« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2019-000604 Judge: Stephens, Sherry
File Date: 1/2/2019 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Arizona Chapter Of The Associated General Contractors Of America   Plaintiff    Joseph Kanefield 
David Martin   Plaintiff  Male  Joseph Kanefield 
City Of Phoenix   Defendant    Deryck Lavelle 
Denise Archibald   Defendant  Female  Deryck Lavelle 
Building A Better Phoenix   Defendant    Kory Langhofer 
Sal Diciccio   Intervenor  Male  Mark Goldman 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/18/2019  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  3/20/2019   
NOTE: Respondents' Opposition to the Motion to Disqualify 
3/18/2019  MEM - Memorandum  3/20/2019   
NOTE: Opening Pre-Hearing Memorandum of Building a Better Phoenix 
3/18/2019  STA - Statement  3/20/2019   
NOTE: Petitioner's Opening Brief 
3/18/2019  RES - Response  3/20/2019   
NOTE: Petitioner's Response in Opposition to real party in Interest's Motion to Disqualify Attorneys for Petitoners 
3/14/2019  STA - Statement  3/18/2019   
NOTE: Petitioner's Brief Re: Inadmissibility of Polling Evidence 
3/14/2019  RES - Response  3/18/2019   
NOTE: Response of Building A Better Phoenix to the Petitioners' Motion to Exclude Public Opinion Survey Evidence 
3/7/2019  029 - ME: Status Conference  3/7/2019   
2/28/2019  ANS - Answer  3/1/2019   
NOTE: Answer of Building a Better Phoenix to the Verified Complaint 
2/27/2019  MOT - Motion  2/27/2019   
NOTE: Real Party in Interest's Motion to Disqualify Attorneys for Petitioners 
2/26/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  2/27/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
2/22/2019  005 - ME: Hearing  2/22/2019   
2/20/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  2/21/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
2/20/2019  MEM - Memorandum  2/21/2019   
NOTE: Prehearing Memorandum of City of Phoenix 
2/11/2019  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset  2/11/2019   
2/7/2019  REL - Reply  2/8/2019   
NOTE: REPLY TO PETITIONERS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY SAL DICICCIO’S MOTION TO INTERVENE 
1/30/2019  NOT - Notice  1/31/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Errata 
1/29/2019  RES - Response  1/30/2019   
NOTE: PETITIONERS’ RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO NON-PARTY SAL DICICCIO’S MOTION TO INTERVENE 
1/18/2019  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  1/18/2019   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
1/18/2019  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  1/18/2019   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
1/18/2019  ANS - Answer  1/22/2019   
NOTE: Answer of Respondents City of Phoenix And Denise Archibald to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief/ CO-CHG $245.00 RECEIPT #27000891 
1/16/2019  056 - ME: Hearing Set  1/16/2019   
1/15/2019  MTI – Motion to Intervene  1/15/2019   
NOTE: MOTION TO INTERVENE BY NONPARTY SAL DICICCIO // EFILE BILLING $333.00 
1/14/2019  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  1/15/2019   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service -- BUILDING A BETTER PHOENIX 
1/14/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  1/15/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
1/8/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/11/2019   
NOTE: BUILDING A BETTER PHOENIX 
1/7/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/10/2019   
NOTE: DENISE ARCHIBALD 
1/7/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  1/10/2019   
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX 
1/3/2019  OSC - Order To Show Cause  1/4/2019   
1/2/2019  COM - Complaint  1/2/2019   
1/2/2019  CSH - Coversheet  1/2/2019   
1/2/2019  APL - Application  1/2/2019   
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
1/2/2019  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  1/2/2019   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/15/2019  11:00  Order To Show Cause 
2/15/2019  8:30  Oral Argument 
2/21/2019  10:00  Oral Argument 
3/6/2019  9:30  Status Conference 
4/10/2019  9:30  Evidentiary Hearing 
4/11/2019  9:30  Evidentiary Hearing 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center