Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2020-050103 Judge: Agne, Sara
File Date: 1/7/2020 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Sabin Burrell   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan Schultz 
Bluume Holdings L L C   Defendant    Walter Ulrich 
Rhett Doolittle   Defendant  Unknown  Walter Ulrich 
Bluume L L C   Defendant    Walter Ulrich 
Business Warrior Corporation   Defendant    Walter Ulrich 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/26/2022  375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar  4/26/2022   
4/18/2022  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  4/22/2022   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement 
3/16/2022  NOT - Notice  3/22/2022   
NOTE: Notice Concerning Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute 
3/15/2022  019 - ME: Ruling  3/15/2022   
3/14/2022  MOT - Motion  3/17/2022   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY 
3/10/2022  ORD - Order  3/10/2022   
NOTE: ORDER MODIFYING SUBPOENA 
3/9/2022  STA - Statement  3/13/2022   
NOTE: Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute 
3/9/2022  NOT - Notice  3/13/2022   
NOTE: Notice of Errata 
3/7/2022  RES - Response  3/11/2022   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO NATIONAL PAYMENT SYSTEMS, LLC’S MOTION TO MODIFY SUBPOENA 
2/22/2022  RNM - Returned Mail  2/22/2022   
NOTE:  
2/4/2022  MOT - Motion  2/11/2022   
NOTE: National Payment Systems, LLC's Motion to Modify Subpoena 
2/4/2022  CER - Certificate  2/11/2022   
NOTE: THIRD PARTY NATIONAL PAYMENT SYSTEMS, LLC’S GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION CERTIFICATE 
1/26/2022  ORD - Order  2/1/2022   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement Conference 
1/20/2022  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  1/20/2022   
1/20/2022  SCO – Scheduling Order  1/20/2022   
NOTE: AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 
1/14/2022  STP - Stipulation  1/18/2022   
NOTE: Stipulation for Extension of Deposition Deadline 
12/30/2021  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  12/30/2021   
12/23/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  12/23/2021   
12/23/2021  SCO – Scheduling Order  12/23/2021   
NOTE: AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 
12/14/2021  MTA - Motion To Amend  12/16/2021   
NOTE: Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order 
11/16/2021  ORD - Order  11/16/2021   
NOTE: JOINT PROTECTIVE 
11/9/2021  STP - Stipulation  11/15/2021   
NOTE: Stipulation for ENTRY OF Protective Order 
7/8/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  7/8/2021   
7/8/2021  SCO – Scheduling Order  7/8/2021   
NOTE: AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 
6/30/2021  MTA - Motion To Amend  7/1/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Amend THE Scheduling Order 
6/25/2021  ANS - Answer  6/29/2021   
NOTE: Defendants' Answer to Second Amended Complaint Demand for Jury Trial 
3/17/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  3/17/2021   
3/17/2021  SCO – Scheduling Order  3/17/2021   
NOTE: AMENDED 
3/12/2021  MTA - Motion To Amend  3/15/2021   
NOTE: STIPULATED MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER 
2/23/2021  SUM - Summons  2/24/2021   
2/22/2021  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  2/25/2021   
NOTE: BUSINESS WARRIOR CORPORATION 
12/31/2020  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  12/31/2020   
12/31/2020  SCO – Scheduling Order  12/31/2020   
NOTE: AMENDED / 
12/18/2020  MTA - Motion To Amend  12/21/2020   
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order 
10/21/2020  ORD - Order  10/21/2020   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE 
10/19/2020  EMF - Email Filed  10/21/2020   
10/15/2020  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  10/16/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Associate Peter N. Kessler As Counsel Pro Hac Vice 
9/14/2020  AMC - Amended Complaint  9/15/2020   
NOTE: Second Amended Complaint 
9/4/2020  ORD - Order  9/4/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT 
8/4/2020  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set  8/4/2020   
7/29/2020  SCO – Scheduling Order  7/29/2020   
NOTE: Order 
7/20/2020  MTA - Motion To Amend  7/22/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Amend Complaint 
7/14/2020  041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set  7/14/2020   
7/10/2020  REP - Report  7/13/2020   
NOTE: Joint Report 
5/4/2020  019 - ME: Ruling  5/4/2020   
3/24/2020  REL - Reply  3/25/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiff Sabin Burrell's Answer to Defendants Bluume, LLC and Bluume Holdings, LLC's Counterclaims and Third Party Claims 
3/17/2020  AMC - Amended Complaint  3/19/2020   
NOTE: First Amended Complaint 
3/17/2020  RES - Response  3/19/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Rhett Doolittle's RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF SABIN BURRELL’S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 
3/12/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  3/13/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
3/11/2020  NAC - Notice of Assignment to Commercial Court  3/11/2020   
2/28/2020  ANS - Answer  3/3/2020   
NOTE: Answer and Counterclaims of Bluume LLC and Bluume Holdings, LLC/EFILE BILLING $245 
2/28/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  3/3/2020   
NOTE: DEFENDANT RHETT DOOLITTLE’S RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF SABIN BURRELL’S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 
2/20/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  2/20/2020   
2/17/2020  AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default  2/19/2020   
NOTE: Application and Affidavit for Default 
2/17/2020  AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default  2/19/2020   
NOTE: Application and Affidavit for Default 
2/17/2020  AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default  2/19/2020   
NOTE: Application and Affidavit for Default 
1/10/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/14/2020   
NOTE: RHETT DOOLITTLE 
1/10/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/14/2020   
NOTE: BLUUME HOLDINGS LLC 
1/10/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/14/2020   
NOTE: BLUUME LLC 
1/10/2020  SUM - Summons  1/13/2020   
1/10/2020  SUM - Summons  1/13/2020   
1/10/2020  SUM - Summons  1/13/2020   
1/7/2020  COM - Complaint  1/13/2020   
1/7/2020  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  1/13/2020   
1/7/2020  CSH - Coversheet  1/13/2020   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/28/2020  9:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
4/15/2021  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
6/15/2021  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
10/4/2021  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
3/18/2022  8:30  Civil Settlement Conference 
3/18/2022  9:30  Civil Settlement Conference 
4/19/2022  9:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
5/4/2022  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
6/1/2022  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file