Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2021-006646 | Judge: | Fox, Dewain |
File Date: | 4/22/2021 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Arizona Democratic Party | Plaintiff | Roopali Desai | |
Steve Gallardo | Plaintiff | Male | Roopali Desai |
Karen Fann | Defendant | Female | Thomas Basile |
Warren Petersen | Defendant | Male | Thomas Basile |
Ken Bennett | Defendant | Male | Thomas Basile |
Cyber Ninjas Inc | Defendant | Jordan Wolff | |
Katie Hobbs | Endorsement Case | Female | Joshua Bendor |
First Amendment Coalition Of Arizona Inc | Intervenor | DANIEL BARR | |
We The People Az Alliance P A C | Endorsement Case | Michael Kielsky | |
Maricopa County Libertarian Party | Endorsement Case | Michael Kielsky |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/11/2021 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
5/7/2021 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 5/10/2021 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismissal with Prejudice | |||
5/5/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/5/2021 | |
4/30/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 4/30/2021 | |
4/30/2021 | REQ - Request | 5/3/2021 | |
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY STATUS CONFERENCE REGARDING THE COURT'S SUA SPONTE RELEASE OF EXHIBIT D9 TO THE PUBLIC | |||
4/30/2021 | SDO - Order to Seal Documents | 4/30/2021 | |
4/29/2021 | ORD - Order | 4/30/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT | |||
4/29/2021 | STP - Stipulation | 4/29/2021 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION TO SEAL EXHIBIT D9 | |||
4/29/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 4/29/2021 | |
4/28/2021 | NOT - Notice | 4/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs Notice of Lodging of Proposed Form of Preliminary Injunction Order | |||
4/28/2021 | NOT - Notice | 4/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Joinder in Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction | |||
4/28/2021 | MOT - Motion | 4/28/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
4/28/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 4/28/2021 | |
NOTE: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR APRIL 28 2021 AT 10:30 AM | |||
4/28/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 4/28/2021 | |
4/28/2021 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 4/29/2021 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
4/27/2021 | MOT - Motion | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION OF WE THE PEOPLE AZ ALLIANCE PAC AND THE MARICOPA COUNTY LIBERTARIAN PARTY FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE | |||
4/27/2021 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 4/27/2021 | |
4/27/2021 | MOT - Motion | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS IN OPPOSITION TO CYBER NINJAS’ MOTION TO FILE EX PARTE AND UNDER SEAL | |||
4/27/2021 | REL - Reply | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order | |||
4/27/2021 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: SENATE DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO SECRETARY HOBBS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF | |||
4/27/2021 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Intervene - Co-chg $333 Receipt # 28234038 | |||
4/27/2021 | NOT - Notice | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Cyber Ninja's Notice of Joinder | |||
4/27/2021 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs Notice of Filing of Declarations | |||
4/27/2021 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 4/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
4/26/2021 | RES - Response | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Response in Opposition to Motion to Seal | |||
4/26/2021 | MOT - Motion | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to File Ex Parte and Under Seal [ARCP 5.4] and Notice of Lodging | |||
4/26/2021 | RES - Response | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Senate Defendants' Response to Cyber Ninjas' Motion to File Under Seal | |||
4/26/2021 | ORD - Order | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT | |||
4/26/2021 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 4/26/2021 | Intervenor(8) |
NOTE: Motion to Intervene - EFILE BILLING $333 | |||
4/26/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 4/26/2021 | |
4/26/2021 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 4/26/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF OPPOSING CYBER NINJAS' MOTION TO FILE AN EXHIBIT UNDER SEAL AND TO CLOSE HEARING TO THE PUBLIC AND MEDIA - EFILE BILLING $333 | |||
4/26/2021 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 4/30/2021 | |
NOTE: EXHIBIT D9 | |||
4/26/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 4/26/2021 | |
4/26/2021 | EXH - Exhibit | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Exhibit D10 | |||
4/25/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 4/26/2021 | |
NOTE: SENATE DEFENDANTS’ COMBINED MOTION TO DISMISS AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
4/25/2021 | MEM - Memorandum | 4/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs Pre-Hearing Memorandum | |||
4/25/2021 | MOT - Motion | 4/26/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE OF SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ REQUEST FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |||
4/25/2021 | MOT - Motion | 4/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits | |||
4/25/2021 | STA - Statement | 4/26/2021 | |
NOTE: SIMULTANEOUS BRIEF OF DEFENDANT CYBER NINJAS (1) JOINDER (2) MOTION TO FILE EX PARTE AND UNDER SEAL [ARCP 5.4] (3) NOTICE OF LODGING | |||
4/25/2021 | EXH - Exhibit | 4/26/2021 | |
NOTE: EXHIBITS D1 - D8 | |||
4/23/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 4/23/2021 | |
4/23/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/23/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
4/23/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 4/23/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Special Appearance | |||
4/23/2021 | REQ - Request | 4/24/2021 | |
NOTE: Request for Court Reporter | |||
4/22/2021 | COM - Complaint | 4/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Verified Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief | |||
4/22/2021 | CSH - Coversheet | 4/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
4/22/2021 | SUM - Summons | 4/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
4/22/2021 | SUM - Summons | 4/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
4/22/2021 | SUM - Summons | 4/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
4/22/2021 | SUM - Summons | 4/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
4/22/2021 | MOT - Motion | 4/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (with Notice) and Preliminary Injunction and OSC | |||
4/22/2021 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 4/26/2021 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
4/23/2021 | 11:00 | Order To Show Cause |
4/26/2021 | 11:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
4/27/2021 | 11:00 | Order To Show Cause |
4/28/2021 | 10:30 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |