Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2022-013452 Judge: Cooper, Katherine
File Date: 9/27/2022 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Michael Allen Robertson   Plaintiff  Male  Pro Per 
Lisa Millett   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Joelle Higby   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Alison Botta   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Eleni Vaita   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Jennifer Wilcutt   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Mike Faust   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Mark Brnovich   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/23/2022  NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court  11/23/2022   
NOTE: NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT 
11/2/2022  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/9/2022   
NOTE: MIKE FAUST 
9/27/2022  COM - Complaint  10/12/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
9/27/2022  CSH - Coversheet  10/12/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
9/27/2022  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  10/12/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
9/27/2022  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  10/12/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
9/27/2022  ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver  10/12/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
9/27/2022  ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees  10/12/2022   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file