Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2019-009574 Judge: Agne, Sara
File Date: 11/14/2019 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Coastalpay L L C   Plaintiff    Walter Ulrich 
Blue Square Resolutions L L C   Defendant    Jeffrey Giancana 
Black Dog Management L L C   Defendant    Jeffrey Giancana 
S L B Ventures L L C   Defendant    Jeffrey Giancana 
Sabin Burrell   Defendant  Male  Jeffrey Giancana 
Kayla Burrell   Defendant  Female  Jeffrey Giancana 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/17/2022  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  3/17/2022   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE 
2/11/2022  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  2/17/2022   
NOTE: Motion to Associate Oliver D. Griffin as Counsel Pro Hac Vice 
2/8/2022  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset  2/8/2022   
2/3/2022  089 - ME: Trial Setting  2/3/2022   
1/6/2022  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  1/6/2022   
1/5/2022  019 - ME: Ruling  1/5/2022   
12/23/2021  019 - ME: Ruling  12/23/2021   
12/23/2021  NOT - Notice  12/27/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Errata 
12/16/2021  019 - ME: Ruling  12/16/2021   
11/30/2021  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  11/30/2021   
11/19/2021  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  11/19/2021   
11/17/2021  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  11/17/2021   
11/12/2021  STA - Statement  11/16/2021   
NOTE: Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute 
11/1/2021  REL - Reply  11/3/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS TWELVE, THIRTEEN, AND FOURTEEN OF PLAINTIFF’S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 
10/19/2021  NOT - Notice  10/20/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Errata to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
10/18/2021  EMF - Email Filed  10/21/2021   
10/18/2021  SOF - Statement Of Facts  10/18/2021   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS’ STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
10/18/2021  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  10/19/2021   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS TWELVE, THIRTEEN, AND FOURTEEN OF PLAINTIFF’S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 
10/18/2021  SOF - Statement Of Facts  10/19/2021   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
10/18/2021  NOF - Notice Of Filing  10/19/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS 13 - 42 RE PLAINTIFF’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
10/18/2021  NOF - Notice Of Filing  10/20/2021   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBITS 13 - 42 RE PLAINTIFF’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
10/12/2021  SOF - Statement Of Facts  10/13/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF’S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS’ STATEMENT OF FACTS -ANDDEFENDANTS’ CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS TO PLAINTIFF’S STATEMENT OF FACTS 
10/12/2021  REL - Reply  10/13/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
10/11/2021  MOT - Motion  10/13/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATION FOR THEIR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
9/29/2021  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  9/29/2021   
9/29/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/29/2021   
9/28/2021  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  9/30/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS TWELVE, THIRTEEN, AND FOURTEEN OF PLAINTIFF’S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 
9/22/2021  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  9/27/2021   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
9/22/2021  DCL - Declaration  9/27/2021   
NOTE: DECLARATION OF JAMES C. HUBER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
9/21/2021  STA - Statement  9/24/2021   
NOTE: Joint Statement of Discovery Dispute 
9/20/2021  ORD - Order  9/20/2021   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATION FOR THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
9/9/2021  AMC - Amended Complaint  9/13/2021   
NOTE: Second Amended Complaint/JUry Trila Demanded 
8/31/2021  019 - ME: Ruling  8/31/2021   
8/27/2021  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  8/27/2021   
8/27/2021  SCO – Scheduling Order  8/27/2021   
NOTE: AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER 
8/26/2021  019 - ME: Ruling  8/26/2021   
8/18/2021  SOF - Statement Of Facts  8/23/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
8/18/2021  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  8/23/2021   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
8/16/2021  MOT - Motion  8/19/2021   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitation for their Motion for Summary Judgment 
8/2/2021  REL - Reply  8/4/2021   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF COASTAL PAY, LLC’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER 
7/21/2021  RES - Response  7/23/2021   
NOTE: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 
7/1/2021  MTA - Motion To Amend  7/6/2021   
NOTE: Motion to Amend Scheduling Order 
7/1/2021  REL - Reply  7/6/2021   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF COASTAL PAY, LLC’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO AMEND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
6/21/2021  RES - Response  6/23/2021   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT 
6/1/2021  MTA - Motion To Amend  6/2/2021   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF COASTAL PAY, LLC’S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT 
5/25/2021  NOT - Notice  5/27/2021   
NOTE: Notice of Errata 
12/14/2020  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel  12/14/2020   
12/9/2020  STP - Stipulation  12/9/2020   
NOTE: Ex Parte Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel with Consent 
11/25/2020  ORD - Order  11/30/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement Conference 
10/30/2020  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set  10/30/2020   
10/30/2020  SCO – Scheduling Order  10/30/2020   
NOTE: Order 
10/30/2020  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  10/30/2020   
