Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2022-006284 Judge: Sinclair, Joan
File Date: 5/6/2022 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Michael Allen Robertson   Plaintiff  Male  Pro Per 
Amanda Jane Bacolas   Defendant  Female  Corrinne Viola 
Jennifer Marie Bacolas   Defendant  Female  Corrinne Viola 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/10/2023  NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney  1/10/2023   
NOTE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 
12/22/2022  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  12/23/2022   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS ORDER STAYING APPEAL 
12/15/2022  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  12/16/2022   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
12/15/2022  AIX - Appeals Index  12/16/2022   
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
12/14/2022  NOT - Notice  12/15/2022   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE 
12/14/2022  NOT - Notice  12/15/2022   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS NOTICE OF CONTINUING FEE DEFERRAL 
11/14/2022  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  11/22/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
11/14/2022  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration  11/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: COURTS DISMISSAL ORDER 
11/14/2022  MOT - Motion  11/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO ALLOW MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AFTER THE DEADLINE 
11/2/2022  NOT - Notice  11/5/2022   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Judgment OF DISMISSAL 
10/17/2022  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  10/17/2022   
9/7/2022  STA - Statement  9/13/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED DISCLOSURE 
9/7/2022  MOT - Motion  9/15/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION FOR DEFENDANT AMANDA BACOLAS 
9/7/2022  MOT - Motion  9/15/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR RULING ON THE PLEADINGS 
8/16/2022  RES - Response  8/22/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS 
8/16/2022  RES - Response  8/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO MOTION TO STRIKE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT 
8/16/2022  MOT - Motion  8/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS 
8/12/2022  MOT - Motion  8/16/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS 
8/12/2022  MOT - Motion  8/16/2022   
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT 
8/12/2022  REL - Reply  8/16/2022   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS 
8/2/2022  MOT - Motion  8/8/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO UNSEAL SEALED EVIDENCE IN PLAINTIFFS POSSESSION 
8/2/2022  STA - Statement  8/9/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURE / 
7/27/2022  MOT - Motion  8/2/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR CIVIL SUBPOENA ARIZONA DCS / ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULES 45 84 
7/26/2022  STA - Statement  8/2/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS INITIAL RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT 
7/25/2022  MOT - Motion  7/27/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO ACCEPT REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS EXCEPTION 
7/25/2022  AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default  7/27/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
7/25/2022  REL - Reply  7/28/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS / TO MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY 
7/25/2022  REL - Reply  7/28/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS 
7/13/2022  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  7/15/2022   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS  
7/13/2022  MOT - Motion  7/15/2022   
NOTE: Motion to Stay Discovery 
7/1/2022  EXH - Exhibit  7/13/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
6/14/2022  MTA - Motion To Amend  6/21/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: COMPLAINT 
6/14/2022  MOT - Motion  6/21/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION 
6/8/2022  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  6/8/2022   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
6/6/2022  MTA - Motion To Amend  6/9/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: COMPLAINT 
6/6/2022  AMC - Amended Complaint  6/9/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
6/6/2022  MOT - Motion  6/11/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO AUTHORIZE RELEASE OF MEDICAL RECORDS 
6/6/2022  MOT - Motion  6/11/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY 
6/6/2022  MOT - Motion  6/11/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO UNSEAL JD-35705 
6/6/2022  MOT - Motion  6/11/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION 
6/1/2022  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  6/2/2022   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
6/1/2022  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/7/2022   
NOTE: AMANDA BACOLAS 
6/1/2022  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/7/2022   
NOTE: JENNIFER MARIE BACOLAS 
5/6/2022  COM - Complaint  5/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
5/6/2022  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  5/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
5/6/2022  CSH - Coversheet  5/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
5/6/2022  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  5/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
5/6/2022  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  5/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
5/6/2022  ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver  5/23/2022  Plaintiff(1)  
5/6/2022  ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees  5/23/2022   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file