Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2021-002205 Judge: Mikitish, Joseph
File Date: 2/9/2021 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Maricopa County Libertarian Party   Plaintiff    Michael Kielsky 
Maricopa County   Defendant    Joseph La Rue 
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors   Defendant    Joseph La Rue 
Clint Hickman   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Jack Sellers   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Steve Chucri   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Steve Gallardo   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Bill Gates   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Juanita Garza   Defendant  Female  Joseph La Rue 
Stephen Richer   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Reynaldo Valenzuela   Defendant  Male  Joseph La Rue 
Arizona Republican Party   Endorsement Case    Christopher Viskovic 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/4/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  3/4/2021   
3/3/2021  NOT - Notice  3/3/2021   
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants' Notice of Name of Counsel 
2/24/2021  004 - ME: Hearing Continued  2/24/2021   
2/24/2021  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  2/24/2021   
2/23/2021  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  2/24/2021   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
2/23/2021  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  2/23/2021   
NOTE: Maricopa County Defendants Notice of Appearance 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: REYNALDO VALENZUELA JR 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: STEVE GALLARDO 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: CLINT HICKMAN 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: BILL GATES 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: STEVEN CHUCRI 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: JUANITA GARZA 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: STEPHEN RICHER 
2/17/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/23/2021   
NOTE: JACK SELLERS 
2/11/2021  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  2/11/2021   
2/11/2021  MOT - Motion  2/12/2021   
NOTE: Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief 
2/11/2021  OSC - Order To Show Cause  2/16/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF HEARING 
2/9/2021  COM - Complaint  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Verified Complaint 
2/9/2021  PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause  2/9/2021   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
2/9/2021  CSH - Coversheet  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet 
2/9/2021  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
2/9/2021  SUM - Summons  2/9/2021   
NOTE: Summons 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
2/17/2021  13:30  Order To Show Cause 
2/23/2021  9:30  Order To Show Cause 
3/16/2021  13:30  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file