Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2020-011845 | Judge: | Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer |
File Date: | 9/25/2020 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Adrian Fontes | Plaintiff | Male | Joshua Bendor |
State Of Arizona | Defendant | Michael Catlett | |
Katie Hobbs | Defendant | Female | Roopali Desai |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/14/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/14/2020 | |
10/12/2020 | RES - Response | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Response to the State's Motion for Reconsideration | |||
10/12/2020 | RES - Response | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE ARIZONA CENTER FOR DISABILITY LAW AND ARIZONA CENTER FOR LAW IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST | |||
10/12/2020 | RES - Response | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Secretary of State Response to Attorney General Motion for Reconsideration | |||
10/7/2020 | 906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set | 10/7/2020 | |
10/7/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 10/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
10/6/2020 | 901 - ME: Judgment | 10/6/2020 | |
10/6/2020 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE’S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER REGARDING PRESERVATION OF BALLOTS CAST WITH SPECIAL ELECTION BOARDS | |||
10/2/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 10/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
10/2/2020 | NOT - Notice | 10/2/2020 | |
NOTE: State's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Special Action or Injunctive Relief / Co-Chg $245.00 rec # 27970594 | |||
10/2/2020 | RES - Response | 10/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Secretary Of State's Response To Attorney General's Motion For Special Action And Injunctive Relief | |||
10/2/2020 | STA - Statement | 10/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Brief | |||
10/2/2020 | STA - Statement | 10/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Brief of Amici Curiae Arizona Center for Disability Law, Arizona Center for Law in the Public Intere | |||
9/30/2020 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 9/30/2020 | |
9/30/2020 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 9/30/2020 | |
9/29/2020 | CLM - Claim | 9/29/2020 | |
NOTE: State's Counterclaim and Cross Claim | |||
9/29/2020 | MOT - Motion | 9/29/2020 | |
NOTE: State's Emergency Motion for Special Action or Injunctive Relief | |||
9/29/2020 | APL - Application | 9/29/2020 | |
NOTE: State's Emergency Application for Order to Show Cause | |||
9/25/2020 | COM - Complaint | 9/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Complaint for Declaratory Relief | |||
9/25/2020 | PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause | 9/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Application for Order to Show Cause | |||
9/25/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 9/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Civil Cover Sheet | |||
9/25/2020 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 9/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To | |||
9/25/2020 | SUM - Summons | 9/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons | |||
9/25/2020 | SUM - Summons | 9/25/2020 | |
NOTE: Summons |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
9/29/2020 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
10/5/2020 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
10/6/2020 | A: | One Time | Judgment Only |