Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2020-010282 | Judge: | Viola, Danielle |
File Date: | 8/25/2020 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Javier Aguila | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Lucille Aragon | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Alicia Baldwin | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Michael Bates | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Monica Beard | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Michael Beaver | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Mathew Becker | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Jennifer Beeman | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Jacquelyn Bendig | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Jessie Blackburn | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Jason Bowen | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Ari Bracamonte | Plaintiff | Unknown | Ilan Wurman |
Matt Brassard | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Dave Brennan | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Penny Brennan | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Deborah Broten | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
James Brower | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Jesse Isaiah Burke | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Scott Busse | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Brian Cavender | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Daryl Chester | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Susan Compton | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Audrey Corley | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Karen Crump | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Timothy Damico | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Terry Davis | Plaintiff | Unknown | Ilan Wurman |
David Delos | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Lori Delos | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Craig Denny | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Patricia Dion | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Tony Dohrman | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Charles E Duff | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
John Ehalt | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Gary Erwin | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Jack Estes | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Lee Fabrizio | Plaintiff | Unknown | Ilan Wurman |
Louie Fernandez | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Patricia Fuller | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
David Gilbert | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Scott Goldsmith | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Steven Gordon | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Jolie Grant | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Jeremiah Gratza | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Mistie Green | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Deborah Griffin | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
James Griffin | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Kimberly Guethle | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Mark Halstengard | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Tracy Tolleson | Plaintiff | Unknown | Ilan Wurman |
Frank Vairo | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Eugene Walden | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Heather Ward | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Justin Ward | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Gary Welch | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Cheri Wells | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Larry Wendt | Plaintiff | None | Ilan Wurman |
Tucker Woodbury | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Paul York | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Leslie Zinke | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
David Harmon | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Darel Harrison | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Tamie Harrison | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
John Healy | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Brad Henrich | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
R J Herrig | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Kimberly Herrig | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Jennifer Holliday | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Marion Hooper | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Mary Hultman | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Charles Jenkins | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Curtis Johnson | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Shane Jones | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Ian Juul | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Corey Kelly | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Colleen Kendall | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Kimberly Kolacek | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Alan Kowalski | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Douglas Landreth | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Elda Lee | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Maxine Lee | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Ian Likwarz | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Barry Lucas | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Josh Makrauer | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Phillip Marcus | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Thomas McCauley | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
John McCormick | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Vicki McKee | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Dawn McMillan | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Dustin McMillan | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Kelly Meixler | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Julie Mikkelsen | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
David Monahan | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Leesa Montague | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Alex Mundy | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Michael Nelson | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Chad Newberry | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Linda Niblett | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Kimberly Odonnel | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Carrie Parker | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Diane Pedersen | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Luther Pedigo | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Elmer Pineda | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Daniel Pounds | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Grant Quezada | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Keith Redmann | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Jill Redmann | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Bruce Reid | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Jeff Riggs | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Russel Roberts | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Jacob Roer | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Vanessa Roer | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Steven Rogers | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Robert Rosa | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Vickie Sanders | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Jeffrey Schacht | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Rebecca Schemmer | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Wes Schemmer | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Paul Schuldt | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Kyle Schwab | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Peter Sciacca | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Claudia Shadid | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Ray Shadid | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
James Shaffer | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Sheri Shaw | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Steven Sheldon | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Thomas Smith | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
John Spaugh | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Ioannis Spentzos | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Tosha Spring | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Kimberly Stam | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Eva Stapleton | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Mitchell Stevens | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Lucie Stevens | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Nany Stevens | Plaintiff | Female | Ilan Wurman |
Alan Swenson | Plaintiff | Male | Ilan Wurman |
Doug Ducey | Defendant | Male | Brett Johnson |
Arizona Department Of Health Services, The | Defendant | GREGORY FALLS | |
Arizona Department Of Liquor Licenses And Control, The | Defendant | GREGORY FALLS | |
State Of Arizona, The | Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
8/6/2021 | JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal | 8/6/2021 | |
NOTE: FINAL JUDGMENT / with prejudice | |||
7/2/2021 | NOT - Notice | 7/6/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S Notice of Proposed Final Judgment | |||
6/17/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 6/17/2021 | |
4/14/2021 | REL - Reply | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ Reply in Support of their Mootness Brief | |||
4/12/2021 | RES - Response | 4/14/2021 | |
NOTE: THE AGENCY DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING THE MOOTNESS OF THEIR CLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF | |||
4/12/2021 | RES - Response | 4/15/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEY'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOOTNESS BRIEF | |||
4/5/2021 | STA - Statement | 4/7/2021 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Mootness Brief | |||
4/1/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 4/1/2021 | |
3/26/2021 | NOT - Notice | 3/29/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEY’S NOTICE OF SUPREME COURT PROCEEDINGS AND RECENT EXECUTIVE ORDERS | |||
3/24/2021 | ORD - Order | 3/25/2021 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT | |||
3/16/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 3/16/2021 | |
3/15/2021 | RES - Response | 3/16/2021 | |
NOTE: THE AGENCY DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |||
3/15/2021 | NOT - Notice | 3/16/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Supplemental Authority | |||
3/15/2021 | NOT - Notice | 3/16/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEY’S JOINDER IN AGENCY DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |||
3/1/2021 | REQ - Request | 3/3/2021 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEY’S REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER AT ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 15, 2021 | |||
2/24/2021 | 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset | 2/24/2021 | |
2/19/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 2/19/2021 | |
12/29/2020 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 12/29/2020 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
12/29/2020 | AIX - Appeals Index | 12/29/2020 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
12/10/2020 | REL - Reply | 12/11/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ Consolidated Reply in Support of Their Motion to Amend Their Complaint | |||
12/8/2020 | RES - Response | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: The Agency Defendants' Response Objecting to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint | |||
12/8/2020 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 12/9/2020 | |
12/8/2020 | LET - Letter | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: AMENDED LETTER | |||
12/8/2020 | RES - Response | 12/9/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEY'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |||
12/1/2020 | ORD - Order | 12/2/2020 | |
11/25/2020 | ORD - Order | 11/25/2020 | |
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING | |||
11/20/2020 | STP - Stipulation | 11/20/2020 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING | |||
11/18/2020 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 11/19/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Amend Complaint | |||
11/18/2020 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 12/2/2020 | |
11/17/2020 | NOT - Notice | 11/18/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Transcript Order | |||
11/13/2020 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 11/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal / eFile Billing $100.00 | |||
11/9/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 11/9/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 10/20/2020 | |
10/20/2020 | NOT - Notice | 10/22/2020 | |
NOTE: The Agency Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority | |||
10/15/2020 | MOT - Motion | 10/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Strike | |||
10/15/2020 | MOT - Motion | 10/16/2020 | |
NOTE: The Agency Defendants' Joinder in Defendant Governor Ducey's Motion to Strike | |||
10/14/2020 | REQ - Request | 10/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Expedited Request for Court Reporter | |||
10/14/2020 | NOT - Notice | 10/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Second Notice of Supplemental Authority | |||
10/13/2020 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 10/14/2020 | |
NOTE: THE AGENCY DEFENDANTS’ SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
10/13/2020 | RES - Response | 10/14/2020 | |
NOTE: Agency Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
10/12/2020 | NOT - Notice | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Supplemental Authority | |||
10/12/2020 | STA - Statement | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Agency Defendants' Preliminary Injunction Post Hearing Brief | |||
10/12/2020 | STA - Statement | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEYS CLOSING BRIEF | |||
10/12/2020 | NOT - Notice | 10/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Preliminary Injunction Brief | |||
10/12/2020 | STA - Statement | 10/14/2020 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF ARIZONA ATTORNEY GENERAL MARK BRNOVICH PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 12-1841 | |||
10/12/2020 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 10/12/2020 | |
10/9/2020 | STP - Stipulation | 10/12/2020 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING EXHIBITS | |||
10/8/2020 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/18/2020 | |
NOTE: VIDEO CONFERENCE/OF IAN BAZIL JUUL 10-2-2020 | |||
10/8/2020 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/19/2020 | |
NOTE: ROBERT DEAN ROSA | |||
10/8/2020 | DPR - Deposition Report | 11/19/2020 | |
NOTE: MONICA LANDRA BEARD | |||
10/7/2020 | NOT - Notice | 10/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Errata | |||
10/7/2020 | DCL - Declaration | 10/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Corrected Notice of Filing of Plaintiffs’ Declarations for October 8 Hearing | |||
10/6/2020 | REQ - Request | 10/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant The Arizona Department of Health Services' Request for Rule 37(c)(4) Admission of Ex. 232 | |||
10/6/2020 | DCL - Declaration | 10/7/2020 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES’ REQUEST FOR RULE 37(C)(4) ADMISSION OF EXHIBIT 232 | |||
10/6/2020 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ Objections to Defendants’ Joint Witnesses and Exhibits for Preliminary Injunction Evidentiary Hearing | |||
10/6/2020 | NOT - Notice | 10/7/2020 | |
NOTE: JOINT NOTICE RE FILING OF DECLARATIONS | |||
