Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2020-014083 | Judge: | Blaney, Scott |
File Date: | 11/4/2020 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Laurie Aguilera | Plaintiff | Female | Alexander Kolodin |
Adrian Fontes | Defendant | Male | Joseph La Rue |
Fran McCarroll | Defendant | Female | Joseph La Rue |
Clint Hickman | Defendant | Male | Joseph La Rue |
Jack Sellers | Defendant | Male | Joseph La Rue |
Steve Chucri | Defendant | Male | Joseph La Rue |
Bill Gates | Defendant | Male | Joseph La Rue |
Steve Gallardo | Defendant | Male | Joseph La Rue |
Maricopa County | Defendant | Joseph La Rue | |
Arizona Democratic Party | Intervenor | Sarah Gonski | |
Donovan Drobina | Plaintiff | Male | Alexander Kolodin |
Donald J Trump For President Inc | Intervenor | Brett Johnson | |
Republican National Committee | Intervenor | Brett Johnson | |
Katie Hobbs | Endorsement Case | Female | Roopali Desai |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/9/2020 | RES - Response | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE OF REPUBLICAN PARTY INTERVENORS TO THE SECRETARY OF STATE’S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE | |||
11/9/2020 | NOT - Notice | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Case Assignment | |||
11/9/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 11/9/2020 | |
11/8/2020 | MTT - Motion To Transfer | 11/9/2020 | |
NOTE: SECRETARY OF STATE’S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES | |||
11/7/2020 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 11/7/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL / WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
11/6/2020 | STA - Statement | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State's Amicus Curiae Brief | |||
11/6/2020 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | MOT - Motion | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief | |||
11/6/2020 | STA - Statement | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: JOINT SCHEDULING STATEMENT AND RULE 7.1(H) GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF JOINT SCHEDULING STATEMENT | |||
11/6/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 11/6/2020 | |
11/6/2020 | ORD - Order | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: GRANTING SECRETARY OF STATES MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF | |||
11/5/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: CLINT HICKMAN | |||
11/5/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: BILL GATES | |||
11/5/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: ADRIAN FONTES | |||
11/5/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: STEVE GALLARDO | |||
11/5/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: STEVE CHUCRI | |||
11/5/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: FRAN MCCARROLL | |||
11/5/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: JACK SELLERS | |||
11/5/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/2020 | |
NOTE: MARICOPA COUNTY | |||
11/5/2020 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 11/5/2020 | |
11/5/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 11/5/2020 | |
11/5/2020 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 11/5/2020 | |
11/5/2020 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA DEMOCRATIC PARTY’S MOTION TO INTERVENE - EFILE BILLING $333 | |||
11/5/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/5/2020 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion for Association of Counsel Pro Hac Vice | |||
11/5/2020 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR A SPECIAL ACTION | |||
11/5/2020 | MTI – Motion to Intervene | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Intervene / eFile Billing $333.00 | |||
11/5/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 11/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
11/5/2020 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 11/18/2020 | |
11/4/2020 | COM - Complaint | 11/4/2020 | |
11/4/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 11/4/2020 | |
NOTE: CIVIL COVER SHEET | |||
11/4/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 11/4/2020 | |
NOTE: SPECIAL ACTION COVERSHEET | |||
11/4/2020 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 11/4/2020 | |
11/4/2020 | APL - Application | 11/4/2020 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
11/4/2020 | 087 - ME: Order To Show Cause Issued | 11/4/2020 | |
11/4/2020 | NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right | 11/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Judge |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
11/5/2020 | 15:30 | Order To Show Cause |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |