« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2019-003027
Judge:
Whitten, Christopher
File Date:
4/5/2019
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Marta Tecedor Cabrero
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Raeesabbas Mohamed
Party Name
Sarah Viren
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Raeesabbas Mohamed
Party Name
John Doe
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Unknown
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Duane Gilson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2019
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
8/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2019
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice
Filing Date
6/13/2019
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/18/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUANE GILSON II
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
6/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2019
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
5/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
5/22/2019
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
5/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint and Application for Injunctive Relief
Filing Date
5/22/2019
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/23/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Errata
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2019
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.