« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2019-013208
Judge:
Moskowitz, Frank
File Date:
10/10/2019
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
John Valentino
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Charles Markle
Party Name
Mary Clare Valentino
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Charles Markle
Party Name
Chicago Cubs Baseball Club L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Jay Zweig
Party Name
Theo Epstein
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jay Zweig
Party Name
Mary Whitney Epstein
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Marie Whitney
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Jay Zweig
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2023
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/13/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion to Revise Dismissal Nunc Pro Tunc
Filing Date
10/25/2022
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
10/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2022
Description
376 – Case Continued on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
8/17/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
6/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
005 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
DECLARATION OF CHARLES MARKLE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
5/13/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
5/17/2022
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FFES AND COSTS WITH EXHIBITS G & H
Filing Date
4/29/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
5/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
4/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFIED REQUEST FOR AWARD OF TAXABLE COSTS UNDER A.R.S. 12-332
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
4/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
3/22/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/22/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2022
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/15/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2022
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
2/17/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTLEMENT TERMS
Filing Date
2/7/2022
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
2/7/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions
Docket Date
2/10/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1
Filing Date
2/2/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/8/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2
Filing Date
1/31/2022
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF JACK HANKS’ EXPERT OPINION PURSUANT TO DAUBERT
Filing Date
1/28/2022
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/3/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
1/25/2022
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
1/25/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
1/21/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 Re: Photographs Disclosed September 1, 2021
Filing Date
1/18/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
1/22/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 RE: HAILEY DEWITTE’S UNDERSTANDING OF THE LEASE TENANT
Filing Date
1/14/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/19/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF JACK HANKS’ EXPERT OPINION PURSUANT TO DAUBERT
Filing Date
1/10/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/11/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Filing Date
1/5/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
1/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENTS AND TESTIMONY ABOUT HAILEY DEWITTE’S INTENT OR UNDERSTANDING REGARDING THE LEASE TENANT
Filing Date
1/5/2022
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine
Docket Date
1/6/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PHOTOGRAPHS AND TESTIMONY RELATED TO PHOTOGRAPHS DISCLOSED SEPTEMBER 1, 2021
Filing Date
12/17/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF JACK HANKS’ EXPERT OPINION PURSUANT TO DAUBERT
Filing Date
12/10/2021
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
12/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
12/6/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Leave to File Dispositive Motion
Filing Date
12/1/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
11/19/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/17/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION
Filing Date
11/3/2021
Description
041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set
Docket Date
11/3/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2021
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
10/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RULE 16 REQUEST FOR TRIAL-SETTING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/20/2021
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
10/20/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Dispositive Motion
Filing Date
9/13/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
9/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/16/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND GOOD FAITH CONSULTATION CERTIFICATE
Filing Date
9/8/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
9/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Rule 26(d) Statement of Discovery Dispute
Filing Date
7/15/2021
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
7/15/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2021
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
7/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Rule 16.1 Request for Settlement Conference
Filing Date
6/11/2021
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
6/14/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’ RULE 16.1 REQUEST FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
6/7/2021
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
6/7/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
6/4/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
5/26/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
5/27/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Notice of Objection to Defendants' Supplemental Filing
Filing Date
5/25/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Regarding Scheduling Order
Filing Date
5/24/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
5/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’/ COUNTERCLAIMANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/20/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/20/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANTS/ COUNTERCLAIMANT LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/14/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants'_Counterclaimant's Reply in Support of Their Cross Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
5/14/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS’/ COUNTERCLAIMANT’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/11/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
4/29/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/30/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/12/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Filing Date
4/7/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/12/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT'S MARCH 31, 2021 ORDER
Filing Date
4/5/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification of the Court's March 31, 2021 Order
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/31/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants'-Counterclaimant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/31/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS/ COUNTERCLAIMANT’S CONTROVERTING AND SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND IN SUPPORT OF THEIR CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
3/26/2021
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation Regarding Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
3/24/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/24/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Settlement Conference
Filing Date
2/26/2021
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
2/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2021
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
2/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
2/5/2021
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
2/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
2/2/2021
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
2/2/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2021
Description
SCO – Scheduling Order
Docket Date
2/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
1/27/2021
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/28/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Report
Filing Date
1/14/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Law Firm
Filing Date
1/13/2021
Description
041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set
Docket Date
1/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
1/8/2021
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/30/2020
Description
NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/30/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2020
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
11/4/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2020
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
10/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw Counsel
Filing Date
7/29/2020
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/29/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer To Counterclaim
Filing Date
6/18/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS THEO EPSTEIN AND MARIE WHITNEY’S CERTIFICATE REGARDING COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/16/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer of Chicago Cubs Baseballl Club, LLC Only and Counterclaim of Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC Only
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
6/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Chicago Cubs Baseball Club, LLC's Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
6/16/2020
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/17/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Answer on Behalf of Theo Epstein and Marie Whitney
Filing Date
6/12/2020
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
6/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
6/12/2020
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
6/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application For ENTRY Default Against Defendants
Filing Date
12/30/2019
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
12/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
12/30/2019
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/31/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service
Filing Date
12/27/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
12/27/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
12/18/2019
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
12/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2019
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
10/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2019
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2019
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/11/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/3/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/19/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Civil Settlement Conference
Date
5/20/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/3/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
7/13/2021
Time
14:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/10/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/19/2021
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/17/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
1/18/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/24/2022
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/4/2022
Time
13:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
2/7/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
2/11/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
3/2/2022
Time
8:45
Event
Trial
Date
3/3/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/7/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/8/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/22/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/2/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/7/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/8/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2022
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.