« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2021-093119
Judge:
Driggs, Adam
File Date:
7/1/2021
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Dennis Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Joel Sannes
Party Name
Elida Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Joel Sannes
Party Name
Zane Beach
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Victoria Beach
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beach Ventures Inc
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Maricopa County Creditor
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Molina Healthcare Of Arizona Inc
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jpmorgan Chase Bank N A
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2024
Description
JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee
Docket Date
12/17/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT
Filing Date
12/12/2024
Description
039 - ME: Judgment Debtor Exam
Docket Date
12/12/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2024
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
12/11/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Garnishment Judgment
Filing Date
12/5/2024
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
12/9/2024
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(8)
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
12/3/2024
Description
062 - ME: Quash Osc
Docket Date
12/3/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/2/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING GARNISHEES DEFAULT
Filing Date
11/26/2024
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/26/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO VACATE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2024
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
11/22/2024
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(8)
NOTE:
Answer of Garnishee JP Morgan Chase
Filing Date
11/21/2024
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
11/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TH SHOW CAUSE REGARDING GARNISHEE'S DEFAULT
Filing Date
11/19/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING GARNISHEE’S DEFAULT
Filing Date
10/30/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/4/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ZANE BEACH
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
345 - ME: Judgement Debtor Exam Set
Docket Date
10/23/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/25/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2024
Description
OJA - Order Req. Jdgmnt/Debtor Appear For Exam
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO APPEAR FOR DEBTORS EXAMINATION AND ORDER TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
10/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO APPEAR FOR DEBTOR’S EXAMINATION
Filing Date
10/18/2024
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
10/22/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE
Filing Date
7/8/2024
Description
JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee
Docket Date
7/8/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/1/2024
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
7/5/2024
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(8)
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE (EARNINGS)
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
6/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
6/21/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO ZANE BEACH AND VICTORIA BEACH ONLY
Filing Date
6/21/2024
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
6/22/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/18/2024
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Garnishment Judgment
Filing Date
6/17/2024
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/18/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2024
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2024
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
6/4/2024
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(8)
NOTE:
Answer of Garnishee
Filing Date
6/3/2024
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
6/6/2024
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(8)
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
5/23/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN
Filing Date
5/23/2024
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
5/28/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
5/14/2024
Description
ACL - Appl/Ord Continuing Lien
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2024
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
5/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
5/15/2024
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(7)
Filing Date
5/6/2024
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
5/8/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
4/30/2024
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(7)
NOTE:
GARNISHEE ANSWER
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/1/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2024
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
5/6/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/27/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Service
Filing Date
4/23/2024
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
4/24/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2024
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
1/31/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
12/26/2023
Description
SJJ - Satisfaction of Judgment for Jury Fees
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/22/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/17/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
11/22/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’/COUNTERDEFENDANTS’ APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES, TAXABLE COSTS AND INTEREST
Filing Date
11/15/2023
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
11/17/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit In Support Of award for Attorney Fees and verified statement of costs
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
11/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008
Docket Date
10/27/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
WSH - Worksheet
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
10/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL /
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
VER - Verdict
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
VER - Verdict
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FORM #2
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
VER - Verdict
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
VER - Verdict
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
VER - Verdict
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
VER - Verdict
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
#6
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
VER - Verdict
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
# 7
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
VER - Verdict
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
# 8
Filing Date
10/26/2023
Description
JJF - Judgment For Jury Fees
Docket Date
11/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
10/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2023
Description
JQU - Jury Question
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
DPR - Deposition Report
Docket Date
10/31/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
MAY 9 2022 / VIDEOCONFERENCE ARBITRATION VOLUME 1 / PATRICIA NUNES KOTARBA
Filing Date
10/23/2023
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions
Docket Date
10/30/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
9/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2023
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
5/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
5/2/2023
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/3/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Proposed Jury Instructions
Filing Date
5/1/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/4/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO CONTINUE DATE FOR FILING JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/28/2023
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/1/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Date for Filing Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
4/5/2023
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
4/5/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2022
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
8/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Association of Counsel Within Firm
Filing Date
8/12/2022
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
8/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION APPEAL BOND / $75.00
Filing Date
8/10/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
AFA - Appeal From Arbitration
Docket Date
8/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Appeal from Arbitration and Motion to Set Trial / eFile Billing $105.00
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
8/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS INTENDED TO BE USED AT TRIAL
Filing Date
7/14/2022
Description
NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator
Docket Date
7/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Decision of Arbitrator
Filing Date
6/29/2022
Description
399 - ME: Notice To File Arbit Award
Docket Date
6/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2022
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
3/24/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF ARBITRATION HEARING HEARING DATE: MAY 9, 2022 TIME: 9:00 a.m.
Filing Date
3/11/2022
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/15/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
2/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2022
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
1/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
12/31/2021
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
1/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw with Consent
Filing Date
12/17/2021
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT ZANE AND VICTORA BEACH’S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 7.1(h) GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION CERTIFICATE
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
12/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 16(b) JOINT REPORT
Filing Date
11/24/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
11/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
11/2/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS ZANE AND VICTORIA BEACH’S REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/28/2021
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERFDEFENDANTS' Answer to CounterclaimS
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/14/2021
Description
350 - ME: Transfer To Arbitration
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2021
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS ZANE AND VICTORIA BEACH’S RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/11/2021
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BEACH VENTURES, INC.’S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIMS
Filing Date
10/7/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO AMEND CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
10/6/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING BEACH VENTURES, INC.’S RULE 24 MOTION TO INTERVENE
Filing Date
9/10/2021
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
9/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
9/10/2021
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
9/1/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO RULE 24 MOTION TO INTERVENE
Filing Date
8/30/2021
Description
MTI – Motion to Intervene
Docket Date
9/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 24 MOTION TO INTERVENE
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer-EFILE BILLING $245
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit In Support Of APPLICATION FOR ENTRY
Filing Date
8/20/2021
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Entry of Default
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
VICTORIA BEACH
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ZANE BEACH DBA ZANES ROD AND CUSTOM
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
7/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
7/1/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/26/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/5/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/18/2023
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/22/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/23/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/24/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/25/2023
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/22/2023
Time
10:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/5/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/23/2023
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/24/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/25/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/26/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Judgment Debtor Exam
Date
1/27/2025
Time
9:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
1/29/2024
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Dennis Hemphill, Elida Hemphill
A: Zane Beach
Amount
$3,841.34
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
1/29/2024
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Dennis Hemphill, Elida Hemphill
A: Zane Beach
Amount
$57,609.50
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Date
1/29/2024
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Dennis Hemphill, Elida Hemphill
A: Zane Beach
Amount
$25,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
1/29/2024
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Dennis Hemphill, Elida Hemphill
A: Zane Beach
Amount
$11,325.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
10/26/2023
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Maricopa County Creditor
A: Zane Beach
Amount
$782.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment for Jury Fees
Status