Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2020-006195 | Judge: | McCoy, M. Scott |
File Date: | 5/26/2020 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Unisys Technical Solutions L L C | Plaintiff | Jesse Callahan | |
C S I Solutions L L C | Defendant | Shelton Freeman | |
Kannaboost Technology Inc | Defendant | Shelton Freeman | |
Medmen Enterprises Inc | Defendant | Steven Jerome | |
Warren J. Stapleton | Endorsement Case | Male | Pro Per |
Geoffrey M. T. Sturr | Endorsement Case | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
1/31/2023 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 1/31/2023 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
1/23/2023 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 1/25/2023 | |
NOTE: Notice re: Dismissal of Claims without Prejudice | |||
12/1/2022 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 12/1/2022 | |
11/30/2022 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 12/7/2022 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
11/29/2022 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 11/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Stipulation re: Dismissal of Parties WITH PREJUDICE | |||
11/23/2022 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 11/28/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER ACCEPTING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION/RELIEF DENIED | |||
11/23/2022 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 11/28/2022 | |
11/23/2022 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 11/28/2022 | |
11/23/2022 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 11/28/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER ACCEPTING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION/RELIEF DENIED | |||
10/18/2022 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 10/18/2022 | |
10/13/2022 | ORD - Order | 10/20/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION RE CONTINUANCE OF OCTOBER 17 22 HEARING | |||
10/12/2022 | STP - Stipulation | 10/15/2022 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION RE: CONTINUANCE OF OCTOBER 17, 2022 HEARING | |||
8/31/2022 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 8/31/2022 | |
8/31/2022 | ORD - Order | 8/31/2022 | |
NOTE: Order Granting Motion to Certify for Partial Judgment | |||
8/23/2022 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 8/23/2022 | |
8/18/2022 | REL - Reply | 8/23/2022 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Without Client Consent | |||
8/15/2022 | REL - Reply | 8/18/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Enter Partial Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) | |||
8/10/2022 | RES - Response | 8/13/2022 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL WITHOUT CLIENT CONSENT | |||
8/3/2022 | RES - Response | 8/6/2022 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 54(B) | |||
7/22/2022 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel | 7/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Without Client Consent | |||
7/21/2022 | 041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set | 7/21/2022 | |
7/15/2022 | MOT - Motion | 7/21/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify for Partial Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) | |||
6/29/2022 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 6/29/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER DISMISSING C. MICHAEL COLBURN’S AND DARYLL DESANTIS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/29/2022 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel | 6/29/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO WITHDRAW PRO HAC VICE COUNSEL | |||
6/29/2022 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/29/2022 | |
6/27/2022 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 6/29/2022 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Objections to Proposed Order Dismissing C. Michael Colburn's and Daryll Desantis' Claims WITH PREJUDICE | |||
6/23/2022 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel | 6/26/2022 | |
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw Pro Hac Vice Counsel | |||
6/22/2022 | NOT - Notice | 6/25/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Law Firm | |||
6/20/2022 | NOT - Notice | 6/22/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Order Dismissing C. Michael Colburn's and Daryll DeSantis' Claims with Prejudice | |||
6/3/2022 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 6/3/2022 | |
5/27/2022 | NOT - Notice | 5/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll DeSantis Notice re Attempted Deposit With Clerk of Court | |||
5/24/2022 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 5/24/2022 | |
5/18/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/18/2022 | |
5/13/2022 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 5/21/2022 | |
5/10/2022 | MOT - Motion | 5/11/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll Desantis's and C. Michael Colburn’s Motion to Stay 4/8/22 “Under Advisement Ruling / Status Conference Set” Order [Expedited relief requested]/Hearing: May 20, 2022 10:00 a.m. | |||
4/19/2022 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 4/19/2022 | |
2/16/2022 | NOT - Notice | 2/21/2022 | |
NOTE: Notice to Court re Portions of Hearing Transcripts | |||
2/16/2022 | NOT - Notice | 2/21/2022 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S NOTICE OF RELEVANT TRANSCRIPT EXCERPTS | |||
2/15/2022 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 2/15/2022 | |
2/8/2022 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 2/8/2022 | |
1/27/2022 | REL - Reply | 2/1/2022 | |
NOTE: C. Michael Colburn's Reply in Support of Request to Appear Telephonically or Via Court Connect | |||
1/26/2022 | REL - Reply | 1/31/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll Desantis's Reply in Support of Motion to Vacate Hearing and Orders, or, Alternatively, For Leave to File Motion as Pre-Trial Bench Brief | |||
1/26/2022 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset | 1/26/2022 | |
1/25/2022 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 1/26/2022 | |
1/25/2022 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 1/26/2022 | |
1/25/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/25/2022 | |
NOTE: PROTECTIVE ORDER | |||
1/25/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/25/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT EXHIBIT 111 UNDER SEAL | |||
1/24/2022 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 1/24/2022 | |
1/24/2022 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 1/27/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll Desantis's Emergency Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing, or, Alternatively, to Excuse His Appearance Due to Covid Illness | |||
1/24/2022 | REL - Reply | 1/27/2022 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT EXHIBIT 111 UNDER SEAL | |||
1/24/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/28/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE | |||
1/21/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/26/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MOTIONS TO VACATE HEARING AND ORDERS TO APPEAR REMOTELY AND FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS OR ALTERNATIVELY TO CONTINUE HEARING | |||
1/21/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/26/2022 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS NOS 114-122 | |||
1/21/2022 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 1/26/2022 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO: (I) C. MICHAEL COLBURN’S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR VIA COURT-CONNECT, AND (II) PLAINTIFF DARYLL DESANTIS’S MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY | |||
1/21/2022 | RES - Response | 1/26/2022 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO: DARYLL DESANTIS’ MOTION TO VACATE HEARING AND ORDERS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION AS PRETRIAL BENCH BRIEF AND C. MICHAEL COLBURN’S JOINDER IN DARYLL DESANTIS’ MOTION TO VACATE HEARING AND ORDERS, OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION AS PRE-TRIAL BENCH BRIEF | |||
1/21/2022 | RES - Response | 1/26/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll DeSantis' Response to Motion for Protective Order | |||
1/20/2022 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 1/25/2022 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S OBJECTION TO DARYLL DESANTIS’ MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MOTIONS: (I) TO VACATE HEARING AND ORDERS; (II) TO APPEAR REMOTELY; AND (III) FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO CONTINUE HEARING | |||
1/18/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/21/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll DeSantis' Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Exhibit Nos. 114- 122 | |||
1/18/2022 | LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence | 1/21/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll DeSantis' Updated Exhibit List | |||
1/18/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/22/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll DeSantis' Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motions: (i) to Vacate Hearing and Orders; (ii) to Appear Remotely; and (iii) for Leave to Submit Supplemental Exhibits, or Alternatively, to Continue Hearing | |||
1/18/2022 | NOT - Notice | 1/22/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll DeSantis' Notice re Visual Display of Exhibits | |||
1/14/2022 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 1/18/2022 | |
NOTE: DECLINING SPECIAL ACTION JURISDICTION | |||
1/14/2022 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 1/18/2022 | |
1/14/2022 | REQ - Request | 1/19/2022 | |
NOTE: C. Michael Colburn's Request to Appear Telephonically or Via Court Connect | |||
1/14/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/19/2022 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT EXHIBIT 111 UNDER SEAL | |||
1/14/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/19/2022 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR PERMISSION TO SUBMIT EXHIBIT 111 UNDER SEAL | |||
1/14/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/20/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll Desantis's Motion to Appear Remotely | |||
1/7/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/11/2022 | |
NOTE: C. MICHAEL COLBURN’S JOINDER IN DARYLL DESANTIS’ MOTION TO VACATE HEARING AND ORDERS, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION AS PRE-TRIAL BENCH BRIEF | |||
1/6/2022 | MOT - Motion | 1/7/2022 | |
NOTE: Daryll Desantis's Motion to Vacate Hearing and Orders, or, Alternatively, For Leave to File Motion as Pre-Trial Bench Brief | |||
1/5/2022 | ORD - Order | 1/5/2022 | |
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT EVIDENTIARY HEARING | |||
12/27/2021 | OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel | 12/27/2021 | |
NOTE: Order Approving Application for Substitution of Counsel | |||
12/16/2021 | MOT - Motion | 12/17/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Appear Telephonically at Evidentiary Hearing | |||
12/15/2021 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset | 12/15/2021 | |
12/14/2021 | REL - Reply | 12/16/2021 | |
NOTE: Joint Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Continue Evidentiary Hearing | |||
12/14/2021 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 12/16/2021 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO: (I) C. MICHAEL COLBURN’S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR VIA COURT-CONNECT, AND (II) PLAINTIFF DARYLL DESANTIS’S MOTION TO APPEAR REMOTELY | |||
12/14/2021 | ORD - Order | 12/16/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON MEDMENS REVISED EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CRIMINAL CIVIL AND INDIRECT CONTEMPT AND FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER | |||
12/13/2021 | RES - Response | 12/16/2021 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CONTINUE DECEMBER 16, 2021 TRIAL | |||
12/10/2021 | DCL - Declaration | 12/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Declaration of Daniel B. Mestaz in Support of 12/9/21 Joint Motion to Continue Hearing re Contempt | |||
12/10/2021 | MOT - Motion | 12/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff Daryll Desantis's Motion to Appear Remotely | |||
12/10/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/14/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance for Plaintiff Daryll DeSantis | |||
12/10/2021 | APL - Application | 12/14/2021 | |
NOTE: Application for Substitution of Counsel | |||
12/9/2021 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 12/9/2021 | |
12/9/2021 | REQ - Request | 12/13/2021 | |
NOTE: C. MICHAEL COLBURN’S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY OR VIA COURT-CONNECT | |||
12/9/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 12/13/2021 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON MEDMEN’S REVISED EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CRIMINAL, CIVIL, AND INDIRECT CONTEMPT AND FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER | |||
12/9/2021 | STA - Statement | 12/14/2021 | |
NOTE: SECOND AMENDED UNILATERAL PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT | |||
12/8/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 12/13/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
12/8/2021 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel | 12/13/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel With Client Consent | |||
12/2/2021 | MOT - Motion | 12/4/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Appear Telephonically at Evidentiary Hearing | |||
11/15/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 11/15/2021 | |
11/5/2021 | MEM - Memorandum | 11/8/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Unilateral Status Memorandum | |||
10/12/2021 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 10/12/2021 | |
8/23/2021 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 8/23/2021 | |
8/23/2021 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 8/23/2021 | |
8/17/2021 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 8/21/2021 | |
NOTE: Joint Status Memorandum | |||
8/17/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 8/17/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/17/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 8/17/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/17/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 8/17/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/16/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 8/16/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/11/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 8/11/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/11/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 8/11/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
8/6/2021 | NOT - Notice | 8/9/2021 | |
NOTE: APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
8/6/2021 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 8/9/2021 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
8/6/2021 | AIX - Appeals Index | 8/9/2021 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
7/27/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 7/27/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
7/26/2021 | NOT - Notice | 7/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Transcript Order | |||
7/19/2021 | 314 - ME: Bankruptcy | 7/19/2021 | |
7/19/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 7/19/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
7/19/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 7/19/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
7/19/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 7/19/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
7/16/2021 | NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy | 7/20/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Bankruptcy | |||
7/16/2021 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 7/16/2021 | |
7/14/2021 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 7/14/2021 | |
7/14/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 7/14/2021 | |
7/14/2021 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 7/14/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
7/13/2021 | NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy | 7/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Bankruptcy | |||
7/12/2021 | 033 - ME: Reassignment Req Denied | 7/12/2021 | |
7/9/2021 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 7/12/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal / efile billing $100 | |||
7/9/2021 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 7/12/2021 | |
NOTE: Corrected Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice | |||
7/8/2021 | REL - Reply | 7/9/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE | |||
7/8/2021 | ORD - Order | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER | |||
7/7/2021 | RES - Response | 7/9/2021 | |
NOTE: Response to Plaintiffs C. Michael Colburn and Daryll DeSantis' Notice of Change of Judge | |||
7/7/2021 | MOT - Motion | 7/9/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ MOTION FOR POST-JUDGMENT RELIEF FROM JUNE 22, 2021 ORDER | |||
7/6/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/9/2021 | |
7/6/2021 | STA - Statement | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT | |||
7/6/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/7/2021 | |
NOTE: Certificate of Service re: Subpoena Duces Tecum to Epic Investments, LLC | |||
7/6/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/7/2021 | |
NOTE: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO DELSANTRO INVESTMENTS, LLC | |||
7/6/2021 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice | |||
7/6/2021 | NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right | 7/8/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE | |||
7/6/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 7/6/2021 | |
7/2/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 7/2/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
7/2/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 7/2/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
7/2/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 7/2/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
7/1/2021 | ANS - Answer | 7/6/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint | |||
7/1/2021 | RES - Response | 7/6/2021 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIDAVIT OF DAN EDWARDS IN OPPOSITION TO C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ COUNSEL’S AFFIDAVIT SEEKING CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE | |||
7/1/2021 | NOT - Notice | 7/2/2021 | |
NOTE: DELSANTRO INVESTMENTS, LLC’S JOINDER IN MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO JP MORGAN CHASE AND U.S. BANK FILED BY EPIC INVESTMENTS, LLC | |||
7/1/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 7/3/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |||
6/30/2021 | MTQ - Motion To Quash | 7/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM TO JPMORGAN CHASE AND U.S. BANK | |||
6/30/2021 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 7/1/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF DAN EDWARDS IN OPPOSITION TO C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ COUNSEL’S AFFIDAVIT SEEKING CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE | |||
6/30/2021 | AFF - Affidavit | 7/1/2021 | |
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF DAN EDWARDS IN OPPOSITION TO C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ COUNSEL’S AFFIDAVIT SEEKING CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE | |||
6/30/2021 | MOT - Motion | 7/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIDAVIT OF DAN EDWARDS IN OPPOSITION TO C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ COUNSEL’S AFFIDAVIT SEEKING CHANGE OF JUDGE FOR CAUSE | |||
6/29/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 6/29/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
6/29/2021 | RES - Response | 7/1/2021 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MEDMEN’S REVISED EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CRIMINAL, CIVIL, AND INDIRECT CONTEMPT AND FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER | |||
6/29/2021 | REQ - Request | 7/1/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ REQUEST TO APPEAR REMOTELY | |||
6/25/2021 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 6/29/2021 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order | |||
6/23/2021 | AFF - Affidavit | 6/25/2021 | |
NOTE: Affidavit Seeking Change of Judge for Cause | |||
6/23/2021 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 6/25/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Affidavit Seeking Change of Judge for Cause | |||
6/22/2021 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 6/22/2021 | |
6/22/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 6/22/2021 | |
6/22/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 6/22/2021 | |
6/21/2021 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 6/22/2021 | |
6/21/2021 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 6/22/2021 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL | |||
6/17/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 6/17/2021 | |
6/17/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 6/17/2021 | |
6/17/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 6/17/2021 | |
6/17/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 6/17/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
6/17/2021 | RNM - Returned Mail | 6/17/2021 | |
NOTE: | |||
6/16/2021 | MOT - Motion | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Stay MedMen's Contempt Application and Vacate Return Hearing | |||
6/16/2021 | STA - Statement | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ BRIEF PROCEDURAL STATEMENT FOR RETURN HEARING | |||
6/16/2021 | REP - Report | 6/18/2021 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S UNILATERAL JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO THE COURT’S DIRECTIVE ON JUNE 10, 2021 RE: CONTENMPT APPLICATION PROCEEDINGS | |||
6/14/2021 | PDO - Proposed Order Denied | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: Proposed Order Denied | |||
6/14/2021 | REL - Reply | 6/16/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES UNDER A.R.S. 12-349 | |||
6/10/2021 | PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause | 6/14/2021 | |
NOTE: REVISED EMERGENCEY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CRIMINAL, CIVIL, AND INDIRECT CONTEMPT AND FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER | |||
6/9/2021 | RES - Response | 6/11/2021 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF MEDMEN’S FILINGS IN SIMILAR LITIGATION PENDING IN THIS COURT | |||
6/9/2021 | MOT - Motion | 6/11/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING ON MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S EMERGENCEY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CRIMINAL, CIVIL, AND INDIRECT CONTEMPT AND FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER | |||
6/9/2021 | MOT - Motion | 6/11/2021 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR EMERGENCEY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CRIMINAL, CIVIL, AND INDIRECT CONTEMPT AND FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER | |||
6/9/2021 | APL - Application | 6/11/2021 | |
NOTE: EMERGENCEY APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CRIMINAL, CIVIL, AND INDIRECT CONTEMPT AND FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER | |||
6/8/2021 | REL - Reply | 6/9/2021 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON: (I) THE FIFTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF OF THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS, AND (II) COUNTS 5 AND 6 OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
6/8/2021 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 6/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS TO PLAINTIFFS C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DESANTIS’ SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS | |||
6/7/2021 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 6/8/2021 | |
6/7/2021 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 6/8/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: DENY STAY AND DELCINE JURISDICTION | |||
6/3/2021 | REQ - Request | 6/7/2021 | |
NOTE: Request for Judicial Notice OF MEDMEN’S FILINGS IN SIMILAR LITIGATION PENDING IN THIS COURT | |||
5/28/2021 | RES - Response | 6/1/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DeSANTIS, AND COUNSEL UNDERSIGNED’S, RESPONSE TO MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES UNDER A.R.S. § 12-349 | |||
5/28/2021 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 6/1/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
5/24/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 5/24/2021 | |
5/24/2021 | ORD - Order | 5/24/2021 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED / RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION | |||
5/21/2021 | NOT - Notice | 5/25/2021 | |
NOTE: RULE 7.1(g) NOTICE OF FIRST STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES UNDER A.R.S. § 12-349 | |||
5/20/2021 | RES - Response | 5/25/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON: (I) THE FIFTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF OF THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS, AND (II) COUNTS 5 AND 6 OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
5/20/2021 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 5/25/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS C. MICHAEL COLBURN AND DARYLL DeSANTIS’ CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS AND SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS | |||
5/17/2021 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 5/21/2021 | |
5/17/2021 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 5/21/2021 | |
5/17/2021 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 5/21/2021 | |
5/17/2021 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 5/21/2021 | |
5/17/2021 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 5/21/2021 | |
5/17/2021 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 5/21/2021 | |
5/10/2021 | REL - Reply | 5/12/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S MOTION TO DISMISS RE: COUNTS 7, 8, AND 9 OF PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
5/6/2021 | PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order | 5/6/2021 | |
NOTE: ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE | |||
5/6/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
5/6/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/11/2021 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
5/6/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/12/2021 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
5/6/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/12/2021 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
5/4/2021 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 5/5/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Application for Attorneys' Fees Under A.R.S. 12-349 | |||
4/30/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/5/2021 | |
4/30/2021 | NOT - Notice | 5/3/2021 | |
NOTE: RULE 7.1(g) NOTICE OF FIRST STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
4/30/2021 | NOT - Notice | 5/4/2021 | |
NOTE: RULE 7.1(g) NOTICE OF FIRST STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
4/28/2021 | PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application | 4/29/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice | |||
4/27/2021 | RES - Response | 4/29/2021 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S MOTION TO DISMISS RE: COUNTS 7, 8, AND 9 OF PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
4/20/2021 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 4/21/2021 | |
4/20/2021 | AIX - Appeals Index | 4/21/2021 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
4/20/2021 | NOT - Notice | 4/23/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FIRST STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S MOTION TO DISMISS RE: COUNTS 7, 8, AND 9 OF PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
4/19/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/23/2021 | |
4/19/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/23/2021 | |
4/19/2021 | NOT - Notice | 4/20/2021 | |
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS APPELLATE CLERK NOTICE | |||
4/19/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/12/2021 | |
4/19/2021 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/12/2021 | |
4/13/2021 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 4/13/2021 | |
4/8/2021 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 4/13/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING CORRECTED EXHIBIT 11 TO MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S OBJECTION TO MOTION TO SET SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND STAY JUDGMENT | |||
4/7/2021 | REL - Reply | 4/12/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND STAY JUDGMENT | |||
4/6/2021 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 4/12/2021 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S MOTION TO DISMISS RE: COUNTS 7, 8, AND 9 OF PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
4/6/2021 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 4/6/2021 | |
4/2/2021 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 4/6/2021 | |
NOTE: Emergency Motion for Continuance of April 9, 2021 Hearing on Motion to Set Supersedeas Bond AND STAY JUDGMENT | |||
4/1/2021 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on: (1I) the Fifth Claim for Relief OF THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS, AND (II) COUNTS 5 AND 6 OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
4/1/2021 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: Statement of Facts in Support of MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on: (I) THE FIFTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF OF THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS, AND (II) COUNTS 5 AND 6 OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
4/1/2021 | NOT - Notice | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Transcript Order | |||
4/1/2021 | NOT - Notice | 4/5/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE RE: SECOND EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
3/31/2021 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 4/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Objection to Motion to Set Supersedeas Bond and Stay Judgment | |||
3/31/2021 | MOT - Motion | 4/2/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Set Supersedeas Bond and Stay JUDGMENT | |||
3/26/2021 | MOT - Motion | 3/30/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Set Supersedeas Bond and Stay Judgment | |||
3/23/2021 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 3/23/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO AMEND / | |||
3/22/2021 | NOT - Notice | 3/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of First Extension to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint | |||
3/18/2021 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 3/18/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal / EFILE BILLING $100.00 | |||
3/18/2021 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 3/19/2021 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order | |||
3/17/2021 | NOT - Notice | 3/18/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE RE: FIRST EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
3/11/2021 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 3/11/2021 | |
3/11/2021 | JOR - Judgment And Order | 3/11/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING / IN MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INCS FAVOR ON THE SECOND CLAIM FOR RELIEF OF THE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS | |||
3/5/2021 | REL - Reply | 3/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Entry of Order GRANTING JUDGMENT IN MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S FAVOR ON THE SECOND CLAIM FOR RELIEF OF THE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS | |||
3/4/2021 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 3/8/2021 | |
NOTE: Objection to Proposed Order | |||
3/2/2021 | LET - Letter | 3/3/2021 | |
3/1/2021 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 3/3/2021 | |
NOTE: Second Amended Complaint | |||
2/25/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 2/25/2021 | |
2/25/2021 | NOT - Notice | 2/26/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF LODGING RE: ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT IN MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S FAVOR ON COUNT II OF THE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS | |||
2/24/2021 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 3/1/2021 | |
2/24/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 2/24/2021 | |
2/22/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 2/22/2021 | |
2/22/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 2/22/2021 | |
2/18/2021 | REL - Reply | 2/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Amended Complaint | |||
2/11/2021 | ANS - Answer | 2/16/2021 | |
NOTE: Answer to First Amended Counterclaim | |||
2/9/2021 | REL - Reply | 2/10/2021 | |
NOTE: REPLY TO MEDMEN’S POST-TRIAL [sic] BRIEF | |||
2/9/2021 | RES - Response | 2/10/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Response to C. Michael Colburn and Daryll DeSantis' Post-Hearing Brief | |||
2/8/2021 | RES - Response | 2/9/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Response to Motion for Leave to Amend Amended Complaint | |||
2/4/2021 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 2/4/2021 | |
2/4/2021 | NOT - Notice | 2/5/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Post-Trial Brief | |||
2/4/2021 | STA - Statement | 2/5/2021 | |
NOTE: Post-Hearing Brief | |||
2/2/2021 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 2/2/2021 | |
1/27/2021 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 1/27/2021 | |
1/27/2021 | ORD - Order | 1/27/2021 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE / | |||
1/27/2021 | MEM - Memorandum | 1/28/2021 | |
NOTE: Pre-Hearing Memorandum | |||
1/22/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/22/2021 | |
1/22/2021 | STP - Stipulation | 1/26/2021 | |
NOTE: Stipulation re Protective Order | |||
1/21/2021 | REL - Reply | 1/25/2021 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing | |||
1/21/2021 | STA - Statement | 1/25/2021 | |
NOTE: Joint Pre-Hearing Statement | |||
1/20/2021 | RES - Response | 1/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Medmen Enterprises, Inc.'s Response to Motion to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing | |||
1/20/2021 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 1/22/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Amend Amended Complaint | |||
1/19/2021 | REL - Reply | 1/21/2021 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS RULE 12(C), ARIZ.R.CIV.P., MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO COUNT 9 OF THE VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
1/14/2021 | MOT - Motion | 1/15/2021 | |
NOTE: Motion to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing | |||
1/14/2021 | CLM - Claim | 1/19/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Verified First Amended Counterclaims | |||
1/7/2021 | ORD - Order | 1/7/2021 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND VERIFIED COUNTERCLAIMS | |||
1/5/2021 | RES - Response | 1/7/2021 | |
NOTE: Response to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Count 9 | |||
1/4/2021 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 1/4/2021 | |
1/4/2021 | REL - Reply | 1/6/2021 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Reply IN SUPPORT OF Motion for Leave to Amend Verified Counterclaims | |||
12/21/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 12/21/2020 | |
12/21/2020 | RES - Response | 12/22/2020 | |
NOTE: Response to Motion for Leave to Amend Verified Counterclaims | |||
12/16/2020 | MOT - Motion | 12/16/2020 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S RULE 12(C), ARIZ.R.CIV.P., MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO COUNT 9 OF THE VERIFIED AMENDED COMPLAINT | |||
12/15/2020 | REL - Reply | 12/15/2020 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
12/15/2020 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 12/15/2020 | |
12/15/2020 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 12/15/2020 | |
12/14/2020 | NOT - Notice | 12/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Joint Notice of Pending Motions | |||
12/11/2020 | RES - Response | 12/14/2020 | |
NOTE: Response to Emergency Application for Order to Show Cause | |||
12/8/2020 | OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel | 12/8/2020 | |
NOTE: WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
12/8/2020 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 12/8/2020 | |
12/7/2020 | 001 - ME: Disqualification | 12/7/2020 | |
12/7/2020 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel | 12/7/2020 | |
NOTE: WITH CLIENT CONSENT | |||
12/4/2020 | EMF - Email Filed | 12/7/2020 | |
12/4/2020 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 12/4/2020 | |
12/4/2020 | STP - Stipulation | 12/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel with Client Consent | |||
12/3/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 12/3/2020 | |
12/2/2020 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 12/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Re-Filing Exhibit 3 to MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Verified Counterclaims | |||
12/1/2020 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 12/1/2020 | |
12/1/2020 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Verified Counterclaims | |||
12/1/2020 | APL - Application | 12/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Emergency Application for Order to Show Cause | |||
11/30/2020 | APL - Application | 12/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Application for Withdrawal of Counsel with Client Consent | |||
11/30/2020 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel | 11/30/2020 | |
11/19/2020 | APL - Application | 11/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Application for Withdrawal of Counsel with Client Consent | |||
11/18/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 11/19/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
10/15/2020 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 10/15/2020 | |
10/15/2020 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 10/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Order | |||
10/9/2020 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 10/12/2020 | |
NOTE: Joint Report | |||
9/16/2020 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference | 9/16/2020 | |
8/31/2020 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 8/31/2020 | |
8/28/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 8/28/2020 | |
8/27/2020 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 8/28/2020 | |
NOTE: Certificate of Agreement Regarding Compulsory Arbitration | |||
8/27/2020 | ANS - Answer | 9/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Answer | |||
8/27/2020 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 8/27/2020 | |
NOTE: DISMISSING COUNTS 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, AND 9 AS AGAINST DEFENDANTS CSI SOLUTIONS, LLC AND KANNABOOST TECHNOLOGY, INC. ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
8/19/2020 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 8/19/2020 | |
8/17/2020 | STA - Statement | 8/19/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT/COUNTERPLAINTIFF MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS APPLICATION FOR RECEIVERSHIP | |||
8/11/2020 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 8/11/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 3, 6, 7, 8, and 9 As Against Defendants CSI Solutions, LLC and Kannaboost Technology, Inc. Only Without Prejudice | |||
8/11/2020 | RES - Response | 8/12/2020 | |
NOTE: Response in Opposition to MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Application for Receivership | |||
8/10/2020 | RES - Response | 8/11/2020 | |
NOTE: Joinder in Response In Opposition to Medmen Enterprises, Inc.'s Application for Receivership | |||
8/7/2020 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 8/7/2020 | |
8/4/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/4/2020 | |
7/30/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 7/30/2020 | |
7/30/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 7/30/2020 | |
7/29/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 7/30/2020 | |
NOTE: BINDING TERM SHEET | |||
7/29/2020 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 7/30/2020 | |
NOTE: AMENDED BINDING TERM SHEET | |||
7/29/2020 | ORD - Order | 7/30/2020 | |
NOTE: TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
7/29/2020 | MOT - Motion | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT/COUNTERPLAINTIFF MEDMEN ENTERPRISES INCS / TO FILE UNDER SEAL | |||
7/29/2020 | MOT - Motion | 7/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant/Counterplaintiff MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal | |||
7/27/2020 | APL - Application | 7/27/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant/Counterplaintiff MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Application for Receivership | |||
7/13/2020 | ANS - Answer | 7/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Answer to Counterclaim | |||
6/26/2020 | ORD - Order | 6/29/2020 | |
NOTE: 1 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNISYS TECHNICAL SOLUTIONS LLC UNISYS AGAINST DEFENDANTS CSI SOLUTIONS LLC CSI AND KANNABOOST TECHNOLOGY INC KANNABOOST IS HEREBY DEEMED WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND NO FURTHER ACTION SHALL BE TAKEN THEREON | |||
6/25/2020 | STP - Stipulation | 6/26/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation | |||
6/24/2020 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 6/24/2020 | |
6/23/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 6/23/2020 | |
6/22/2020 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set | 6/22/2020 | |
6/19/2020 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 6/19/2020 | |
6/18/2020 | ANS - Answer | 6/19/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant/Counterplaintiff MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Verified Complaint and Verified Counterclaim | |||
6/18/2020 | APL - Application | 6/19/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (WITH NOTICE) | |||
6/18/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 6/18/2020 | |
6/16/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 6/16/2020 | |
6/15/2020 | REL - Reply | 6/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants CSI Solutions, LLC, and Kannaboost Technology, Inc. | |||
6/15/2020 | REL - Reply | 6/16/2020 | |
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT MEDMEN ENTERPRISES INC. | |||
6/15/2020 | RES - Response | 6/16/2020 | |
NOTE: MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INCS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE | |||
6/15/2020 | REQ - Request | 6/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Request for Status Conference re MedMen's Ongoing Violation of Stipulated Order | |||
6/10/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 6/10/2020 | |
6/10/2020 | ORD - Order | 6/10/2020 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED / AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE | |||
6/10/2020 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 6/11/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Unisys Technical Solutions, LLC's Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | |||
6/10/2020 | RES - Response | 6/11/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Colburn and DeSantis' Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction | |||
6/8/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 6/8/2020 | |
6/7/2020 | NOT - Notice | 6/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Order | |||
6/7/2020 | NOT - Notice | 6/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant MedMen Enterprises, Inc.'s Notice of Lodging Form of Proposed Order | |||
6/7/2020 | APL - Application | 6/8/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT MEDMEN ENTERPRISES, INC.’S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (WITH NOTICE) | |||
6/5/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 6/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
6/5/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 6/5/2020 | |
6/4/2020 | RES - Response | 6/5/2020 | |
NOTE: Response to Objection to Notice of Appearance | |||
6/2/2020 | NOT - Notice | 6/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Objection to Notice of Appearance | |||
6/1/2020 | SUM - Summons | 6/2/2020 | |
6/1/2020 | SUM - Summons | 6/2/2020 | |
6/1/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/2/2020 | |
NOTE: KANNABOOST TECHNOLOGY INC | |||
6/1/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/2/2020 | |
NOTE: CSI SOLUTIONS LLC | |||
6/1/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 6/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
6/1/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 6/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
6/1/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 6/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
6/1/2020 | APL - Application | 6/2/2020 | |
NOTE: Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendant MedMen Enterprises, Inc. | |||
5/29/2020 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 5/29/2020 | |
NOTE: Verified Amended Complaint | |||
5/29/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 6/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
5/27/2020 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 6/1/2020 | |
5/26/2020 | COM - Complaint | 5/27/2020 | |
5/26/2020 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 5/27/2020 | |
5/26/2020 | CSH - Coversheet | 5/27/2020 | |
5/26/2020 | APL - Application | 5/27/2020 | |
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
6/3/2020 | 9:30 | Order To Show Cause |
6/8/2020 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
6/16/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
6/18/2020 | 12:15 | Status Conference |
6/19/2020 | 15:00 | Order To Show Cause |
6/23/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
7/1/2020 | 11:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
7/29/2020 | 12:00 | Status Conference |
8/26/2020 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
9/15/2020 | 9:00 | Settlement Conference |
12/2/2020 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
12/4/2020 | 14:00 | Order To Show Cause |
12/18/2020 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
1/28/2021 | 10:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/19/2021 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
4/9/2021 | 8:30 | Hearing |
6/10/2021 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
6/17/2021 | 13:30 | Order To Show Cause |
7/13/2021 | 9:30 | Oral Argument |
7/13/2021 | 10:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
8/13/2021 | 14:00 | Status Conference |
8/18/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/18/2021 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/19/2021 | 15:30 | Status Conference |
8/20/2021 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
10/6/2021 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/8/2021 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
11/5/2021 | 11:00 | Status Conference |
12/10/2021 | 8:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
12/16/2021 | 9:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
12/16/2021 | 9:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
1/24/2022 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
1/25/2022 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
1/25/2022 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/9/2022 | 9:00 | Evidentiary Hearing |
2/9/2022 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/20/2022 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
8/19/2022 | 9:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/17/2022 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
10/17/2022 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
11/30/2022 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
2/2/2023 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
3/11/2021 | F:Medmen Enterprises Inc | $10,384,288.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: C Michael Colburn | |||||
A: Daryll Desantis |