« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2017-011431 Judge: Contes, Connie
File Date: 8/11/2017 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Christopher Perea   Plaintiff  Male  Thomas Basile 
Thomas Jenney   Plaintiff  Male  Thomas Basile 
Michelle Reagan   Defendant  Female  Kara Karlson 
Save Our Schools Arizona   Defendant    Roopali Desai 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/11/2017  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  9/11/2017   
NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL 
9/1/2017  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  9/6/2017   
NOTE: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal 
8/18/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  8/21/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance / CO-CHG $239.00 R#26116099 
8/17/2017  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  8/17/2017   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
8/15/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  8/16/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance/EFILE BILLING $239.00 
8/14/2017  AMC - Amended Complaint  8/16/2017   
NOTE: First Amended Verified Special Action Complaint 
8/11/2017  COM - Complaint  8/14/2017   
8/11/2017  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  8/14/2017   
8/11/2017  CSH - Coversheet  8/14/2017   
8/11/2017  APL - Application  8/14/2017   
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center