Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2017-011151 | Judge: | Moskowitz, Frank |
File Date: | 7/25/2017 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Tom Ryff | Plaintiff | Male | Stephen Montoya |
City Of Tempe | Defendant | Sarah Anchors |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
7/17/2020 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 7/17/2020 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS AND COUNTER CLAIMS | |||
7/13/2020 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 7/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS AND COUNTER CLAIMS | |||
4/9/2020 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 4/9/2020 | |
NOTE: SECOND AMENDED | |||
4/3/2020 | MOT - Motion | 4/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Deadlines | |||
2/18/2020 | ORD - Order | 2/18/2020 | |
NOTE: THAT THE SCHEDULING ORDER ENTERED 07/08/2019 IS MODIFIED TO STATE THAT THE PARTIES SHALL COMPLETE ALL DISCOVERY BY 04/24/2020 | |||
2/11/2020 | MOT - Motion | 2/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulated Motion to Modify Scheduling Order | |||
7/24/2019 | NOT - Notice | 7/26/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Judge Pro Tempore re Settlement Conference | |||
7/19/2019 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 7/19/2019 | |
7/12/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 7/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance and Substitution | |||
7/10/2019 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 7/10/2019 | |
7/10/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 7/10/2019 | |
7/10/2019 | 022 - ME: Order Signed | 7/10/2019 | |
7/8/2019 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 7/9/2019 | |
6/28/2019 | ANS - Answer | 7/2/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT’S COUNTERCLAIMS | |||
6/28/2019 | REP - Report | 7/2/2019 | |
NOTE: Joint Report | |||
5/28/2019 | ANS - Answer | 5/30/2019 | |
NOTE: Answer and Counterclaims | |||
5/3/2019 | 375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar | 5/3/2019 | |
4/1/2019 | ORD - Order | 4/1/2019 | |
NOTE: [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEFENDANT CITY OF TEMPE’S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND | |||
2/26/2019 | MOT - Motion | 2/27/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT CITY OF TEMPE’S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND | |||
2/13/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 2/13/2019 | |
2/11/2019 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 2/11/2019 | |
2/4/2019 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 2/4/2019 | |
1/24/2019 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 1/24/2019 | |
1/17/2019 | NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right | 1/17/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change of Judge | |||
12/10/2018 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 12/10/2018 | |
11/2/2018 | REL - Reply | 11/6/2018 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of DEFENDANT CITY OF TEMPE’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
10/19/2018 | RES - Response | 10/22/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
10/19/2018 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 10/22/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTv | |||
7/20/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 7/20/2018 | |
7/20/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 7/20/2018 | |
6/19/2018 | RES - Response | 6/21/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S RENEWED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE | |||
6/19/2018 | RES - Response | 6/21/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S RENEWED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
6/6/2018 | MOT - Motion | 6/7/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S (RENEWED) MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
6/5/2018 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 6/7/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S (RENEWED) MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE | |||
6/5/2018 | STA - Statement | 6/7/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S RULE 3.2(H) STATEMENT | |||
5/31/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/31/2018 | |
5/31/2018 | ORD - Order | 5/31/2018 | |
NOTE: Order Plaintiff shall have from March 12, 2018 until May 25, 2018 in which to respond to Defendant’s Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
4/25/2018 | NPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar | 4/25/2018 | |
4/25/2018 | REL - Reply | 4/26/2018 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Compel | |||
4/25/2018 | MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service | 4/27/2018 | |
NOTE: APPLICATION FOR -and- AFFIDAVIT ON ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO Herlinda Martinez ONLY | |||
4/12/2018 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 4/12/2018 | |
4/12/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/12/2018 | |
4/3/2018 | REL - Reply | 4/5/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S COMBINED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME | |||
3/22/2018 | RES - Response | 3/23/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendant’s Combined Response to Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Discovery and Disclosure and Plaintiff’s Motion for an Extension of Time in which to File a Response to Defendant’s Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
3/9/2018 | MOT - Motion | 3/13/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
3/8/2018 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 3/12/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE | |||
2/23/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 2/23/2018 | |
2/2/2018 | MVJ - Motion To Vacate Judgment | 2/5/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO VACATE THE “150 DAY ORDER” | |||
12/27/2017 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 12/27/2017 | |
12/15/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/15/2017 | |
11/29/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 11/29/2017 | |
11/28/2017 | ORD - Order | 11/28/2017 | |
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
11/15/2017 | REL - Reply | 11/16/2017 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S PARTIAL OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR RULE 56(d) RELIEF | |||
11/8/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 11/8/2017 | |
10/31/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 11/1/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S PARTIAL OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR RULE 56(d) RELIEF | |||
10/27/2017 | REQ - Request | 10/30/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Request for Rule 56(d) Relief | |||
10/18/2017 | MOT - Motion | 10/19/2017 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
9/19/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/19/2017 | |
9/13/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/14/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion for Leave to Extend Timeframe to Plead Compulsory Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses | |||
9/13/2017 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 9/14/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
9/13/2017 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 9/14/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendant City of Tempe’s Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
8/15/2017 | RES - Response | 8/16/2017 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S Response to Defendant's Motion to Extend Deadline | |||
8/14/2017 | MOT - Motion | 8/15/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to Extend Deadline | |||
7/27/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/3/2017 | |
NOTE: CITY OF TEMPE | |||
7/27/2017 | SUM - Summons | 8/1/2017 | |
7/25/2017 | COM - Complaint | 7/26/2017 | |
7/25/2017 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 7/26/2017 | |
7/25/2017 | CSH - Coversheet | 7/26/2017 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
1/24/2019 | 8:30 | Oral Argument |
2/6/2019 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
3/11/2019 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
3/25/2020 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/13/2020 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/13/2020 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |