Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2019-008800 Judge: Astrowsky, Brad
File Date: 8/26/2019 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
S L B Ventures L L C   Plaintiff    Jonathan Schultz 
Black Dog Management L L C   Plaintiff    Jonathan Schultz 
Sabin Burrell   Plaintiff  Unknown  Jonathan Schultz 
Aurora Solutions L L C   Defendant    EDWARD SALANGA 
Brian Goudie   Defendant  Male  EDWARD SALANGA 
Clay Hunt   Defendant  Male  EDWARD SALANGA 
Paul Meiring   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Matthew Harvey   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Jeff Courtney   Defendant  Male  EDWARD SALANGA 
Prudential Capital Partners V, L P   Defendant    Pro Per 
Prudential Capital Partners Parallel Fund V, L P   Defendant    Pro Per 
Prudential Capital Partners Management Fund V, L P   Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/10/2021  047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal  2/10/2021   
11/18/2020  NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar  11/18/2020   
1/9/2020  019 - ME: Ruling  1/9/2020   
12/30/2019  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  12/31/2019   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Notice of Rule 41 Voluntary Dismissal, With Prejudice 
12/23/2019  REL - Reply  12/24/2019   
NOTE: Defendant Aurora Solutions LLC, Brian Goudie, Clay Hunt, and Jeff Courtney's Reply in Further Support of Their Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 
12/16/2019  NOT - Notice  12/18/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Second Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
12/11/2019  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  12/11/2019   
NOTE: OF ANDREW S. NAYLOR AND JEREMY A. OLIVER 
12/4/2019  NOT - Notice  12/6/2019   
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
12/3/2019  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  12/5/2019   
NOTE: Motion and Consent of Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Andrew S. Naylor and Jeremy A. Oliver 
11/25/2019  RES - Response  11/27/2019   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS AURORA SOLUTIONS LLC, BRIAN GOUDIE, CLAY HUNT, AND JEFF COURTNEY’S RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT 
11/22/2019  044 - ME: Case Reinstated  11/22/2019   
11/21/2019  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  11/21/2019   
11/15/2019  NOT - Notice  11/19/2019   
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
11/6/2019  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  11/7/2019   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Notice of Rule 41 Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE 
10/29/2019  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  10/30/2019   
NOTE: Defendants Aurora Solutions LLC, Brian Goudie, Clay Hunt, and Jeff Courtney's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 
10/29/2019  CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration  10/31/2019   
NOTE: Certificate of Agreement Regarding Compulsory Arbitration 
9/24/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/27/2019   
NOTE: Affidavit of Service /MATTHEW HARVEY 
9/18/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/23/2019   
NOTE: Affidavit of Service upon Paul L. Meiring 
9/16/2019  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  9/19/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Acceptance of Service / AURORA SOLUTIONS LLC, BRIAN N GOUDIE, CLAY HUNT AND JEFF COURTNEY 
9/13/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/23/2019   
NOTE: PRUDENTIAL CAPITAL PARTNERS V LP 
9/13/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/23/2019   
NOTE: PRUDENTIAL CAPITAL PARTNERS MANAGEMENT FUND LP 
9/13/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/23/2019   
NOTE: PRUDENTIAL CAPITAL PARTNERS PARALLEL FUND V LP 
9/13/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/24/2019   
NOTE: AURORA SOLUTIONS LLC 
9/13/2019  SUM - Summons  9/17/2019   
9/13/2019  SUM - Summons  9/17/2019   
9/13/2019  SUM - Summons  9/17/2019   
9/13/2019  SUM - Summons  9/17/2019   
8/26/2019  COM - Complaint  8/28/2019   
8/26/2019  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  8/28/2019   
8/26/2019  CSH - Coversheet  8/28/2019   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file