Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2022-015455 | Judge: | Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer |
File Date: | 11/22/2022 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Abraham Hamadeh | Plaintiff | Male | Timothy Lasota |
Republican National Committee | Plaintiff | Timothy Lasota | |
Kris Mayes | Defendant | Female | DANIEL BARR |
Katie Hobbs | Defendant | Female | David Gaona |
Larry Noble | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Apache County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
David W Stevens | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Cochise County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Patty Hansen | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Coconino County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Sadie Jo Bingham | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Gila County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Wendy John | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Graham County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Sharie Milheiro | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Greenlee County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Richard Garcia | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Lapaz County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Stephen Richer | Defendant | Male | Joseph La Rue |
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Joseph La Rue | |
Kristi Blair | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Mohave County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Michael Sample | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Navajo County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Gabriella Cazares-Kelly | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Pima County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Dana Lewis | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Pinal County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Suzanne Sainz | Defendant | Female | Kimberly Hunley |
Santa Cruz County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Michelle M Burchill | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Yavapai County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Richard Colwell | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Yuma County Board Of Supervisors | Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/5/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 1/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
1/5/2023 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 1/5/2023 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
11/30/2022 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 11/30/2022 | |
11/29/2022 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 11/29/2022 | |
11/29/2022 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 11/29/2022 | |
11/29/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 11/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Notice of Appearance | |||
11/29/2022 | STA - Statement | 11/29/2022 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/CONTESTANTS’ STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISCOVERY | |||
11/29/2022 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full | 11/29/2022 | |
11/28/2022 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 11/28/2022 | |
11/28/2022 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 11/28/2022 | |
11/28/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 11/28/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/28/2022 | RES - Response | 11/28/2022 | |
NOTE: Response to Contestee's Motion to Dismiss | |||
11/26/2022 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 11/28/2022 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Motion to Dismiss Statement of Election Contest | |||
11/25/2022 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 11/28/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT KRIS MAYES' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PRETRIAL BRIEF | |||
11/23/2022 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 11/23/2022 | |
11/23/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 11/23/2022 | |
11/23/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 11/28/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/23/2022 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 11/28/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
11/22/2022 | COM - Complaint | 11/22/2022 | |
11/22/2022 | CSH - Coversheet | 11/22/2022 | |
11/22/2022 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 11/22/2022 | |
11/22/2022 | APL - Application | 11/22/2022 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
11/28/2022 | 14:00 | Order To Show Cause |
11/28/2022 | 14:00 | Order To Show Cause |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |