Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2021-095529 | Judge: | Agne, Sara |
File Date: | 11/22/2021 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Drocelle Prestige L L C | Plaintiff | Brad Denton | |
Drocelle Benezet | Plaintiff | Unknown | Brad Denton |
Related Services Inc | Defendant | FRANK FOX | |
Microchip Technology Incorporated | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per | |
W W S Acquisition L L C | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
4/22/2022 | LET - Letter | 4/25/2022 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS | |||
3/30/2022 | NOT - Notice | 3/31/2022 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
3/30/2022 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 3/31/2022 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
3/30/2022 | AIX - Appeals Index | 3/31/2022 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
3/25/2022 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 3/31/2022 | |
NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment | |||
3/15/2022 | RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment | 3/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Release of Writ of Garnishment and Garnishee | |||
3/15/2022 | RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment | 3/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Release of Writ of Garnishment and Garnishee | |||
3/15/2022 | RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment | 3/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Release of Writ of Garnishment and Garnishee | |||
3/15/2022 | RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment | 3/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Release of Writ of Garnishment and Garnishee | |||
3/15/2022 | RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment | 3/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Release of Writ of Garnishment and Garnishee | |||
3/14/2022 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 3/16/2022 | Garnishee Defendant(5) |
NOTE: Answer of Garnishee | |||
3/11/2022 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 3/16/2022 | Garnishee Defendant(4) |
3/8/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/15/2022 | |
3/6/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/9/2022 | |
3/6/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/9/2022 | |
3/6/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/9/2022 | |
3/6/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/9/2022 | |
3/6/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/12/2022 | |
3/3/2022 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 3/7/2022 | |
3/3/2022 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 3/8/2022 | |
3/3/2022 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 3/8/2022 | |
3/3/2022 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 3/8/2022 | |
3/3/2022 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 3/8/2022 | |
3/3/2022 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 3/8/2022 | |
3/1/2022 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 3/1/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal / EFILE BILLING $100 | |||
2/15/2022 | JUD - Judgment | 2/15/2022 | |
NOTE: JUDGMENT | |||
1/11/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/11/2022 | |
1/11/2022 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 1/14/2022 | |
NOTE: Verified Statement of Costs | |||
1/3/2022 | REL - Reply | 1/4/2022 | |
NOTE: PETITIONERS' REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS' APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD | |||
12/21/2021 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 12/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
12/20/2021 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 12/21/2021 | |
NOTE: RESPONDENT’S OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS’ APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD | |||
12/1/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/7/2021 | |
NOTE: RELATED SERVICES INC | |||
11/22/2021 | APE - Application/Petition | 11/23/2021 | |
NOTE: Application to Confirm Arbitration Award | |||
11/22/2021 | CSH - Coversheet | 11/23/2021 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
11/22/2021 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 11/23/2021 | |
NOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To | |||
11/22/2021 | SUM - Summons | 11/23/2021 | |
NOTE: Summons |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
2/15/2022 | F:Drocelle Benezet | $445.91 | One Time | Costs | Satisfied |
A: Drocelle Prestige L L C | |||||
2/15/2022 | F:Drocelle Benezet | $16,877.50 | One Time | Costs | Satisfied |
A: Drocelle Prestige L L C | |||||
F:Drocelle Benezet | $426,197.01 | One Time | Principal | Satisfied | |
A: Drocelle Prestige L L C |