« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2017-014479
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Whitten
File Date:
11/17/2017
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Pedro Chino Gonzalez
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
ROBERT SHELY
Party Name
Marvin N Davis
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Brett Donaldson
Party Name
Rogelio Gurrola
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Peter Kelly
Party Name
Alverson Transport L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Peter Kelly
Party Name
Mikayla Davis
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Beatrice Gurrola
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Peter Kelly
Party Name
Letricia Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Brett Donaldson
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2018
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/7/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Firm
Filing Date
12/7/2018
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Status Report
Filing Date
12/7/2018
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
12/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/5/2018
Description
399 - ME: Notice To File Arbit Award
Docket Date
12/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/29/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Withdrawal of PLAINTIFF'S Motion to Compel Settlement
Filing Date
11/16/2018
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
11/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Compel Settlement
Filing Date
9/4/2018
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
9/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Notice of Arbitration Hearing
Filing Date
8/29/2018
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
8/30/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Arbitration Hearing
Filing Date
8/22/2018
Description
NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
8/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2018
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
7/13/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Satisfaction of Judgment
Filing Date
7/9/2018
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
7/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/15/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF NO OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF’S PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/1/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Proposed form of Judgment
Filing Date
4/25/2018
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
4/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Offer of Judgment
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Separate Answer of Defendants Marvin Davis and Letricia Hemphill/EFILE BILLING $239
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MARVIN N. DAVIS AND LETRICIA HEMPHILL’S CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS MARVIN N. DAVIS AND LETRICIA HEMPHILL’S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
12/18/2017
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS GURROLA AND ALVERSON TRANSPORT, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT/EFILE BILLING $239
Filing Date
12/18/2017
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
12/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration
Filing Date
12/18/2017
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
12/19/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Demand for Jury Trial
Filing Date
11/29/2017
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/4/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROGELIO GURROLA AND JANE DOE
Filing Date
11/29/2017
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/4/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARVIN N DAVIS AND MIKAYLA DAVIS
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2017
Description
CSH - Coversheet
Docket Date
11/21/2017
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
7/9/2018
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Pedro Chino Gonzalez IV
A: Rogelio Gurrola
A: Rogelio Gurrola
Amount
$4,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied