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
6/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
5/24/2023
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
5/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS Motion to Amend Scheduling Order
Filing Date
5/3/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S INITIAL RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
5/2/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
Defendants' Initial RULE 26.1 Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2023
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
2/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
2/17/2023
Description
LRM-Letter of Remand from Federal District Court
Docket Date
2/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: REMAND TO MARICOPA COUNTY SUPERIR COURT
Filing Date
2/14/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/15/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Filing Date
1/19/2023
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report
Filing Date
10/17/2022
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
10/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
9/29/2022
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
10/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer / EFILE BILLING $245.00
Filing Date
9/6/2022
Description
NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court
Docket Date
9/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JASON VALASEK
Filing Date
8/8/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLOUD LGS INC
Filing Date
7/9/2022
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
7/9/2022
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
7/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
7/9/2022
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
7/9/2022
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
7/9/2022
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/9/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/5/2024
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.