Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2021-013497 | Judge: | Ryan, Timothy |
File Date: | 8/26/2021 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Yavapai-Prescott Indian Tribe | Plaintiff | Luis Ochoa | |
Doug Anthony Ducey | Defendant | Male | Heidi Staudenmaier |
Ted Vogt | Defendant | Male | PATRICK IRVINE |
Tonto Apache Tribe Of Arizona | Intervenor | Robert Rosette | |
Quechan Tribe Of The Ft Yuma Indian Reservation, The | Intervenor | Robert Rosette |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
8/1/2022 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 8/1/2022 | |
7/29/2022 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 8/3/2022 | |
NOTE: RE THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE | |||
7/26/2022 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 7/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Joint Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice | |||
6/10/2022 | ORD - Order | 6/10/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER CONTINUING STAY | |||
6/7/2022 | REP - Report | 6/9/2022 | |
NOTE: Joint Status Report and Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings | |||
4/29/2022 | NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney | 5/4/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record | |||
4/5/2022 | ORD - Order | 4/5/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS | |||
3/29/2022 | STP - Stipulation | 4/2/2022 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS | |||
2/25/2022 | ORD - Order | 2/25/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING CASE DEADLINES | |||
2/22/2022 | STP - Stipulation | 2/23/2022 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Extend Case Deadlines | |||
1/26/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/26/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER REINSTATING CASE AND SETTING CASE DEADLINES | |||
1/14/2022 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 1/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Joint Status Report and Motion to Reinstate Case to Active Calendar | |||
11/4/2021 | ORD - Order | 11/4/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND SETTING DISMISSAL CALENDAR DEADLINE | |||
11/1/2021 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 11/3/2021 | |
NOTE: Joint Status Report and Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings | |||
10/22/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/22/2021 | |
10/19/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/19/2021 | |
10/18/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 10/19/2021 | |
NOTE: GOVERNOR DUCEY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
10/11/2021 | NOT - Notice | 10/12/2021 | |
NOTE: GOVERNOR DUCEY’S NOTICE OF NO OBJECTION TO TONTO APACHE TRIBE OF ARIZONA AND QUECHAN TRIBE OF THE FT. YUMA INDIAN RESERVATION’S MOTION TO INTERVENE AS SPECIALLYAPPEARING INTERVENORDEFENDANTS | |||
9/30/2021 | PDO - Proposed Order Denied | 9/30/2021 | |
NOTE: RE [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: MOTION TO STRIKE NONPARTIES’ NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
9/27/2021 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 9/29/2021 | |
NOTE: First Amended Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief | |||
9/22/2021 | CME - Credit Memo | 9/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo | |||
9/21/2021 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 9/24/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Intervene as Specially-Appearing Intervenor Defendants and Memorandum in Support | |||
9/20/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/20/2021 | |
9/15/2021 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 9/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
9/15/2021 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 9/16/2021 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
9/9/2021 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 9/13/2021 | |
NOTE: First Amended Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief | |||
9/7/2021 | NOT - Notice | 9/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Deposition of Robert Gazzam Ogo | |||
9/7/2021 | NOT - Notice | 9/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging | |||
9/7/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 9/7/2021 | |
9/6/2021 | ORD - Order | 9/7/2021 | |
NOTE: DECISION ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
9/5/2021 | REL - Reply | 9/7/2021 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | |||
9/5/2021 | MOT - Motion | 9/7/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE NONPARTIES’ NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
9/3/2021 | RES - Response | 9/7/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendant Ted Vogt's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order | |||
9/3/2021 | MOT - Motion | 9/7/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendant Ted Vogt's Joinder In Motion For Judicial Notice | |||
9/3/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 9/3/2021 | |
9/3/2021 | REQ - Request | 9/4/2021 | |
NOTE: Expedited Request for Court Reporter | |||
9/3/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/4/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Special Appearance of Proposed Intervenors | |||
9/3/2021 | NOT - Notice | 9/4/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
9/3/2021 | MOT - Motion | 9/4/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion for Judicial Notice and Memorandum in Support | |||
9/3/2021 | RES - Response | 9/4/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendant Duceyu's Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | |||
9/2/2021 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset | 9/2/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/2/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
9/1/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2021 | |
8/31/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2021 | |
NOTE: DOUG ANTHONY DUCEY JR | |||
8/31/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2021 | |
NOTE: TED VOGT | |||
8/31/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/31/2021 | |
8/30/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/30/2021 | |
8/27/2021 | ORD - Order | 9/1/2021 | |
NOTE: TO APPEAR RETURN HEARING | |||
8/26/2021 | COM - Complaint | 8/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief | |||
8/26/2021 | CSH - Coversheet | 8/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
8/26/2021 | SUM - Summons | 8/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/26/2021 | SUM - Summons | 8/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
8/26/2021 | MOT - Motion | 8/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction | |||
8/26/2021 | NOT - Notice | 8/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Claim of Unconstitutionality |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
9/2/2021 | 14:30 | Emergency Hearing |
9/3/2021 | 14:00 | Emergency Hearing |
9/6/2021 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |