« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2018-092198 Judge: Whitten, Christopher
File Date: 5/18/2018 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Scott Alan Malcomson   Plaintiff  Male  Pro Per 
I M V U   Defendant    Charles Oldham 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/11/2019  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  7/12/2019   
7/11/2019  MAN - Order Of Mandate  7/12/2019   
4/25/2019  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  4/26/2019   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
4/25/2019  AIX - Appeals Index  4/26/2019   
NOTE: AMENDED 
3/29/2019  MEM - Memorandum  4/1/2019   
11/14/2018  NOT - Notice  11/15/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Designating Additional Transcripts and Notice of Ordering Transcripts 
10/22/2018  OWV – ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES AND/OR COSTS  10/24/2018   
10/22/2018  ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs  10/24/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
10/16/2018  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  10/17/2018   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
10/16/2018  AIX - Appeals Index  10/17/2018   
10/15/2018  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  10/16/2018   
10/15/2018  LET - Letter  10/16/2018   
10/3/2018  ORD - Order  10/3/2018   
NOTE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT 
9/20/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/20/2018   
9/11/2018  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  9/12/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
8/29/2018  005 - ME: Hearing  8/29/2018   
8/29/2018  NOT - Notice  8/30/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT 
8/3/2018  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  8/3/2018   
8/2/2018  RES - Response  8/3/2018   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO STRIKE 
7/23/2018  MOT - Motion  7/25/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: TO STRIKE DEF IMVU'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT 
7/16/2018  REL - Reply  7/17/2018   
NOTE: Defendant IMVU's Reply In Support Of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 
7/5/2018  NAC - Notice of Assignment to Commercial Court  7/5/2018   
6/29/2018  MEM - Memorandum  7/2/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: RESPONSIVE/IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT 
6/22/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  6/26/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT // EFILE BILLING $245.00 
6/1/2018  AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail  6/5/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
5/18/2018  COM - Complaint  5/22/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
5/18/2018  CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration  5/22/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
5/18/2018  CSH - Coversheet  5/22/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
5/18/2018  ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver  5/22/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
5/18/2018  ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees  5/22/2018   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/27/2018  13:30  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center