Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2020-015285 | Judge: | Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer |
File Date: | 11/24/2020 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Kelli Ward | Plaintiff | Female | Dennis Wilenchik |
Constance Jackson | Defendant | Female | Sarah Gonski |
Felicia Rotellini | Defendant | Female | Sarah Gonski |
Fred Yamashita | Defendant | Male | Sarah Gonski |
James McLaughlin | Defendant | Male | Sarah Gonski |
Jonathan Nez | Defendant | Male | Sarah Gonski |
Luis Alberto Heredia | Defendant | Male | Sarah Gonski |
Ned Norris | Defendant | Male | Sarah Gonski |
Regina Romero | Defendant | Female | Sarah Gonski |
Sandra D Kennedy | Defendant | Female | Sarah Gonski |
Stephen Roe Lewis | Defendant | Male | Sarah Gonski |
Steve Gallardo | Defendant | Male | Sarah Gonski |
Katie Hobbs | Intervenor | Female | Roopali Desai |
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors | Intervenor | Joseph La Rue | |
Adrian Fontes | Intervenor | Male | Joseph La Rue |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
3/17/2021 | MAN - Order Of Mandate | 3/18/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT | |||
2/4/2021 | JUD - Judgment | 2/4/2021 | |
NOTE: FINAL | |||
1/5/2021 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 1/5/2021 | |
NOTE: FOR BRUCE V. SPIVA | |||
1/5/2021 | NOT - Notice | 1/6/2021 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State Katie Hobbs' Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment | |||
12/23/2020 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 12/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Bruce V. Spiva | |||
12/22/2020 | ORD - Order | 12/22/2020 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT OF ARIZONA | |||
12/9/2020 | ORD - Order | 12/10/2020 | |
12/8/2020 | LET - Letter | 12/9/2020 | |
12/8/2020 | LET - Letter | 12/9/2020 | |
12/8/2020 | ORD - Order | 12/9/2020 | |
12/8/2020 | ORD - Order | 12/9/2020 | |
12/8/2020 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
12/8/2020 | AIX - Appeals Index | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
12/7/2020 | ORD - Order | 12/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Supreme Court of Arizona | |||
12/4/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 12/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
12/4/2020 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 12/4/2020 | |
12/4/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 12/4/2020 | |
12/4/2020 | 901 - ME: Judgment | 12/4/2020 | |
12/4/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 12/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal | |||
12/3/2020 | 048 - ME: Informal Conference | 12/3/2020 | |
12/3/2020 | 048 - ME: Informal Conference | 12/3/2020 | |
12/3/2020 | NOT - Notice | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law | |||
12/3/2020 | MOT - Motion | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: The Lincoln Project's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief | |||
12/3/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS' NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT LIST | |||
12/2/2020 | MOT - Motion | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: County Intervenors' Motion to Seal Exhibit 89 | |||
12/2/2020 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO INTERVENE UNDER RULE 24 - EFILE BILLING $333 | |||
12/2/2020 | DCL - Declaration | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION OF NAHSHON GARRETT | |||
12/2/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary Of State?s Motion To Dismiss -And- Pre-Hearing Memorandum | |||
12/2/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS AND PRE-TRIAL BRIEF | |||
12/2/2020 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 12/2/2020 | |
12/2/2020 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Compel or Motion for Continued Inspection | |||
12/2/2020 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Intervene / CO-CHG $333.00 R#28042286 | |||
12/2/2020 | NOT - Notice | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Proposed Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law. | |||
12/2/2020 | NOT - Notice | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS | |||
12/2/2020 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS' WITNESS LIST | |||
12/2/2020 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Intervenors Maricopa County's and Maricopa County Recorder Adrian Fontes' Witness and Exhibit List | |||
12/2/2020 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs Witness and Exhibit List | |||
12/1/2020 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 12/1/2020 | |
12/1/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/3/2020 | |
12/1/2020 | ORD - Order | 12/1/2020 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ALLOW SECRETARY OF STATES PARTY REPRESENTATIVE AT INSPECTION | |||
12/1/2020 | MOT - Motion | 12/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary Of State?s Motion For Leave To Allow Party Representative At Inspection | |||
12/1/2020 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 12/1/2020 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA SECRETARY OF STATE KATIE HOBBS’ OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER’S RULE 27 PETITION | |||
11/30/2020 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 12/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Verified Amended Complaint | |||
11/30/2020 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 11/30/2020 | |
NOTE: Arizona Secretary Of State Katie Hobbs? Motion To Intervene | |||
11/25/2020 | 087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued | 11/25/2020 | |
11/24/2020 | COM - Complaint | 11/24/2020 | |
11/24/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 11/24/2020 | |
11/24/2020 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 11/24/2020 | |
11/24/2020 | APL - Application | 11/24/2020 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND FOR ORDER GRANTING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE BY PUBLICATION |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
11/30/2020 | 10:30 | Order To Show Cause |
12/3/2020 | 10:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
12/4/2020 | 9:15 | Evidentiary Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
2/4/2021 | A: | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
12/4/2020 | A: | One Time | Judgment Only |