« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2017-096705 Judge: Palmer, David
File Date: 11/15/2017 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Christopher Ames   Defendant  Male  Timothy Lasota 
Arizona Advocacy Network   Plaintiff    James Barton 
David Bradley   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Olivia Cajero-Bedford   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Andrea Dalessandro   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Steve Farley   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Katie Hobbs   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Catherine Miranda   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Martin Quezada   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Andrew Sherwood   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Richard C Andrade   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Lela Alston   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Mark A Cardenas   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Ken Clark   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Diego Espinoza   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Charlene R Fernandez   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Randall Friese   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Rosanna Gabaldon   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Albert Hale   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Stefanie Mach   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Matthew Kopec   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Juan Jose Mendez   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Rebecca Rios   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Macario Saldate   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Ceci Velasquez   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Bruce Wheeler   Plaintiff  Male  James Barton 
Bricklayers And Allied Craftworkers Local Union #3 Az-Nm   Plaintiff    James Barton 
State Of Arizona, The   Defendant    TIMOTHY BERG 
Michele Reagan   Defendant  Female  TIMOTHY BERG 
Citizens Clean Elections Commission, The   Defendant    Mary O'Grady 
Governors Regulatory Review Council   Defendant    Timothy Lasota 
Lupe Contreras   Plaintiff  Female  James Barton 
Nicole Ong Colyer   Defendant  Female  Timothy Lasota 
Brenda Burns   Defendant  Female  Timothy Lasota 
John Sundt   Defendant  Male  Timothy Lasota 
Connie Wilhelm   Defendant  Female  Timothy Lasota 
Frank Thorwald   Defendant  Male  Timothy Lasota 
Steve Voeller   Defendant  Male  Timothy Lasota 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/5/2018  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  12/5/2018   
10/4/2018  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  10/4/2018   
9/20/2018  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  9/20/2018   
9/13/2018  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  9/13/2018   
8/20/2018  019 - ME: Ruling  8/20/2018   
7/17/2018  REL - Reply  7/18/2018   
NOTE: GRRC DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
7/17/2018  REL - Reply  7/18/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS STATE OF ARIZONA’S AND SECRETARY OF STATE MICHELE REAGAN’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
7/2/2018  RES - Response  7/3/2018   
NOTE: CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISSION’S RESPONSE TO STATE DEFENDANTS’ CROSSMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
7/2/2018  RES - Response  7/5/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS GRRC MEMBERS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
7/2/2018  REL - Reply  7/5/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPONSE TO DEFENDANTS ARIZONA, GRRC MEMBERS AND CCEC CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
7/2/2018  RES - Response  7/5/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS ARIZONA AND SECRETARY OF STATE SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
6/1/2018  SOF - Statement Of Facts  6/4/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS STATE OF ARIZONA’S AND SECRETARY OF STATE MICHELE REAGAN’S RESPONSE AND CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANTS STATE OF ARIZONA’S AND SECRETARY OF STATE MICHELE REAGAN’S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR CROSSMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
6/1/2018  RES - Response  6/4/2018   
NOTE: Citizens Clean Elections Commission's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 
6/1/2018  RES - Response  6/4/2018   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS STATE OF ARIZONA’S AND SECRETARY OF STATE MICHELE REAGAN’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
6/1/2018  RES - Response  6/5/2018   
NOTE: GRRC DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
4/23/2018  NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney  4/25/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel within Law Firm 
4/23/2018  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  4/25/2018   
NOTE: Motion for Summary Judgment 
3/28/2018  SCO – Scheduling Order  3/28/2018   
NOTE: SCHEDULING ORDER 
3/27/2018  AMC - Amended Complaint  3/29/2018   
NOTE: FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUCNTIVE RELIEF 
3/16/2018  JSR – Joint Scheduling Report  3/19/2018   
NOTE: Rule 16 Joint Report 
3/6/2018  ORD - Order  3/6/2018   
NOTE: PROPORSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINITFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT 
2/27/2018  ANS - Answer  3/1/2018   
NOTE: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MEMBERS OF THE GOVERNOR’S REGULATORY REVIEW COUNCIL 
2/22/2018  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  2/22/2018   
2/8/2018  NOT - Notice  2/9/2018   
NOTE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT GOVERNOR’S REGULATORY REVIEW COUNCIL 
2/2/2018  MTA - Motion To Amend  2/6/2018   
NOTE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT 
1/26/2018  RES - Response  1/30/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DIMISS 
1/8/2018  ANS - Answer  1/9/2018   
NOTE: Answer of State of Arizona and Michele Reagan 
1/8/2018  CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration  1/9/2018   
NOTE: Certificate of Agreement on Compulsory Arbitration of State of Arizona and Michele Reagan 
1/8/2018  ANS - Answer  1/9/2018   
NOTE: Defendant The Citizens Clean Elections Commission's Answer 
1/8/2018  CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration  1/10/2018   
NOTE: Certificate of Agreement on Compulsory Arbitration 
1/5/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  1/9/2018   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT GOVERNOR’S REGULATORY REVIEW COUNCIL 
12/8/2017  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  12/11/2017   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
12/7/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  12/7/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
12/7/2017  STP - Stipulation  12/7/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answers to Complaint 
12/6/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  12/7/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
12/4/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  12/4/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
11/22/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/29/2017   
NOTE: THE CITIZENS CLEAN ELECTIONS COMMISSION 
11/22/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/29/2017   
NOTE: GOVERNOR'S REGULATORY REVIEW COUNCIL 
11/22/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/29/2017   
NOTE: STATE OF ARIZONA, THE 
11/22/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/29/2017   
NOTE: MICHELE REAGAN 
11/15/2017  COM - Complaint  11/15/2017   
11/15/2017  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  11/15/2017   
11/15/2017  CSH - Coversheet  11/15/2017   
11/15/2017  NOT - Notice  11/15/2017   
NOTE: OF CLAIM OF UNCONSTITUTIONALITY 
11/15/2017  NOT - Notice  11/15/2017   
NOTE: VERIFICATION 
11/15/2017  NOT - Notice  11/15/2017   
NOTE: VERIFICATION 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/13/2018  9:30  Oral Argument 
10/3/2018  9:30  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center