10/26/2020  ORD - Order  10/26/2020   
NOTE: JOINT PROTECTIVE 
10/19/2020  041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set  10/19/2020   
10/19/2020  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  10/19/2020   
NOTE: Joint Report 
10/19/2020  MOT - Motion  10/21/2020   
NOTE: Joint Motion for Entry of Joint Protective Order 
10/15/2020  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  10/15/2020   
NOTE: Joint Report 
9/17/2020  019 - ME: Ruling  9/17/2020   
9/11/2020  NOT - Notice  9/14/2020   
NOTE: Errata to First Amended Complaint 
9/11/2020  NOT - Notice  9/15/2020   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF THEIR MOTION TO STRIKE DISMISSED CLAIMS FROM FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
9/9/2020  NAC - Notice of Assignment to Commercial Court  9/9/2020   
9/2/2020  MOT - Motion  9/3/2020   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Strike Dismissed Claims From First Amended Complaint 
8/31/2020  ANS - Answer  9/2/2020   
NOTE: Defendants Answer to First Amended Complaint 
8/10/2020  AMC - Amended Complaint  8/10/2020   
NOTE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
7/14/2020  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  7/14/2020   
5/22/2020  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  5/22/2020   
3/18/2020  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  3/18/2020   
3/4/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  3/4/2020   
3/3/2020  REL - Reply  3/5/2020   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 
2/27/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  2/27/2020   
2/25/2020  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  2/27/2020   
NOTE: Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 
2/20/2020  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  2/20/2020   
2/17/2020  REL - Reply  2/19/2020   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b) 
2/12/2020  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  2/14/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice 
2/7/2020  MTA - Motion To Amend  2/11/2020   
NOTE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 
2/7/2020  NOT - Notice  2/11/2020   
NOTE: Notice Pursuant to Case Reassignment 
2/7/2020  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  2/7/2020   
2/6/2020  NOT - Notice  2/10/2020   
NOTE: Notice Pursuant to Case Reassignment 
2/3/2020  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  2/5/2020   
NOTE: PLAINTTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b) 
2/3/2020  AMC - Amended Complaint  2/6/2020   
NOTE: [PROPOSED] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES JURY TRIAL DEMANDED 
1/29/2020  REQ - Request  1/31/2020   
NOTE: Request for Case Assignment to the Commercial Court 
1/28/2020  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  1/28/2020   
1/28/2020  ORD - Order  1/28/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATION FOR THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS 
1/28/2020  NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right  1/31/2020   
NOTE: Notice to Change Judge 
1/22/2020  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  1/24/2020   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
1/10/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  1/14/2020   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Rule12b 
1/10/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  1/14/2020   
NOTE: Defendants' Notice of Appearance 
1/9/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  1/15/2020   
NOTE: Defendants' Notice of Appearance 
1/7/2020  MOT - Motion  1/8/2020   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATION FOR THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b) 
12/30/2019  SUM - Summons  1/2/2020   
12/30/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/3/2020   
NOTE: SLB VENTURES LLC 
12/20/2019  ORD - Order  12/20/2019   
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT 
12/19/2019  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  12/19/2019   
12/13/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/17/2019   
NOTE: BLUE SQUARE RESOLUTIONS LLC 
12/13/2019  SUM - Summons  12/16/2019   
12/12/2019  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  12/16/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Acceptance of Service 
12/12/2019  STP - Stipulation  12/16/2019   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE THEIR ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT 
12/12/2019  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  12/16/2019   
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice 
12/6/2019  SUM - Summons  12/9/2019   
12/6/2019  SUM - Summons  12/9/2019   
12/6/2019  SUM - Summons  12/9/2019   
12/5/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/11/2019   
NOTE: BLACK DOG MANAGEMENT LLC 
12/5/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/11/2019   
NOTE: KAYLA BURRELL 
12/5/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/11/2019   
NOTE: SABIN BURRELL 
11/14/2019  COM - Complaint  11/18/2019   
11/14/2019  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  11/18/2019   
11/14/2019  CSH - Coversheet  11/19/2019   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
5/19/2020  10:00  Oral Argument 
10/29/2020  10:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
1/21/2021  10:30  Civil Settlement Conference 
9/28/2021  8:30  Status Conference 
11/16/2021  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
11/17/2021  9:30  Status Conference 
1/4/2022  9:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
2/1/2022  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
7/11/2022  9:30  Status Conference 
8/19/2022  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
9/6/2022  9:30  Status Conference 
9/12/2022  9:00  Trial 
9/13/2022  9:30  Trial 
9/14/2022  9:30  Trial 
9/15/2022  9:30  Trial 
9/19/2022  9:30  Trial 
9/20/2022  9:30  Trial 
9/21/2022  9:30  Trial 
9/22/2022  9:30  Trial 
10/7/2022  10:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
11/7/2022  9:00  Trial 
11/8/2022  9:30  Trial 
11/9/2022  9:30  Trial 
11/10/2022  9:30  Trial 
11/14/2022  9:30  Trial 
11/15/2022  9:30  Trial 
11/16/2022  9:30  Trial 
11/17/2022  9:30  Trial 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file