10/6/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 10/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing of Plaintiffs’ Declarations for October 8 Hearing | |||
10/6/2020 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/7/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' JOINT OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT & WITNESS LIST FOR PRELIMINARY INJ EVID HEARING | |||
10/6/2020 | NOT - Notice | 10/7/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' JOINT DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS | |||
10/5/2020 | REL - Reply | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Agency Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Corrected Amended Complaint | |||
10/2/2020 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' JOINT EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION EVIDENTIARY HEARING | |||
10/2/2020 | STP - Stipulation | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation | |||
10/2/2020 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 10/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ Witness and Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Evidentiary Hearing | |||
9/29/2020 | REL - Reply | 9/30/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply to Defendants' Response to PLAINTIFFS Amended Application for Preliminary Injunction | |||
9/29/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/30/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
9/28/2020 | RES - Response | 9/30/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEY’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ AMENDED APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO MONICA BEARD, DEBORAH BROTEN, IAN JUUL, AND ROBERT ROSA | |||
9/28/2020 | RES - Response | 9/29/2020 | |
NOTE: THE AGENCY DEFENDANTS’ JOINDER IN DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEY’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ AMENDED APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO MONICA BEARD, DEBORAH BROTEN, IAN JUUL, AND ROBERT ROSA | |||
9/23/2020 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 9/23/2020 | |
9/22/2020 | NOT - Notice | 9/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Evidence | |||
9/22/2020 | ORD - Order | 9/23/2020 | |
NOTE: PROTECTIVE | |||
9/21/2020 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/22/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ Opposition to Defendants Arizona Department of Health Services’ and Arizona Department of Liquor Licenses and Control’s Motion to Dismiss | |||
9/21/2020 | MOT - Motion | 9/22/2020 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order | |||
9/18/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/18/2020 | |
9/17/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 9/17/2020 | |
9/17/2020 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 9/17/2020 | |
9/16/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 9/18/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES’ AND ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF LIQUOR LICENSES AND CONTROL’S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS’ CORRECTED AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
9/16/2020 | REL - Reply | 9/18/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEYS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
9/15/2020 | APL - Application | 9/17/2020 | |
NOTE: AMENDED APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO MONICA BEARD, DEBORAH BROTEN, IAN JUUL, AND ROBERT ROSA | |||
9/14/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 9/14/2020 | |
9/14/2020 | NOT - Notice | 9/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ letter regarding preliminary injunction hearing | |||
9/14/2020 | STA - Statement | 9/15/2020 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES’ AND ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF LIQUOR LICENSES AND CONTROL’S POSITION STATEMENT REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING | |||
9/14/2020 | STA - Statement | 9/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant Governor Ducey's Position Statement Regarding Preliminary Injunction Hearing | |||
9/14/2020 | REQ - Request | 9/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Request for Court Reporter - 10-8-20 PI Hearing | |||
9/8/2020 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs’ Partial Opposition to Defendant Governor Ducey’s Motion to Dismiss; Motion to Convert to Summary Judgment; and Cross- Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
9/8/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 9/8/2020 | |
9/4/2020 | STA - Statement | 9/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Brief of Arizona Attorney General Mark Brnovich Pursuant to A.R.S. 12-1841 | |||
9/4/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 9/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
9/3/2020 | MOT - Motion | 9/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant Governor Ducey's Motion for Judicial Notice | |||
9/3/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 9/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant Governor Ducey's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint | |||
9/3/2020 | RES - Response | 9/4/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEY’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
9/3/2020 | REQ - Request | 9/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Expedited Request for Court Reporter | |||
9/3/2020 | RES - Response | 9/4/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES AND ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF LIQUOR LICENSES AND CONTROLS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION / CO-CHRG $245.00 RECEIPT # 27935673 | |||
9/3/2020 | REL - Reply | 9/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply to Defendants’ Responses to Plaintiffs’ Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order Setting Hearing on Preliminary Injunction | |||
9/3/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 9/4/2020 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANT GOVERNOR DUCEY’S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
9/2/2020 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 9/3/2020 | |
NOTE: CORRECTED AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF | |||
8/31/2020 | MOT - Motion | 9/1/2020 | |
NOTE: CORRECTED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
8/28/2020 | SUM - Summons | 8/31/2020 | |
8/28/2020 | SUM - Summons | 8/31/2020 | |
8/28/2020 | SUM - Summons | 8/31/2020 | |
8/28/2020 | SUM - Summons | 8/31/2020 | |
8/28/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/31/2020 | |
NOTE: STATE OF ARIZONA | |||
8/28/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/31/2020 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF LIQUOR LICENSES $ CONTROL | |||
8/28/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/31/2020 | |
NOTE: ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES / OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE COUNSEL AND RULES | |||
8/28/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/31/2020 | |
NOTE: DOUG DUCEY | |||
8/26/2020 | ORD - Order | 9/2/2020 | |
NOTE: ORDER TO APPEAR | |||
8/25/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 8/26/2020 | |
8/25/2020 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 8/26/2020 | |
8/25/2020 | MOT - Motion | 8/26/2020 | |
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY RESTAINING ORDER AND FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION | |||
8/25/2020 | COM - Complaint | 8/26/2020 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
9/4/2020 | 14:00 | Oral Argument |
9/10/2020 | 14:30 | Status Conference |
9/14/2020 | 15:30 | Status Conference |
10/8/2020 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
10/16/2020 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
3/9/2021 | 11:00 | Oral Argument |
3/15/2021 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
3/30/2021 | 14:00 | Status Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |