Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2018-012743 | Judge: | Agne, Sara |
File Date: | 10/5/2018 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Dana Raab | Plaintiff | Female | Jonathan O'Steen |
J B S Tolleson Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
J B S, U S A Food Company | Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
12/6/2018 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 12/6/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice | |||
10/18/2018 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 10/22/2018 | |
NOTE: JBS USE FOOD COMPANY | |||
10/18/2018 | SUM - Summons | 10/19/2018 | |
10/9/2018 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 10/10/2018 | |
NOTE: JBS TOLLESON INC | |||
10/9/2018 | SUM - Summons | 10/10/2018 | |
10/5/2018 | COM - Complaint | 10/9/2018 | |
10/5/2018 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 10/9/2018 | |
10/5/2018 | CSH - Coversheet | 10/9/2018 | |
10/5/2018 | NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials | 10/9/2018 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |