« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2022-012671
Judge:
McCoy, M. Scott
File Date:
9/26/2022
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Next Step Advisors L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
James Florentine
Party Name
M Sipolt Marketing L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
James Florentine
Party Name
Sabertooth Investments L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
James Florentine
Party Name
True Harvest L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
James Florentine
Party Name
True Harvest Holdings Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Robert Charles
Party Name
Greenrose Holding Company Inc, The
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Robert Charles
Party Name
D X R Finance L L C
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
James Ledbetter
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2023
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/7/2023
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
12/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION DISMISSING CASE,WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/25/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CONTINUING STAYING CASE
Filing Date
9/15/2023
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
9/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STATUS REPORT (NO. 2)
Filing Date
7/17/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER CONTINUING STAYING CASE
Filing Date
6/29/2023
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
6/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Status Report
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER STAYING CASE
Filing Date
4/25/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Staying Litigation
Filing Date
3/3/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
3/13/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/1/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
2/16/2023
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
2/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
2/6/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/8/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRUE HARVEST, LLC'S ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS
Filing Date
1/27/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2023
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING STIPULATION RE REMOTE WITNESS TESTIMONY
Filing Date
1/26/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Amended Exhibit List
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’ PREHEARING BRIEF
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
1/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Status Update
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE BY DXR FINANCE LLC
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
1/25/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE /
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene
Filing Date
1/24/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Prehearing Trial Brief
Filing Date
1/20/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/25/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT RE: JANUARY 26, 2023 EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
1/18/2023
Description
NAC - Notice of Assignment to Commercial Court
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2023
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
1/18/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
1/21/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ OBJECTIONS TO AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF RULE 30(B)(6) REPRESENTATIVE OF GREENROSE HOLDING COMPANY INC.
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/19/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation and Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Rule 26(D) Discovery Dispute Statements
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of DXR Finance, LLC Motion to Intervene
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Notice of Deposition of Rule 30(b)(6) Representative Greenrose Holding Company, Inc.
Filing Date
1/17/2023
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Emergency Application for Appointment of Receiver
Filing Date
1/13/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/18/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Motion to Intervene
Filing Date
1/12/2023
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
1/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
1/12/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata Re Defendants' Counterclaims and Answer to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
1/10/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
1/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Declaration of John "Jack" Falcon in Opposition to Emergency Application for Appointment of Receiver
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Counterclaims and Answer to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
1/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY BOSSIDY IN OPPOSITION TO EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Opposition to Emergency Application for Appointment of a Receiver
Filing Date
1/10/2023
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
1/12/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED INTERVENOR DXR FINANCE, LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
1/3/2023
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
1/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Filing Date
12/22/2022
Description
MTI – Motion to Intervene
Docket Date
12/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Intervene / EFILE BILLING $333.00
Filing Date
12/9/2022
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
12/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2022
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
12/16/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Re: Evidentiary Hearing Re: Emergency Application for Appointment of Receiver
Filing Date
11/30/2022
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
12/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2022
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
11/30/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Emergency Application for Appointment of Receiver
Filing Date
11/18/2022
Description
LRM-Letter of Remand from Federal District Court
Docket Date
11/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Remand and Request for THE RESETTING OF AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Filing Date
11/16/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Address
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/20/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRUE HARVEST HOLDINGS INC
Filing Date
10/5/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Supplement to Emergency Application for Appointment of a Receiver
Filing Date
10/3/2022
Description
NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GREENROSE HOLDING COMPANY INC
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
GREENROSE HOLDING COMPANY INC
Filing Date
9/28/2022
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
10/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
APE - Application/Petition
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Emergency Application for Appointment of Receiver
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
9/26/2022
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/26/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/5/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
12/8/2022
Time
10:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
1/26/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status