Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2019-008199 Judge: Brodman, Roger
File Date: 6/10/2019 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Russo And Steele L L C   Plaintiff    Christopher Mason 
Ritchie Bros Auctioneers America Inc   Defendant    F Ralph 
Ritchie Bros Auctioneers Canada Ltd   Defendant    F Ralph 
Leake Auction Company   Defendant    F Ralph 
Gary Bennett   Defendant  Male  F Ralph 
Muffy Bennett   Defendant  Female  F Ralph 
K D H Solutions L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Mark Landolfi   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/22/2020  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  5/22/2020   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
5/20/2020  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  5/21/2020   
NOTE: Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice 
5/12/2020  375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar  5/12/2020   
5/8/2020  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  5/11/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Resolution 
4/23/2020  AMC - Amended Complaint  4/24/2020   
NOTE: First Amended Complaint 
4/20/2020  ORD - Order  4/20/2020   
NOTE: VACATING THE DEADLINES IN THE SCHEDULING ORDER DATE 02/24/2020 
4/16/2020  019 - ME: Ruling  4/16/2020   
4/10/2020  STP - Stipulation  4/15/2020   
NOTE: Stipulation to Suspend Current Case Deadlines Pending Establishment of New Agreed-Upon Case Management Schedule 
4/6/2020  REL - Reply  4/9/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint 
3/25/2020  RES - Response  3/26/2020   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 
3/11/2020  MTA - Motion To Amend  3/13/2020   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File its First Amended Complaint 
2/24/2020  SCO – Scheduling Order  2/24/2020   
NOTE: FIRST AMENDED 
2/18/2020  STP - Stipulation  2/20/2020   
NOTE: Stipulation to Enter First Amended Scheduling Order 
11/6/2019  ORD - Order  11/6/2019   
NOTE: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE / FOR CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION 
10/31/2019  STP - Stipulation  11/4/2019   
NOTE: STIPULATED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER 
9/27/2019  NOT - Notice  10/1/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Service of Offer of Judgment 
9/26/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference  9/26/2019   
9/3/2019  041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set  9/3/2019   
9/3/2019  SCO – Scheduling Order  9/3/2019   
8/26/2019  REP - Report  8/28/2019   
NOTE: Joint Report 
8/19/2019  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  8/19/2019   
8/14/2019  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  8/15/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO ASSOCIATE COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE 
7/26/2019  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  7/31/2019   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
7/17/2019  NAC - Notice of Assignment to Commercial Court  7/17/2019   
7/11/2019  ANS - Answer  7/15/2019   
NOTE: Answer 
7/2/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  7/3/2019   
NOTE: Notice Of Appearance 
7/1/2019  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  7/3/2019   
NOTE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON BEHALF OF ALL DEFENDANTS 
6/20/2019  SUM - Summons  6/21/2019   
6/20/2019  SUM - Summons  6/21/2019   
6/20/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/25/2019   
NOTE: LEAKE AUCTION COMPANY 
6/20/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/25/2019   
NOTE: RITCHIE BROS AUCTIONEERS AMERICA INC 
6/10/2019  CSH - Coversheet  6/11/2019   
6/10/2019  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  6/11/2019   
6/10/2019  COM - Complaint  6/11/2019   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/25/2019  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
8/19/2020  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
11/9/2020  8:30  Pre-Trial Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file