« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2018-006653 Judge: Contes, Connie
File Date: 11/5/2018 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Alice Novoa   Plaintiff  Female  Pro Per 
Raquel Teran   Defendant  Female  David Gaona 
Michele Reagan   Defendant  Female  Joseph La Rue 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/19/2019  LET - Letter  4/22/2019   
4/18/2019  LET - Letter  4/19/2019   
4/12/2019  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  4/15/2019   
4/12/2019  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  4/15/2019   
NOTE: ORDER TRANSFERRING APPEAL 
3/12/2019  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  3/13/2019   
NOTE: CLERK OF COURT, COURT OF APPEALS DIVISION ONE 
3/8/2019  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  3/11/2019   
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
3/8/2019  AIX - Appeals Index  3/11/2019   
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD 
3/4/2019  LET - Letter  3/5/2019   
3/4/2019  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  3/5/2019   
2/20/2019  LET - Letter  2/21/2019   
1/23/2019  JUD - Judgment  1/23/2019   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
11/26/2018  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  11/26/2018   
11/19/2018  NOT - Notice  11/20/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment 
11/19/2018  005 - ME: Hearing  11/19/2018   
11/16/2018  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  11/16/2018   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
11/16/2018  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/20/2018   
NOTE: MICHELE REAGAN 
11/16/2018  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/20/2018   
NOTE: RAQUEL TERAN 
11/16/2018  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  11/20/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
11/14/2018  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  11/15/2018   
NOTE: Application for Attorneys Fees 
11/14/2018  SOC - Statement Of Costs  11/16/2018   
NOTE: Statement of Costs 
11/13/2018  REQ - Request  11/14/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: AMENDED / FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 
11/13/2018  REQ - Request  11/14/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: AMENDED / FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 
11/13/2018  MOT - Motion  11/14/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: AMENDED / FOR REDUCTION IN TIME TO RESPOND 
11/13/2018  MOT - Motion  11/14/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS 
11/13/2018  MCO - Motion To Continue  11/14/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
11/13/2018  NOT - Notice  11/14/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: AMENDED / COMPLAINT NOMINATION CHANLLENGE 
11/13/2018  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/14/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
11/13/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  11/15/2018   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
11/13/2018  DCL - Declaration  11/15/2018   
NOTE: DECLARATION OF D. ANDREW GAONA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT RAQUEL TERAN’S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO A.R.S. § 12-349 
11/13/2018  ANS - Answer  11/15/2018   
NOTE: Arizona Secretary of State Michele Reagan's Answer // REC#26901827 
11/9/2018  056 - ME: Hearing Set  11/9/2018   
11/8/2018  ORD - Order  11/15/2018   
NOTE: TO APPEAR 
11/5/2018  COM - Complaint  11/5/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
11/5/2018  CSH - Coversheet  11/5/2018   
11/5/2018  MOT - Motion  11/5/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: FOR REDUCTION OF TIME TO RESPOND 
11/5/2018  REQ - Request  11/5/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
NOTE: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 
11/5/2018  ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver  11/5/2018  Plaintiff(1)  
11/5/2018  ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees  11/5/2018   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/14/2018  9:00  Election Challenge 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
1/23/2019  F:Raquel Teran  $3,000.00  One Time  Attorney Fee   
  A: Alice Novoa         
1/23/2019  F:Raquel Teran  $279.15  One Time  Costs   
  A: Alice Novoa         
click here for Law Library Resource Center