Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2021-008041 | Judge: | Blanchard, John |
File Date: | 5/17/2021 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
James D Smith | Plaintiff | Male | Thomas Raccuia |
Susan E Smith | Plaintiff | Female | Thomas Raccuia |
Saguaro View Management Inc | Defendant | Edith Rudder |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
12/16/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 12/16/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |||
12/9/2021 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 12/14/2021 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice | |||
11/5/2021 | 375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar | 11/5/2021 | |
11/3/2021 | REP - Report | 11/4/2021 | |
NOTE: CIVIL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE REPORT | |||
10/28/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 10/28/2021 | |
10/28/2021 | NOS - Notice Of Settlement | 10/29/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Settlement | |||
10/25/2021 | REL - Reply | 10/27/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO HAVE REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO AMEND ADMISSION | |||
10/21/2021 | ORD - Order | 10/21/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CLAIMS ADJUSTER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |||
10/20/2021 | RES - Response | 10/22/2021 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO HAVE REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO AMEND ADMISSION | |||
10/20/2021 | DCL - Declaration | 10/22/2021 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO HAVE REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED | |||
10/17/2021 | ORD - Order | 10/18/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CLAIMS ADJUSTER TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |||
10/15/2021 | REQ - Request | 10/18/2021 | |
NOTE: Request for Claims Adjuster to Appear Telephonically at Settlement Conference | |||
10/1/2021 | MOT - Motion | 10/5/2021 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion to Have Requests for Admissions Deemed Admitted | |||
9/24/2021 | ORD - Order | 9/28/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER REGARDING REMOTE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |||
9/8/2021 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 9/8/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/1/2021 | |
9/1/2021 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 9/1/2021 | |
NOTE: Order | |||
8/20/2021 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 8/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Joint Report | |||
6/7/2021 | ANS - Answer | 6/9/2021 | |
NOTE: Answer/ eFile Billing $245.00 | |||
5/25/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/1/2021 | |
NOTE: SAGUARO VIEW MANAGEMENT INC | |||
5/17/2021 | COM - Complaint | 5/17/2021 | |
NOTE: Complaint | |||
5/17/2021 | CSH - Coversheet | 5/17/2021 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
5/17/2021 | SUM - Summons | 5/17/2021 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
5/17/2021 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 5/19/2021 | |
NOTE: Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/26/2021 | 13:30 | Civil Settlement Conference |
11/16/2021 | 9:30 | Oral Argument |
6/17/2022 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |