« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2017-008928 Judge: Smith, James
File Date: 6/14/2017 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Heidi Heiser   Plaintiff  Female  Leslie Ross 
Centurylink Inc   Defendant    Lindsay Hesketh 
Centurylink Communications L L C   Defendant    Lindsay Hesketh 
Centurylink Sales Solutions Inc   Defendant    Lindsay Hesketh 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/23/2018  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  2/23/2018   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
1/29/2018  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  1/30/2018   
NOTE: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 
7/24/2017  022 - ME: Order Signed  7/24/2017   
7/21/2017  ORD - Order  7/25/2017   
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND 
7/14/2017  NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court  7/17/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal 
7/12/2017  STP - Stipulation  7/13/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Agree that the Amount in Controversy Exceeds $75,000 
7/5/2017  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  7/5/2017   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
6/30/2017  STP - Stipulation  7/5/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond 
6/22/2017  SUM - Summons  6/23/2017   
6/19/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/21/2017   
NOTE: CENTURYLINK INC 
6/19/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/21/2017   
NOTE: CENTURY LINK INC 
6/14/2017  COM - Complaint  6/15/2017   
6/14/2017  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  6/15/2017   
6/14/2017  CSH - Coversheet  6/15/2017   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center