« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2020-010383
Judge:
Warner, Randall
File Date:
8/26/2020
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Robert Kirkwood
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Frank Verderame
Party Name
City Of Scottsdale
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Lindsey Gomez-Gray
Party Name
Scottsdale Police Department
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Lindsey Gomez-Gray
Party Name
Nathan Stephenson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Lindsey Gomez-Gray
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2022
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
6/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/6/2022
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice
Filing Date
5/10/2022
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
5/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2022
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
5/9/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Conditional Settlement Pending City Council Approval
Filing Date
3/29/2022
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
3/29/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
3/21/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/25/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
1/13/2022
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
1/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
1/5/2022
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order
Filing Date
12/15/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
12/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
12/13/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION DUE TO JUDICIAL ERROR
Filing Date
12/2/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration
Filing Date
11/23/2021
Description
906 - ME: Response/Reply Times Set
Docket Date
11/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
11/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Reconsideration
Filing Date
11/9/2021
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF NONPARTY AT FAULT
Filing Date
10/21/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/22/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF NONPARTY AT FAULT
Filing Date
10/14/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF NONPARTY AT FAULT AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO NAME A NON-PARTY AT FAULT
Filing Date
10/8/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF NONPARTY AT FAULT
Filing Date
10/1/2021
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Non-Party at Fault
Filing Date
5/3/2021
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
5/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2021
Description
JSR – Joint Scheduling Report
Docket Date
4/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report
Filing Date
4/20/2021
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
4/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Filing Date
3/23/2021
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/23/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
City Defendants Answer to Complaint / CO-CHG $245.00 R# 28182160
Filing Date
11/16/2020
Description
WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons
Docket Date
11/18/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Waiver of Service of Summons FOR CITY OF SCOTTSDALE, SCOTTSDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, OFFICER NATHAN STEPHENSON AND JANE DOE STEPHENSON
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
8/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
8/27/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2020
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/27/2020
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/8/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/9/2022
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/23/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.