Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2017-007457 Judge: Coury, Christopher
File Date: 5/8/2017 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Pilatus Bank P L C   Plaintiff    Tracy Miller 
Ali Sadr   Plaintiff  Male  Tracy Miller 
Daphne Caruana Galizia   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/23/2017  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  10/23/2017   
10/17/2017  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  10/18/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice 
10/11/2017  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  10/11/2017   
7/26/2017  NOT - Notice  7/27/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Service to a Foreign Individual 
7/12/2017  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  7/12/2017   
5/8/2017  COM - Complaint  5/10/2017   
5/8/2017  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  5/10/2017   
5/8/2017  CSH - Coversheet  5/10/2017   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file