« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2019-004938
Judge:
Warner, Randall
File Date:
9/4/2019
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Cordero Delgadillo
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Brittany Burback
Party Name
Denette Dunn
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Timothy Lasota
Party Name
Arizona Attorney General
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
City Of Peoria
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
SAMAN GOLESTAN
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2020
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
1/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
12/3/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
12/3/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2019
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
10/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS’ RULE 54(G) MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS’ FEES AND RULE 54(F) MOTION FOR TAXABLE COSTS
Filing Date
10/25/2019
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
10/28/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION
Filing Date
10/25/2019
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
10/28/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2019
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
10/17/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2019
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
10/22/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
MDJ - Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Special Appearance and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction
Filing Date
10/14/2019
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2019
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
10/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Statement of Contest
Filing Date
10/7/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
10/7/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTESTANT’S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER
Filing Date
10/2/2019
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
10/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
10/2/2019
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2019
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
9/23/2019
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
CORDERO DELGADILLO’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DENETTE DUNN’S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FAILURE TO JOIN INDISPENSABLE PARTY
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Declaration of Delivery by Private Process Server - D. Dunn
Filing Date
9/19/2019
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/25/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2019
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
9/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Declaration of Delivery by Private Process Server - AZ AG
Filing Date
9/17/2019
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF AND FOR FAILURE TO JOIN INDISPENSABLE PARTY
Filing Date
9/11/2019
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
9/4/2019
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2019
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
9/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2019
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
9/10/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/4/2019
Time
15:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/16/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/4/2019
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.