Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2017-011937 | Judge: | Blaney, Scott |
File Date: | 8/23/2017 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Christopher Perea | Plaintiff | Male | Timothy Lasota |
Thomas Jenney | Plaintiff | Male | Kory Langhofer |
Michelle Reagan | Defendant | Female | Kara Karlson |
Save Our Schools Arizona | Defendant | Roopali Desai |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
7/17/2018 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 7/18/2018 | |
3/21/2018 | ORD - Order | 3/22/2018 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER | |||
2/27/2018 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail | 3/1/2018 | |
2/8/2018 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 2/9/2018 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
2/8/2018 | AIX - Appeals Index | 2/9/2018 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
2/7/2018 | ORD - Order | 2/8/2018 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER | |||
2/2/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 2/2/2018 | |
2/1/2018 | STP - Stipulation | 2/2/2018 | |
NOTE: Stipulation Regarding Statement of Costs | |||
2/1/2018 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 2/5/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal EFILE BILLING $94.00 | |||
1/31/2018 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 1/31/2018 | |
1/31/2018 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 2/1/2018 | |
NOTE: Verified Statement of Costs | |||
1/24/2018 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 1/24/2018 | |
12/13/2017 | NOT - Notice | 12/13/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Firm and Attorney Address | |||
12/11/2017 | NOT - Notice | 12/12/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address | |||
12/5/2017 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 12/5/2017 | |
11/22/2017 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 11/22/2017 | |
11/20/2017 | ORD - Order | 11/22/2017 | |
NOTE: GRANTING SAVE OUR SCHOOLS ARIZONA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED REPLY | |||
11/20/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 11/20/2017 | |
11/14/2017 | ORD - Order | 11/20/2017 | |
NOTE: GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
11/9/2017 | RES - Response | 11/9/2017 | |
NOTE: Petitioners' Opposition to Save Our Schools Arizona's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioners' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment | |||
11/9/2017 | REL - Reply | 11/9/2017 | |
NOTE: SAVE OUR SCHOOLS ARIZONA’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
11/3/2017 | MOT - Motion | 11/3/2017 | |
NOTE: Save Our Schools Arizona Motion For Extension To Respond To Plaintiffsâ?? Motion For Partial Summary Judgment | |||
10/31/2017 | MOT - Motion | 11/1/2017 | |
NOTE: Save Our Schools Arizona Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Consolidated Reply | |||
10/31/2017 | REL - Reply | 11/1/2017 | |
NOTE: Save Our Schools Arizona's Combined Reply In Support Of Motion To Dismiss | |||
10/25/2017 | REL - Reply | 10/26/2017 | |
NOTE: Petitioners' Reply in Support of Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |||
10/18/2017 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order | 10/18/2017 | |
10/17/2017 | REQ - Request | 10/18/2017 | |
NOTE: Save Our Schools Arizona Request For Expedited Rule 16 Scheduling Conference | |||
10/16/2017 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 10/17/2017 | |
NOTE: Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment on Objection No. 1 | |||
10/13/2017 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 10/13/2017 | |
10/13/2017 | RES - Response | 10/13/2017 | |
NOTE: Save Our Schools Arizona's Response To Plaintiffs' Notice Of Substitution Of Counsel And Motion To Exceed Page Limitations | |||
10/12/2017 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel | 10/19/2017 | |
10/12/2017 | ORD - Order | 10/19/2017 | |
NOTE: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED PERMITTING PETITIONERS TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITATIONS SPECIFIED IN RULE 3.2 | |||
10/11/2017 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 10/11/2017 | |
10/10/2017 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel | 10/11/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |||
10/10/2017 | MOT - Motion | 10/11/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to Exceed Page Limitations | |||
10/10/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/11/2017 | |
NOTE: PETITIONER Perea's OPPOSITION TO SAVE OUR SCHOOLS' Motion to Dismiss | |||
10/10/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/11/2017 | |
NOTE: PETITIONER THOMAS JENNEY’S OPPOSITION TO SAVE OUR SCHOOLS’ MOTION TO DISMISS | |||
10/2/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/2/2017 | |
9/27/2017 | REL - Reply | 9/28/2017 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Designate Case as Complex Civil Action | |||
9/26/2017 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 9/27/2017 | |
NOTE: Save Our Schools Arizona's Motion to Dismiss | |||
9/25/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/26/2017 | |
NOTE: Petitioners' Opposition to Save Our Schools' Motion to Designate Case as Complex Civil Action | |||
9/13/2017 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 9/18/2017 | |
9/12/2017 | ANS - Answer | 9/13/2017 | |
NOTE: Answer | |||
9/11/2017 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 9/11/2017 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
9/11/2017 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 9/11/2017 | |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
9/6/2017 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/7/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
9/6/2017 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/8/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
9/6/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/8/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to Designate Case as Complex Civil Action | |||
9/6/2017 | NOT - Notice | 9/8/2017 | |
NOTE: Certification of Complexity | |||
8/23/2017 | CSH - Coversheet | 8/24/2017 | |
8/23/2017 | APL - Application | 8/24/2017 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
8/23/2017 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 8/24/2017 | |
8/23/2017 | COM - Complaint | 8/24/2017 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
9/26/2017 | 10:00 | Order To Show Cause |
12/1/2017 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |