Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2020-093916 | Judge: | Coury, Christopher |
File Date: | 6/30/2020 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Mountainside Fitness Acquisitions L L C | Plaintiff | Joel Sannes | |
Douglas A Ducey | Defendant | Male | Brett Johnson |
Fitness Alliance L L C | Consolidated | Anthony Vitagliano |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/21/2020 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 9/24/2020 | |
9/21/2020 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 9/25/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL | |||
9/11/2020 | NOT - Notice | 9/15/2020 | |
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
9/9/2020 | AIX - Appeals Index | 9/9/2020 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
9/9/2020 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 9/9/2020 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
8/27/2020 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 8/28/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL | |||
8/27/2020 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 8/28/2020 | |
8/26/2020 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 8/27/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING SPECIAL ACTION | |||
8/24/2020 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 8/24/2020 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION FOR / WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
8/24/2020 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 8/25/2020 | |
8/24/2020 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 8/25/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING SPECIAL ACTION | |||
8/21/2020 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 8/21/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
8/19/2020 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 8/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Dismissal as to Fitness Alliance, LLC dba EOS Fitness' Claims, Only WITH PREJUDICE | |||
8/18/2020 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 8/18/2020 | |
8/18/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 8/18/2020 | |
8/17/2020 | NOT - Notice | 8/19/2020 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
8/16/2020 | REL - Reply | 8/18/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR CONTEMPT | |||
8/14/2020 | RES - Response | 8/18/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS' PETITION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT | |||
8/14/2020 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 8/17/2020 | |
8/13/2020 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 8/14/2020 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
8/13/2020 | AIX - Appeals Index | 8/14/2020 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
8/13/2020 | REQ - Request | 8/14/2020 | |
NOTE: Expedited Request for Court Reporter | |||
8/12/2020 | PTT - Petition | 8/13/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ PETITION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT | |||
8/12/2020 | REL - Reply | 8/13/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS EOS FITNES'?S COMPLAINT | |||
8/12/2020 | REL - Reply | 8/13/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS MOUNTAINSIDE'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
8/10/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 8/10/2020 | |
8/10/2020 | NOT - Notice | 8/11/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF POSTING OF ATTESTATION APPLICATION, REVIEW, AND APPROVAL PROCESS FOR FITNESS CENTERS ORDERED CLOSED BY EXECUTIVE ORDER 2020-43 | |||
8/6/2020 | RES - Response | 8/7/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
8/6/2020 | RES - Response | 8/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Fitness Alliance, LLC dba EOS Fitness' Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay Enforcement of Preliminary Injunction | |||
8/5/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 8/5/2020 | |
8/5/2020 | NOT - Notice | 8/5/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF POSTING OF UPDATED REQUIREMENTS | |||
8/5/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 8/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Notice of Appeal / Co-Chg $100.00 Rec # 27894282 | |||
8/5/2020 | MOT - Motion | 8/6/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
8/5/2020 | NOT - Notice | 8/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Errata | |||
8/4/2020 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 8/6/2020 | |
8/4/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 8/4/2020 | |
8/3/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
8/2/2020 | MOT - Motion | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT LIST | |||
8/2/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ NOTICE OF FILING SIGNATURE PAGE OF DECLARANT BLAIR MCHANEY | |||
8/2/2020 | MEM - Memorandum | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Bench Memorandum Executive Privilege | |||
8/1/2020 | NOT - Notice | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF POSTING OF ATTESTATION FORM | |||
8/1/2020 | REQ - Request | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REQUEST FOR RULE 37(C)(4) ADMISSION OF EXHIBITS 59–68 | |||
7/31/2020 | REQ - Request | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: Expedited Request for Court Reporter | |||
7/31/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSIVE DECLARATIONS | |||
7/31/2020 | NOT - Notice | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Rebuttal Declarations | |||
7/31/2020 | REQ - Request | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR RULE 37(C)(4)-(5) ADMISSION OF EXHIBITS 19-53 | |||
7/31/2020 | REQ - Request | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR RULE 37(C)(4)-(5) ADMISSION OF EXHIBITS 19-58 | |||
7/31/2020 | RES - Response | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff EOS Fitness Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss | |||
7/31/2020 | RES - Response | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
7/31/2020 | REQ - Request | 8/3/2020 | |
NOTE: EXPEDITED / FOR COURT REPORTER | |||
7/30/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 7/30/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION | |||
7/30/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 7/30/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
7/29/2020 | NOT - Notice | 7/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Declarations | |||
7/29/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 7/29/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATIONS AND DISCLOSURE OF EXPECTED TESTIMONY | |||
7/29/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 7/29/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATIONS | |||
7/29/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 7/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Limited Appearance | |||
7/28/2020 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 7/28/2020 | |
7/24/2020 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 7/28/2020 | |
7/24/2020 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 7/28/2020 | |
7/24/2020 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 7/28/2020 | |
7/24/2020 | APL - Application | 7/24/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF EOS FITNESS' RENEWED APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
7/24/2020 | MOT - Motion | 7/24/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Join Order to Show Cause Hearing July 27, 2020 | |||
7/24/2020 | RES - Response | 7/24/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO MOUNTAINSIDE’S AND EOS’S RENEWED APPLICATIONS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF | |||
7/24/2020 | APL - Application | 7/24/2020 | |
NOTE: Supplement to Renewed TRO Application | |||
7/22/2020 | APL - Application | 7/23/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ RENEWED APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF | |||
7/22/2020 | PTT - Petition | 7/23/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S PETITION FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
7/13/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 7/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Fitness Alliance, LLC, dba EOS Fitness' Notice of Appeal / eFile Billing $100.00 | |||
7/13/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 7/13/2020 | |
7/13/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 7/15/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS EOS'S COMPLAINT/ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED | |||
7/10/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 7/10/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS’ NOTICE OF APPEAL / eFile Billing $100.00 | |||
7/9/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/16/2020 | |
NOTE: DOUGLAS A DUCEY | |||
7/8/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 7/8/2020 | |
7/7/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 7/7/2020 | |
7/7/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 7/8/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS MOUNTAINSIDES FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
7/5/2020 | RES - Response | 7/7/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO MOUNTAINSIDE FITNESS' SUPPLEMENT TO ITS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER | |||
7/5/2020 | RES - Response | 7/7/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF FITNESS ALLIANCE LLC'S VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH NOTICE AND MOTION FOR PERMANENT AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
7/4/2020 | APL - Application | 7/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff Mountainside Fitness' Supplement to its Application for Temporary Restraining Order | |||
7/4/2020 | RES - Response | 7/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff Mountainside Fitness' Response to defendant's Motion to Dismiss | |||
7/4/2020 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 7/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff Mountainside Fitness Acquisitions, LLC First Amended Complaint | |||
7/2/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 7/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
7/2/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/8/2020 | |
NOTE: DOUGLAS A DUCEY | |||
7/2/2020 | MOT - Motion | 7/2/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT | |||
7/2/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 7/2/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT | |||
7/2/2020 | RES - Response | 7/2/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S VERIFIED APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH NOTICE AND MOTION FOR PERMANENT AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
7/2/2020 | 053 - ME: Case Consolidation | 7/2/2020 | |
7/2/2020 | MOT - Motion | 7/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Expedited Motion For Transfer Or Alternatively Consolidation Pursuant To Superior Court Local Rules, Maricopa County Rule 3.1(C) And Ariz. R. Civ. P. 42 And Request Joint Hearing On Pending Applications For Temporary Restraining Orders | |||
7/2/2020 | NOT - Notice | 7/6/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING EXPEDITED MOTION FOR TRANSFER OR ALTERNATIVELY CONSOLIDATION PURSUANT TO SUPERIOR COURT LOCAL RULES, MARICOPA COUNTY RULE 3.1(C) AND ARIZ. R. CIV. P. 42 AND REQUEST JOINT HEARING ON PENDING APPLICATIONS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS | |||
7/2/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 7/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
7/1/2020 | ORD - Order | 7/2/2020 | |
NOTE: TO APPEAR | |||
6/30/2020 | COM - Complaint | 6/30/2020 | |
6/30/2020 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 6/30/2020 | |
6/30/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 6/30/2020 | |
6/30/2020 | PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause | 6/30/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS | |||
6/30/2020 | APL - Application | 6/30/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED / FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH NOTICE AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/6/2020 | 9:00 | Emergency Hearing |
7/9/2020 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
7/27/2020 | 9:00 | Order To Show Cause |
8/3/2020 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
8/17/2020 | 13:30 | Hearing |
8/24/2020 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |