« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2021-005448
Judge:
Thorson, Erik
File Date:
4/2/2021
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Douglas Camping
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
John Kelly
Party Name
Kevin Camping
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
John Kelly
Party Name
F Daniel Johnson
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
John Kelly
Party Name
D & K Entities L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
John Kelly
Party Name
Art Lender Services L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Grant Cartwright
Party Name
Ames Enterprises Inc
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Anthony Austin
Party Name
Accurate Adjustments Inc
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Anthony Austin
Party Name
1st Adjusters Inc
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Scott Brown
Party Name
W J R P Holdings L L C
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Anthony Austin
Party Name
Weiss Family Ventures L L C
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Anthony Austin
Party Name
Able Adjusters Inc
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Anthony Austin
Party Name
Joseph Hale
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
JAMES TAYLOR
Party Name
Rick Campbell
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Anthony Austin
Party Name
John Hale
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
JAMES TAYLOR
Party Name
William Hale
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
JAMES TAYLOR
Party Name
Justin Clayton
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Scott Brown
Party Name
Mark Clayton
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Scott Brown
Party Name
Steven Simons
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Anthony Austin
Party Name
K S Statebank
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Brian Fullmer
Party Name
Ankura Consulting Group L L C
Relationship
Receiver
Sex
Attorney
Robert Miller
Party Name
Asset Recovery Adjusters L L C
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Scott Brown
Party Name
Legacy Remarketing Inc
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Anthony Austin
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2022
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/9/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Receiver's Closing Statement
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING; APPROVING FINAL BUDGET; DISCHARGING RECEIVER AND ITS AGENTS FROM LIABILITY; EXONERATING RECEIVER’S BOND; AUTHORIZING ABANDONMENT OF RECORDS; AND TERMINATING RECEIVERSHIP
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO FORM OF PROPOSED ORDER
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Statement of Support for Receiver's Proposed Form of Order Terminating Receivership
Filing Date
9/17/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINDER IN OBJECTION
Filing Date
9/15/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBMITTAL OF PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING; APPROVING FINAL BUDGET; DISCHARGING RECEIVER AND ITS AGENTS FROM LIABILITY; EXONERATING RECEIVER’S BOND; AUTHORIZING ABANDONMENT OF RECORDS; AND TERMINATING RECEIVERSHIP
Filing Date
9/13/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO STATEMENT OF POSITION / LIMITED OBJECTION TO RECEIVER'S MOTION AND FINAL REPORT
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Purchaser's Statement of Position - Limited Objection to Receiver's Motion and Final Report
Filing Date
8/27/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING FEES AND COSTS INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FOR THE PERIOD OF JULY 1 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
8/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURCHASER’S STATEMENT OF POSITION/LIMITED OBJECTION TO RECEIVER’S MOTION AND FINAL REPORT
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING FEES AND COSTS INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FOR THE PERIOD OF JULY 1 THROUGH JULY 31, 2021
Filing Date
8/11/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECEIVER’S MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING THIRD AND FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING; APPROVING FINAL BUDGET; DISCHARGING RECEIVER AND ITS AGENTS FROM LIABILITY; EXONERATING RECEIVER’S BOND; AUTHORIZING ABANDONMENT OF RECORDS; AND TERMINATING RECEIVERSHIP
Filing Date
8/6/2021
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
8/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING FEES AND COSTS INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FOR THE PERIOD OF JUNE 1 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2021
Filing Date
7/29/2021
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata
Filing Date
7/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING FEES AND COSTS INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FOR THE PERIOD OF JUNE 1 THROUGH JUNE 30, 2021
Filing Date
7/15/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
7/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPROVING FEES AND COSTS INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FOR THE PERIOD OF MAY 1 THROUGH MAY 31, 2021
Filing Date
7/8/2021
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Motion to Approve Receiver Report No 2 and Budget
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURCHASER’S RESPONSE AND STATEMENT OF POSITION TO ENTRY OF ORDER APPROVING RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FEE MOTION FOR MAY 2021
Filing Date
7/2/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURCHASER’S RESPONSE AND STATEMENT OF POSITION TO MOTION TO APPROVE RECEIVER REPORT NO. 2 AND BUDGET
Filing Date
6/29/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING FEES AND COSTS INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FOR THE PERIOD OF MAY 1 THROUGH MAY 31, 2021
Filing Date
6/25/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Approve Receiver Report No 2 and Budget
Filing Date
6/16/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2021
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PURCHASER'S STATUS REPORT ON SALE OF ASSETS
Filing Date
6/14/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Purchaser's Status Report on Sale of Assets
Filing Date
6/3/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING FEES AND COSTS INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FOR THE PERIOD ENDED APRIL 30, 2021
Filing Date
6/2/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed
Docket Date
6/8/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION TO CLARIFY AND ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER APPROVING SALE OF ASSETS TO LEGACY REMARKETING, INC.
Filing Date
5/26/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
5/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO CERTAIN LANGUAGE IN THE FEE MOTION AND FORM OF ORDER FOR FEES AND COSTS INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FOR THE PERIOD ENDED APRIL 30, 2021
Filing Date
5/26/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2021
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
5/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
5/24/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO CLAYTON PARTIES’ EMERGENCY MOTION TO CLARIFY AND ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER APPROVING SALE OF ASSETS TO LEGACY REMARKETING, INC.
Filing Date
5/24/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
5/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
LIMITED OBJECTION TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO CLARIFY AND ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER APPROVING SALE OF ASSETS TO LEGACY REMARKETING, INC.
Filing Date
5/20/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO EMERGENCY MOTION TO CLARIFY AND ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER APPROVING SALE OF ASSETS TO LEGACY REMARKETING, INC.
Filing Date
5/19/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING FEES AND COSTS INCURRED BY THE RECEIVER AND BUCHALTER FOR THE PERIOD ENDED APRIL 30, 2021
Filing Date
5/18/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY MOTION TO CLARIFY AND ENFORCE STIPULATED ORDER APPROVING SALE OF ASSETS TO LEGACY REMARKETING, INC.
Filing Date
5/17/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
5/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2021
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel
Docket Date
5/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2021
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED ORDER APPROVING SALE OF A PORTION OF THE RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE'S ASSETS TO LEGACY REMARKETING, INC.
Filing Date
5/13/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED ORDER APPROVING SALE OF A PORTION OF THE RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE'S ASSETS TO THE CAMPING COMPANIES INC
Filing Date
5/12/2021
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
5/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
5/10/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED ORDERS APPROVING SALES OF PORTIONS OF THE RECEIVERSHIP ESTATE’S ASSETS
Filing Date
4/23/2021
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Receiver Report No. 1
Filing Date
4/20/2021
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
4/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo
Filing Date
4/20/2021
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
4/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OATH OF RECEIVER
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
4/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2021
Description
EMF - Email Filed
Docket Date
4/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/14/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/14/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2021
Description
OAR - Order Appointing Receiver
Docket Date
4/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Appointing Receiver and Resume of Proposed Receiver P. Gregg Curry and Ankura Consulting Group
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/15/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATEMENT OF POSITION RE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Application for Appointment of Receiver
Filing Date
4/9/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE
Filing Date
4/8/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/8/2021
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
4/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
WHY RECEIVER SHOULD NOT BE APPOINTED
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons
Docket Date
4/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO RULE 4.1(C) / ART LENDER SERVICES LLC
Filing Date
4/5/2021
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
4/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Appointment of Receiver
Filing Date
4/5/2021
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
4/7/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Order to Show Cause
Filing Date
4/2/2021
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verified Complaint for Appointment of Receiver
Filing Date
4/2/2021
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
4/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
4/2/2021
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
4/2/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/13/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
5/13/2021
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
6/15/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/8/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/28/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/30/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/14/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.