Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2020-095696 | Judge: | Coffey, Rodrick |
File Date: | 10/23/2020 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Charlene R Fernandez | Plaintiff | Female | James Barton |
David T Bradley | Plaintiff | Male | James Barton |
Commission On Appellate Court Appointments | Defendant | Michael Catlett | |
Robert Brutinel | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Ammon Barker | Defendant | Unknown | Pro Per |
Jaime Chamberlain | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Laura Ciscomani | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Buchanan Davis | Defendant | Unknown | Pro Per |
William Gresser | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Tracy Munsil | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Gerald Nabours | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Jonathan Paton | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Daniel Seiden | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Larry Suciu | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Kevin Taylor | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Kathryn Townsend | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Tina Vannucci | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Linley Wilson | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
James Zieler | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Karen Fann | Intervenor | Female | Thomas Basile |
Russell Bowers | Intervenor | Female | Thomas Basile |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
12/21/2020 | NOT - Notice | 12/21/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Firm and Address | |||
12/9/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 12/9/2020 | |
12/7/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 12/7/2020 | |
12/3/2020 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 12/3/2020 | |
11/30/2020 | REL - Reply | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
11/25/2020 | NOT - Notice | 11/30/2020 | |
NOTE: Joint Notice re Discovery Dispute | |||
11/24/2020 | RES - Response | 11/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Intervenors' Response in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
11/24/2020 | RES - Response | 11/25/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT???S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
11/20/2020 | ORD - Order | 11/20/2020 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
11/20/2020 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 11/23/2020 | |
NOTE: FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR SPECIAL ACTION | |||
11/18/2020 | REL - Reply | 11/19/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
11/17/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 11/18/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (EXPEDITED BRIEFING AND CONSIDERATION REQUESTED) | |||
11/17/2020 | MOT - Motion | 11/19/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
11/17/2020 | RES - Response | 11/19/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
11/16/2020 | ORD - Order | 11/16/2020 | |
NOTE: granting the Motion | |||
11/9/2020 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 11/12/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint FOR SPECIAL ACTION | |||
11/6/2020 | MOT - Motion | 11/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Serve Expedited Discovery Requests | |||
11/5/2020 | ANS - Answer | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: ANSWER OF INTERVENORS TO THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR SPECIAL ACTION | |||
10/30/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 10/30/2020 | |
10/29/2020 | RES - Response | 10/30/2020 | |
NOTE: Response of Intervenors to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order | |||
10/28/2020 | RES - Response | 10/29/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT COMMISSION ON APPELLATE COURT APPOINTMENTS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |||
10/28/2020 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 10/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice | |||
10/28/2020 | STP - Stipulation | 10/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation | |||
10/27/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 10/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
10/26/2020 | ORD - Order | 10/28/2020 | |
NOTE: SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
10/26/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 10/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance / CO CHRG $333 REC # 28002494 | |||
10/26/2020 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 10/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Intervene | |||
10/26/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 10/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
10/23/2020 | COM - Complaint | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Verified Complaint for Special Action | |||
10/23/2020 | APL - Application | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Application for Order to Show Cause | |||
10/23/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
10/23/2020 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
10/23/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/29/2020 | 10:30 | Order To Show Cause |
12/3/2020 | 15:00 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |