Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2019-096536 | Judge: | Driggs, Adam |
File Date: | 10/25/2019 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Brigham A Burton | Plaintiff | Male | Pro Per |
Carly Burton | Plaintiff | Female | Pro Per |
Kevin Erdmann | Defendant | Male | Joel Sannes |
Jennifer Erdmann | Defendant | Female | Joel Sannes |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
4/13/2021 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 4/16/2021 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |||
3/4/2021 | JUD - Judgment | 3/4/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
2/2/2021 | NOT - Notice | 2/3/2021 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Form of Judgment | |||
2/2/2021 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 2/3/2021 | |
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS | |||
2/2/2021 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 2/4/2021 | |
NOTE: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OFAPPLICATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND COSTS | |||
1/6/2021 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel | 1/6/2021 | |
1/5/2021 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/5/2021 | |
12/30/2020 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel | 12/31/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel | |||
9/8/2020 | RES - Response | 9/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Response to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint | |||
8/19/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 8/20/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint | |||
8/7/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/7/2020 | |
8/5/2020 | BON - Bond | 8/6/2020 | |
NOTE: Bond for Fees and Costs | |||
7/31/2020 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: First Amended Complaint | |||
7/31/2020 | CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: Amended Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration | |||
7/27/2020 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 7/27/2020 | |
7/14/2020 | MOT - Motion | 7/16/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ EXPEDITED MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON LITIGATION BOND AND TO RESOLVE PLAINTFF’S FINAL REMAINING CLAIM | |||
7/7/2020 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 7/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
7/7/2020 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 7/8/2020 | |
NOTE: First Amended Complaint | |||
7/7/2020 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 7/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Motion for Reconsideration of Litigation Bond | |||
6/30/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/30/2020 | |
6/23/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/23/2020 | |
6/23/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/23/2020 | |
5/7/2020 | RES - Response | 5/7/2020 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR COURT TO DESIGNATE PLAINTIFFS VEXATIOUS LITIGANTS | |||
5/4/2020 | REL - Reply | 5/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Court to Designate Plaintiffs' Vexatious Litigants | |||
5/1/2020 | REL - Reply | 5/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Set Litigation Bond | |||
5/1/2020 | REL - Reply | 5/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Court to Designate Plaintiffs Vexatious Litigants | |||
5/1/2020 | REL - Reply | 5/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint | |||
4/17/2020 | RES - Response | 4/20/2020 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT | |||
4/17/2020 | RES - Response | 4/20/2020 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR COURT TO SET “LITIGATION BOND” | |||
4/17/2020 | RES - Response | 4/21/2020 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR COURT TO SET “LITIGATION BOND” | |||
4/1/2020 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 4/3/2020 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
3/30/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 3/31/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT | |||
3/30/2020 | MOT - Motion | 4/1/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR COURT TO SET “LITIGATION BOND” | |||
3/30/2020 | MOT - Motion | 4/1/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Motion for Court to Designate Vexatious Litigants | |||
3/17/2020 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 3/19/2020 | |
1/16/2020 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 1/23/2020 | |
NOTE: KEVIN ERDMANN AND JENNIFER ERDMANN | |||
1/1/2020 | 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss | 1/1/2020 | |
10/25/2019 | COM - Complaint | 10/29/2019 | Plaintiff(1) |
10/25/2019 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 10/29/2019 | Plaintiff(1) |
10/25/2019 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 10/29/2019 | Plaintiff(1) |
10/25/2019 | CSH - Coversheet | 10/29/2019 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
4/6/2020 | 9:00 | Default Hearing |
7/17/2020 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
3/4/2021 | F:Kevin Erdmann | $383.97 | One Time | Costs | Satisfied |
F:Jennifer Erdmann | |||||
A: Brigham A Burton | |||||
A: Carly Burton | |||||
3/4/2021 | F:Kevin Erdmann | $7,059.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | Satisfied |
F:Jennifer Erdmann | |||||
A: Brigham A Burton | |||||
A: Carly Burton |