Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2022-016564 | Judge: | McCoy, M. Scott |
File Date: | 12/15/2022 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Center For Arizona Policy Inc | Plaintiff | Scott Freeman | |
Arizona Free Enterprise Club | Plaintiff | Scott Freeman | |
Arizona Secretary Of State | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Katie Hobbs | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Arizona Citizens Clean Elections Commission | Defendant | JAMES SMITH | |
Damien R Meyer | Defendant | Male | JAMES SMITH |
Amy B Chan | Defendant | Female | JAMES SMITH |
Galen D Paton | Defendant | Male | JAMES SMITH |
Mark Kimble | Defendant | Male | JAMES SMITH |
Steve M Titla | Defendant | Male | JAMES SMITH |
Thomas M Collins | Defendant | Male | JAMES SMITH |
Voters Right To Know | Intervenor | Chanele Reyes | |
Adrian Fontes | Defendant | Male | Jake Rapp |
Kristin K Mayes | Intervenor | Female | Alexander Samuels |
Arizona Attorney General | Intervenor | Shannon Mataele | |
Ben Toma | Plaintiff | Male | Brett Johnson |
Warren Petersen | Plaintiff | Male | Brett Johnson |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/13/2023 | NOT - Notice | 9/19/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions to Dismiss | |||
9/8/2023 | 088 - ME: Case Transferred | 9/8/2023 | |
9/8/2023 | ORD - Order | 9/8/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER RELATED CASE (CV2023-011834) | |||
9/6/2023 | REL - Reply | 9/11/2023 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Related Case | |||
9/5/2023 | NOT - Notice | 9/8/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS SPEAKER TOMA AND PRESIDENT PETERSEN’S NOTICE REGARDING AUGUST 31, 2023 MINUTE ENTRY AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING ON DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO TRANSFER | |||
8/31/2023 | NOT - Notice | 9/5/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS CENTER FOR ARIZONA POLICY, INC., ARIZONA FREE ENTERPRISE CLUB, AND DOES I AND II’S JOINDER IN SPEAKER TOMA AND PRESIDENT PETERSEN’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO TRANSFER RELATED CASE | |||
8/31/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/31/2023 | |
8/30/2023 | REL - Reply | 9/1/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER RELATED CASE | |||
8/29/2023 | RES - Response | 8/31/2023 | |
NOTE: TOMA AND PETERSEN'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER RELATED CASE | |||
8/25/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 8/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Intervenor Voters' Right to Know's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint | |||
8/25/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 8/28/2023 | |
NOTE: CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISSION’S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE | |||
8/25/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 8/28/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE’S JOINDER IN ARIZONA CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISSION’S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
8/25/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 8/29/2023 | |
NOTE: Attorney General's Motion to Dismiss Amended Verified Complaint | |||
8/23/2023 | MTT - Motion To Transfer | 8/23/2023 | |
NOTE: Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Related Case | |||
8/23/2023 | MTT - Motion To Transfer | 8/23/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ARIZONA CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISSION’S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT FONTES’S MOTION TO TRANSFER | |||
8/22/2023 | MTT - Motion To Transfer | 8/23/2023 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Transfer Related Case (CV2023-011834) | |||
8/3/2023 | ORD - Order | 8/3/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
8/3/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 8/7/2023 | |
NOTE: UNREDACTED DECLARATIONS AS EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT | |||
8/3/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 8/7/2023 | |
NOTE: UNREDACTED DECLARATIONS | |||
8/1/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/10/2023 | |
8/1/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/1/2023 | |
8/1/2023 | ORD - Order | 8/1/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
7/28/2023 | STP - Stipulation | 7/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Responses to Amended Complaint | |||
7/27/2023 | MOT - Motion | 7/27/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS DOE I AND DOE II’S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
7/27/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 7/28/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
7/21/2023 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 7/22/2023 | |
NOTE: Amended Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief | |||
7/11/2023 | ORD - Order | 7/11/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
7/5/2023 | STP - Stipulation | 7/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Amended Complaint | |||
6/23/2023 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel | 6/23/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Firm | |||
6/22/2023 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 6/22/2023 | |
5/16/2023 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 5/16/2023 | |
5/11/2023 | ORD - Order | 5/11/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
4/24/2023 | ORD - Order | 4/24/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY GENERAL’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEFS | |||
4/24/2023 | MOT - Motion | 4/24/2023 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISSION’S JOINDER | |||
4/21/2023 | REL - Reply | 4/21/2023 | |
NOTE: INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT VOTERS’ RIGHT TO KNOW’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/21/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
4/21/2023 | REL - Reply | 4/22/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ARIZONA CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISSION’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/21/2023 | REL - Reply | 4/22/2023 | |
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/21/2023 | REL - Reply | 4/22/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES’ JOINDER IN COMMISSION DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
4/11/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/11/2023 | |
4/11/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/11/2023 | |
4/3/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance for Intervenor Arizona Attorney General | |||
3/31/2023 | REL - Reply | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction | |||
3/31/2023 | MOT - Motion | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit | |||
3/31/2023 | RES - Response | 4/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Motions to Dismiss | |||
3/29/2023 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/29/2023 | |
3/29/2023 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 3/29/2023 | |
3/29/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 3/29/2023 | |
3/28/2023 | ORD - Order | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES | |||
3/28/2023 | ORD - Order | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
3/28/2023 | ORD - Order | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES | |||
3/28/2023 | ORD - Order | 3/28/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE DEADLINES | |||
3/28/2023 | ORD - Order | 4/3/2023 | |
NOTE: RE MOTION TO INTERVENE AND MOTION TO WAIVE RULE 24 | |||
3/20/2023 | STP - Stipulation | 3/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Amend Briefing Schedule (Second Request) | |||
3/15/2023 | MOT - Motion | 3/20/2023 | |
NOTE: Attorney General's Motion for Leave to File Briefs | |||
3/13/2023 | REL - Reply | 3/16/2023 | |
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE AS OF RIGHT AND REQUEST TO WAIVE REQUIREMENT OF PROPOSED PLEADING | |||
3/6/2023 | STP - Stipulation | 3/9/2023 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Enter Protective Order | |||
3/6/2023 | RES - Response | 3/9/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO PROPOSED INTERVENOR VRTK PAC’S MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE (1) RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND (2) MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
3/3/2023 | STP - Stipulation | 3/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Amend Briefing Schedule | |||
3/2/2023 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 3/2/2023 | |
2/28/2023 | RES - Response | 3/3/2023 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO ATTORNEY GENERAL’S MOTION TO INTERVENE AS OF RIGHT AND REQUEST TO WAIVE REQUIREMENT OF PROPOSED PLEADING | |||
2/28/2023 | ORD - Order | 2/28/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY BY PLAINTIFFS DOE I AND DOE II | |||
2/24/2023 | NOT - Notice | 2/28/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF VERIFIED APPLICATIONS FOR ATTORNEYS ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE | |||
2/17/2023 | STP - Stipulation | 2/22/2023 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION TO PROCEED PSEUDONYMOUSLY BY PLAINTIFFS DOE I AND DOE II | |||
2/17/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 2/22/2023 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED INTERVENOR VOTERS’ RIGHT TO KNOW’S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
2/17/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 2/23/2023 | |
NOTE: CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISSION’S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
2/17/2023 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 2/23/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES’ JOINDER IN CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTION COMMISSION’S MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
2/16/2023 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 2/21/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS FONTES, MEYER, CHAN, PATON, KIMBLE, TITLA, AND COLLINS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
2/16/2023 | MOT - Motion | 2/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Proposed Intervenor Voters' Right to Know's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss | |||
2/14/2023 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 2/16/2023 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED INTERVENOR VOTERS' RIGHT TO KNOW'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
2/14/2023 | RES - Response | 2/16/2023 | |
NOTE: Commission Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction | |||
2/14/2023 | RES - Response | 2/16/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES’ JOINDER IN COMMISSION DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
2/13/2023 | MOT - Motion | 2/15/2023 | |
NOTE: Proposed Intervenor Voters' Right to Know's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit | |||
2/13/2023 | MOT - Motion | 2/15/2023 | |
NOTE: Proposed Intervenor Voters' Right to Know's Motion for Leave to File Opposition | |||
2/13/2023 | MOT - Motion | 2/15/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit | |||
2/13/2023 | NOT - Notice | 2/15/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE’S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PROPOSED INTERVENOR VOTERS’ RIGHT TO KNOW’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITION | |||
2/13/2023 | NOT - Notice | 2/15/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Automatic Substitution of Public Officer | |||
2/13/2023 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 2/13/2023 | |
2/10/2023 | OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel | 2/16/2023 | |
NOTE: FOR DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE ADRIAN FONTES | |||
2/9/2023 | NOT - Notice | 2/14/2023 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FIRST STIPULATED EXTENSIONS OF DEADLINES FOR DEFENDANT ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE TO FILE (1) RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (2) RESPOND TO THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF | |||
2/8/2023 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 2/10/2023 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA ATTORNEY GENERAL’S MOTION TO INTERVENE AS OF RIGHT AND REQUEST TO WAIVE REQUIREMENT OF PROPOSED PLEADING / CO-CHRG $333.00 r# 29125497 | |||
2/8/2023 | MOT - Motion | 2/10/2023 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA ATTORNEY GENERAL’S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR TWO-WEEK EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE DEADLINESUnopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule | |||
2/6/2023 | ORD - Order | 2/6/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE | |||
1/31/2023 | REL - Reply | 2/3/2023 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Combined Motion to Intervene and Motion to Waive Rule 24(c)(1)(B) | |||
1/30/2023 | REQ - Request | 2/1/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ARIZONA CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISSION’S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO MOTION TO INTERVENE | |||
1/24/2023 | STP - Stipulation | 1/27/2023 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Briefing Schedule | |||
1/24/2023 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 1/24/2023 | |
1/20/2023 | RES - Response | 1/25/2023 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Combined Motion to Intervene and Motion to Waive Rule 24(c)(1)(B) | |||
1/20/2023 | ORD - Order | 1/26/2023 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | |||
1/20/2023 | ORD - Order | 1/26/2023 | |
NOTE: RE MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
1/18/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 1/21/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
1/17/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 1/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
1/13/2023 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 1/18/2023 | |
NOTE: COMBINED MOTION TO INTERVENE and MOTION TO WAIVE RULE 24(c)(1)(B) / EFILE BILLING $333 | |||
1/13/2023 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 1/18/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice | |||
1/10/2023 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 1/10/2023 | |
1/6/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 1/10/2023 | |
NOTE: VERIFICATION OF DOE 1 | |||
1/6/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 1/10/2023 | |
NOTE: VERIFICATION OF DOE II | |||
1/6/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 1/10/2023 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION OF DOE I | |||
1/6/2023 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 1/10/2023 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION OF DOE II | |||
1/6/2023 | SDO - Order to Seal Documents | 1/6/2023 | |
1/5/2023 | NOT - Notice | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Outstanding Motions | |||
1/5/2023 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
1/4/2023 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 1/4/2023 | |
1/3/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: GALEN D PATON | |||
1/3/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: MARK KIMBLE | |||
1/3/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: STEVE M TITLA | |||
1/3/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISION | |||
1/3/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: DAMIEN R MEYER | |||
1/3/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: AMY B CHAN | |||
1/3/2023 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/6/2023 | |
NOTE: THOMAS M COLLINS | |||
12/23/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: KATIE HOBBS | |||
12/23/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE | |||
12/21/2022 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 12/21/2022 | |
12/21/2022 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 12/21/2022 | |
12/20/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/29/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS DOE I AND DOES II'S / TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
12/16/2022 | NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right | 12/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Judge | |||
12/15/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction | |||
12/15/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit | |||
12/15/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Proceed Pseudonumously by Plaintiffs Doe I and Doe II | |||
12/15/2022 | CSH - Coversheet | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
12/15/2022 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/15/2022 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/15/2022 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/15/2022 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/15/2022 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/15/2022 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/15/2022 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/15/2022 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/15/2022 | SUM - Summons | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/15/2022 | COM - Complaint | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
1/20/2023 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
5/12/2023 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |