« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2021-002607
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Viola
File Date:
2/17/2021
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Basil Brakell
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
DANIEL BRILL
Party Name
Robert J Gentz
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Sharon Briggs
Party Name
Dennis Ray Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Nancy Gentz
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Sharon Briggs
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2022
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/13/2022
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
9/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
8/3/2022
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2022
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
7/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Notice of Settlement
Filing Date
6/7/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S Notice of SERVICE OF Offer of Judgment to Defendant
Filing Date
5/6/2022
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
5/6/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2022
Description
351- Me: Excuse Arbitrator From List
Docket Date
4/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to be Relieved as Arbitrator
Filing Date
3/25/2022
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2022
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/16/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Peremptory Strike
Filing Date
3/10/2022
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE MOTION TO EXTEND MATTER ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR
Filing Date
3/4/2022
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
3/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS GENTZ’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO EXTEND MATTER ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR
Filing Date
2/22/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
2/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2022
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/23/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Matter on Dismissal Calendar
Filing Date
1/25/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
1/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/18/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF ARBITRATOR
Filing Date
12/21/2021
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE MOTION TO EXTEND MATTER ON DISMISSAL CALENDAR
Filing Date
11/30/2021
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Early Meeting Report
Filing Date
11/20/2021
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Matter on Dismissal Calendar
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
10/25/2021
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
10/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT DENNIS RAY HEMPHILL ONLY
Filing Date
9/30/2021
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
10/4/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WITHIN THE FIRM
Filing Date
9/22/2021
Description
NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Association of Counsel
Filing Date
6/1/2021
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
6/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2021
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT-EFILE BILLING $245
Filing Date
4/16/2021
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT J GENTZ
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NANCY GENTZ
Filing Date
2/17/2021
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Complaint
Filing Date
2/17/2021
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Date
2/17/2021
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To
Filing Date
2/17/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/17/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/17/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Filing Date
2/17/2021
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Summons
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/4/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.