« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2017-012377 Judge: Crawford, Janice
File Date: 9/14/2017 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Hickmans Egg Ranch Inc   Plaintiff    James Holland 
David Thomas Dyrcz   Defendant  Male  Nicholas Verderame 
Myrah Harris   Defendant  Female  Howard Shanker 
Lynn Holzner   Defendant  Female  Nicholas Verderame 
Teresa Holzner   Defendant  Female  Nicholas Verderame 
Matthew Christopher Kamowski   Defendant  Male  Nicholas Verderame 
Sonia Lopez   Defendant  Female  Nicholas Verderame 
Oscar Lopez   Defendant  Male  Nicholas Verderame 
Diocelina Lopez   Defendant  Female  Nicholas Verderame 
Daniel Mack   Defendant  Male  Nicholas Verderame 
Rhonda Mack   Defendant  Female  Nicholas Verderame 
Jane Magee   Defendant  Female  Nicholas Verderame 
Song Mun   Defendant  Unknown  Nicholas Verderame 
Julie Park   Defendant  Female  Nicholas Verderame 
Lorna Ann Proper   Defendant  Female  Nicholas Verderame 
Theron Proper   Defendant  Male  Nicholas Verderame 
Patricia Reed   Defendant  Female  Howard Shanker 
Dont Waste Arizona Inc   Defendant    Howard Shanker 
Tonopah Community Council   Defendant    Pro Per 
S T O P P Committee   Defendant    Pro Per 
Jack Reed   Defendant  Male  Howard Shanker 
Jack Reed   Defendant  Male  Howard Shanker 
Linda Butler   Defendant  Female  Nicholas Verderame 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
11/13/2017  053 - ME: Case Consolidation  11/13/2017   
11/6/2017  REQ - Request  11/6/2017   
NOTE: Request to Stay Ruling On Motions to Dismiss 
11/6/2017  STP - Stipulation  11/6/2017   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS 
11/2/2017  REL - Reply  11/2/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS DON’T WASTE ARIZONA, INC., HARRIS, AND REED’s REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS 
10/30/2017  RES - Response  10/31/2017   
NOTE: Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 
10/17/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  10/17/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
10/17/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  10/18/2017   
NOTE: Defendants Motion to Dismiss 
10/10/2017  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  10/10/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Dismissal 
10/10/2017  MDJ - Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction  10/11/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS DON’T WASTE ARIZONA, INC., HARRIS, AND REED’s MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION  
9/21/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/26/2017   
NOTE: DAVID THOMAS DYREZ AND JANE DOE 
9/21/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/26/2017   
NOTE: MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER KAMOWSKI AND JANE DOE 
9/21/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/26/2017   
NOTE: LORNA ANN PROPER AND THERON PROPER 
9/21/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/26/2017   
NOTE: DONT WASTE ARIZONA INC 
9/21/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/26/2017   
NOTE: TONOPHA COMMUNITY COUNCIL AND STOPP COMMITTEE 
9/21/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/21/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/21/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/21/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/21/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/21/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/21/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/21/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/25/2017   
NOTE: LYNN HOLZNER AND TERESA HOLZNER 
9/20/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/25/2017   
NOTE: DIOCELINA LOPEZ 
9/20/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/25/2017   
NOTE: OSCAR LOPEZ 
9/20/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/25/2017   
NOTE: JANE MAGEE AND JOHN DOE MAGEE 
9/20/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/25/2017   
NOTE: DANIEL MACK AND RHONDA MACK 
9/20/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/25/2017   
NOTE: SONIA LOPEZ AND JOHN DOE LOPEZ 
9/20/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/25/2017   
NOTE: PATRICIA REED AND JACK REED 
9/20/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/25/2017   
NOTE: MYRAH HARRIS & JOHN DOE HARRIS 
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/20/2017  SUM - Summons  9/26/2017   
9/14/2017  COM - Complaint  9/15/2017   
9/14/2017  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  9/15/2017   
9/14/2017  CSH - Coversheet  9/15/2017   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center