Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2020-012873 | Judge: | Astrowsky, Brad |
File Date: | 10/13/2020 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Arizona Democratic Party | Plaintiff | John Gray | |
Adrian Fontes | Defendant | Male | Joseph La Rue |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/22/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 10/22/2020 | |
10/22/2020 | 901 - ME: Judgment | 10/22/2020 | |
10/21/2020 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 11/2/2020 | |
10/21/2020 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued | 10/21/2020 | |
10/19/2020 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/19/2020 | |
NOTE: Opposition to ADP'S Special Action and OSC Application Re: Public Records Request dated Sept 1, 2020 | |||
10/19/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 10/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
10/15/2020 | SUM - Summons | 10/16/2020 | |
10/15/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 10/19/2020 | |
NOTE: ADRIAN FONTES | |||
10/14/2020 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 10/15/2020 | |
NOTE: FOR STATUTORY SPECIAL ACTION | |||
10/13/2020 | COM - Complaint | 10/13/2020 | |
10/13/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 10/13/2020 | |
10/13/2020 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 10/13/2020 | |
10/13/2020 | DCL - Declaration | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL NORTON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR STATUTORY SPECIAL ACTION | |||
10/13/2020 | APL - Application | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR STATUTORY SPECIAL ACTION AND EMERGENCY REQUEST FOR HEARING |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/19/2020 | 15:30 | Order To Show Cause |
10/20/2020 | 13:30 | Order To Show Cause |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
10/22/2020 | F:Adrian Fontes | One Time | Judgment Only | ||
A: Arizona Democratic Party |