Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2020-016042 | Judge: | Hannah, John |
File Date: | 12/9/2020 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Gregory Brown | Plaintiff | Male | John Charland |
Phoenix Newspapers Inc | Defendant | David Bodney | |
Central Newspapers Inc | Defendant | Jay Zweig | |
Gannet Co Inc | Defendant | David Bodney | |
News Media Investment Group Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
James Allen Robertson | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Robert John Bresee | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Bonnie Strong | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/6/2023 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 6/6/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING LAWSUIT WITH PREJUDICE | |||
5/4/2023 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 5/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice | |||
3/10/2023 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 3/10/2023 | |
3/6/2023 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 3/6/2023 | |
3/6/2023 | STA - Statement | 3/8/2023 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Statement of Rule 26(d) Discovery Dispute CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS REASONABLY CALCULATED TO LEAD TO ADMISSIBLE EVIDENCE AND CONSISTENT WITH THE COURTS DIRECTIVE RULE 36(B)(6) NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | |||
3/3/2023 | STA - Statement | 3/8/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S RULE 26(d) STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE REGARDING DOCUMENT REVIEW | |||
3/3/2023 | STA - Statement | 3/8/2023 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S RULE 26(d) STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE REGARDING PLAINTIFF’S OVERBROAD 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION NOTICE | |||
3/3/2023 | CER - Certificate | 3/8/2023 | |
NOTE: NEWSPAPER DEFENDANTS’ GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION CERTIFICATE | |||
3/1/2023 | MOT - Motion | 3/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion for a 1 Month Extension of Time TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY AND RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
3/1/2023 | DCL - Declaration | 3/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Declaration of John E Charland | |||
3/1/2023 | CER - Certificate | 3/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Good Faith Consultation Certificate | |||
3/1/2023 | MOT - Motion | 3/4/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion for Expedited Hearing | |||
2/24/2023 | NOT - Notice | 3/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs Notice of Rule 26(d) Discovery Dispute | |||
2/24/2023 | CER - Certificate | 3/1/2023 | |
NOTE: Good Faith Consultation Certificate | |||
2/21/2023 | REL - Reply | 2/24/2023 | |
NOTE: Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint | |||
2/16/2023 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 2/16/2023 | |
2/7/2023 | RES - Response | 2/10/2023 | |
NOTE: PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S THIRD MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |||
2/2/2023 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 2/2/2023 | |
1/19/2023 | CER - Certificate | 1/23/2023 | |
NOTE: RULE 7.1(H) Good Faith Consultation Certificate | |||
1/19/2023 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 1/23/2023 | |
NOTE: Motion to Amend Complaint | |||
12/16/2022 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued | 12/16/2022 | |
12/16/2022 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset | 12/16/2022 | |
12/14/2022 | REL - Reply | 12/15/2022 | |
NOTE: Reply Brief in Support of Rule 56(d) Motion FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
12/13/2022 | RES - Response | 12/14/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC.’S, CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC.’S, AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S RULE 56(D) MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
12/12/2022 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 12/12/2022 | |
12/5/2022 | MOT - Motion | 12/6/2022 | |
NOTE: Rule 56(d) Motion for an Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
12/5/2022 | DCL - Declaration | 12/6/2022 | |
NOTE: Declaration of John E Charland | |||
12/5/2022 | CER - Certificate | 12/6/2022 | |
NOTE: Good Faith Consultation Certificate | |||
11/22/2022 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 11/22/2022 | |
NOTE: PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
11/22/2022 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 11/22/2022 | |
NOTE: PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
11/22/2022 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/23/2022 | |
NOTE: Affidavit of Service of Subpoena in a Civil Case | |||
11/16/2022 | 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset | 11/16/2022 | |
10/24/2022 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 10/24/2022 | |
10/21/2022 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 10/21/2022 | |
10/21/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/21/2022 | |
10/4/2022 | NOT - Notice | 10/7/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Discovery Dispute Notice | |||
10/4/2022 | CER - Certificate | 10/7/2022 | |
NOTE: Good Faith Consultation Certificate | |||
9/30/2022 | ANS - Answer | 10/5/2022 | |
NOTE: Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint | |||
9/26/2022 | RES - Response | 9/27/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC.’S, CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC.’S, AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’ ANSWER OR TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS AND EXTEND DEADLINES | |||
9/7/2022 | CER - Certificate | 9/13/2022 | |
NOTE: Rule 7.1(h) Good Faith Consultation Certificate | |||
9/7/2022 | MOT - Motion | 9/13/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Strike Defendants' Answer or to Impose Sanctions and Extend Deadlines | |||
9/6/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 9/6/2022 | |
9/6/2022 | CER - Certificate | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: Certificate of Mailing of Second Amended Complaint | |||
9/5/2022 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 9/9/2022 | |
NOTE: Second Amended Complaint | |||
8/26/2022 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 8/26/2022 | |
8/24/2022 | NOT - Notice | 8/29/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CAUSE OF ACTION FOR VIOLATION OF A.R.S. § 13- 3620(a)(5)&(6) IN PENDING MOTION TO AMEND | |||
8/23/2022 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 8/23/2022 | |
8/15/2022 | NOT - Notice | 8/24/2022 | |
NOTE: GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION CERTIFICATE | |||
8/15/2022 | STA - Statement | 8/24/2022 | |
NOTE: UPDATED JOINT / OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE | |||
8/12/2022 | CER - Certificate | 8/24/2022 | |
NOTE: NEWSPAPER DEFENDANTS GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION / | |||
8/12/2022 | STA - Statement | 8/24/2022 | |
NOTE: NEWSPAPER DEFENDANTS / OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE | |||
7/14/2022 | ORD - Order | 7/16/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Settlement Conference | |||
6/30/2022 | 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset | 6/30/2022 | |
6/22/2022 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 6/22/2022 | |
6/15/2022 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 6/15/2022 | |
5/31/2022 | STA - Statement | 6/1/2022 | |
NOTE: Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Revised Motion to Amend Complaint | |||
5/19/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/19/2022 | |
5/19/2022 | 041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set | 5/19/2022 | |
5/19/2022 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 5/19/2022 | |
NOTE: Order | |||
5/19/2022 | RES - Response | 5/21/2022 | |
NOTE: PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S REVISED MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |||
5/18/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/18/2022 | |
5/13/2022 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 5/16/2022 | |
NOTE: Application for Entry of Default | |||
5/13/2022 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 5/16/2022 | |
NOTE: Affidavit of Default | |||
4/25/2022 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 4/28/2022 | |
NOTE: Revised and Amended Motion to Amend Complaint | |||
4/11/2022 | RES - Response | 4/14/2022 | |
NOTE: PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |||
3/22/2022 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 3/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Amend Complaint | |||
3/21/2022 | NOT - Notice | 3/25/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging | |||
3/17/2022 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 3/17/2022 | |
3/8/2022 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 3/12/2022 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC. | |||
2/25/2022 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 2/25/2022 | |
2/23/2022 | REL - Reply | 2/25/2022 | |
NOTE: Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines | |||
2/23/2022 | REL - Reply | 2/25/2022 | |
NOTE: Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel | |||
2/17/2022 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 2/17/2022 | |
2/11/2022 | RES - Response | 2/18/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC.’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES | |||
2/4/2022 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 2/4/2022 | |
2/2/2022 | REL - Reply | 2/8/2022 | |
NOTE: Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel | |||
2/2/2022 | STA - Statement | 2/9/2022 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC.’S RULE 26(d) STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE | |||
2/2/2022 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 2/2/2022 | |
2/2/2022 | ORD - Order | 2/2/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL | |||
1/25/2022 | STA - Statement | 1/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Statement of Disclosure Dispute | |||
1/25/2022 | CER - Certificate | 1/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Rule 7.1(h) Good Faith Consultation Certificiate | |||
1/24/2022 | CER - Certificate | 1/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Rule 7.1(h) Good Faith Consultation Certificate | |||
1/24/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines | |||
1/19/2022 | STP - Stipulation | 1/25/2022 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS PHOENIX NEWSPAPERS, INC., CENTRAL NEWSPAPERS, INC. AND GANNETT CO., INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL | |||
12/27/2021 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 12/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Compel | |||
12/27/2021 | STA - Statement | 12/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Separate Statement of Counsel | |||
11/5/2021 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 11/9/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Dismissal of James Allen Robertson | |||
9/23/2021 | 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal | 9/23/2021 | |
8/27/2021 | NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney | 9/1/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel | |||
8/6/2021 | ORD - Order | 8/6/2021 | |
NOTE: RE Motion to Extend Time to Substitute Another Person for Defendant Robert John Bresee | |||
6/28/2021 | MOT - Motion | 6/29/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Extend Time to Substitute Another Person for Defendant Robert JOHN Bresee | |||
6/21/2021 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 6/21/2021 | |
6/21/2021 | 041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set | 6/21/2021 | |
6/21/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/21/2021 | |
6/18/2021 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 6/23/2021 | |
6/11/2021 | REP - Report | 6/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Joint Report from Plaintiff and Corporate Defendants | |||
6/4/2021 | ORD - Order | 6/4/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER plaintiff’s motion for the recovery of costs and attorney fees | |||
5/10/2021 | OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service | 5/10/2021 | |
4/28/2021 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 4/29/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Dismissal of New Media Investment Group, LLC Named in the Complaint as New Media Investment Group Inc | |||
4/23/2021 | MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service | 4/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Robert Bresee or his Substitute | |||
4/22/2021 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 4/24/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendant Bonnie Strong's named in the complaint as Jane Doe Robertson's, Waiver of Service of Summons | |||
4/21/2021 | NOT - Notice | 4/23/2021 | |
NOTE: Suggestion of Death | |||
3/29/2021 | ANS - Answer | 3/30/2021 | |
NOTE: Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint/ eFile Billing $245.00 | |||
3/8/2021 | OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service | 3/8/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendants Bresee | |||
2/23/2021 | MOT - Motion | 2/25/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion for the Recovery of Costs for Service of Process | |||
2/18/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/23/2021 | |
NOTE: JAMES ALLEN ROBERTSON | |||
2/5/2021 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 2/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendant Phoenix Newspapers, Inc.'s Waiver of Service of Summons | |||
2/5/2021 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 2/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendant Central Newspapers, Inc.'s Waiver of Service of Summons | |||
2/5/2021 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 2/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Defendant Gannett Co., Inc.'s Waiver of Service of Summons | |||
12/29/2020 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 12/30/2020 | |
NOTE: First Amended Complaint | |||
12/9/2020 | COM - Complaint | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Complaint | |||
12/9/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
12/9/2020 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
12/9/2020 | SUM - Summons | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
2/14/2022 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
3/4/2022 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
7/1/2022 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
7/6/2022 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/26/2022 | 10:30 | Oral Argument |
8/26/2022 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
9/6/2022 | 9:00 | Civil Settlement Conference |
9/16/2022 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/18/2022 | 10:30 | Oral Argument |
11/18/2022 | 10:30 | Oral Argument |
12/14/2022 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/14/2022 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
1/20/2023 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
1/20/2023 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
2/13/2023 | 10:15 | Status Conference |
3/6/2023 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |