Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2017-001742 | Judge: | Moskowitz, Frank |
File Date: | 3/1/2017 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Mat Englehorn | Plaintiff | Male | Jonathan Riches |
Hopelessly Urban L L C | Plaintiff | Jonathan Riches | |
Flying E, L L C | Plaintiff | Jonathan Riches | |
Bramley Paulin | Plaintiff | Male | Jonathan Riches |
Culver Park-1129 North First Street L L C | Plaintiff | Jonathan Riches | |
Austin Shea Arizona-7th Street And Van Buren L L C | Plaintiff | Jonathan Riches | |
Sal Diciccio | Defendant | Male | Kristin Windtberg |
Michael Nowakowski | Defendant | Male | Kristin Windtberg |
Kate Gallego | Defendant | Female | Kristin Windtberg |
City Of Phoenix | Defendant | Kristin Windtberg |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/21/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/21/2020 | |
9/4/2020 | REL - Reply | 9/9/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT CITY OF PHOENIX’S REPLY SUPPORTING MOTION TO PARTIALLY AMEND FINDINGS AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULES 52 AND 59 AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ CROSS-MOTION TO PARTIALLY AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT | |||
8/25/2020 | RES - Response | 8/25/2020 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO CITY’S MOTION TO PARTIALLY AMEND FINDINGS AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULES 52 AND 59 and CROSS-MOTION TO PARTIALLY AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT | |||
8/18/2020 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 8/18/2020 | |
8/17/2020 | JUD - Judgment | 8/19/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
8/12/2020 | REL - Reply | 8/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs | |||
8/11/2020 | NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney | 8/12/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel | |||
8/7/2020 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 8/7/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT CITY OF PHOENIX’S MOTION TO PARTIALLY AMEND FINDINGS AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RULES 52 AND 59 | |||
7/31/2020 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 7/31/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT CITY OF PHOENIXS Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs | |||
7/13/2020 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 7/16/2020 | |
7/10/2020 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 7/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees and Costs | |||
7/10/2020 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 7/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Declaration of Jonathan Riches in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs | |||
7/10/2020 | NOT - Notice | 7/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment | |||
6/24/2020 | WSH - Worksheet | 7/7/2020 | |
NOTE: EXHIBIT | |||
6/19/2020 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 6/19/2020 | |
6/11/2020 | 012 - ME: Trial | 6/11/2020 | |
6/11/2020 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 6/11/2020 | |
6/10/2020 | WSH - Worksheet | 6/11/2020 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING | |||
6/10/2020 | NOT - Notice | 6/11/2020 | |
6/10/2020 | NOT - Notice | 6/11/2020 | |
6/10/2020 | EXH - Exhibit | 6/15/2020 | |
6/10/2020 | NOT - Notice | 6/22/2020 | |
NOTE: INTRODUCTION | |||
6/9/2020 | 012 - ME: Trial | 6/9/2020 | |
6/9/2020 | 012 - ME: Trial | 6/9/2020 | |
6/9/2020 | 012 - ME: Trial | 6/9/2020 | |
6/9/2020 | REQ - Request | 6/9/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant City of Phoenix's Request for Judicial Notice | |||
6/8/2020 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/25/2020 | |
NOTE: ROBERT DAVID LOZIER | |||
6/8/2020 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/25/2020 | |
NOTE: CHRISTINE MACKAY | |||
6/8/2020 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/25/2020 | |
NOTE: ALAN STEPHENSON | |||
6/8/2020 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/25/2020 | |
NOTE: BRYCE COOK | |||
6/8/2020 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/25/2020 | |
NOTE: ALAN STEPHENSON | |||
6/8/2020 | DPR - Deposition Report | 6/25/2020 | |
NOTE: KEVIN JAMES MCCARTHY | |||
6/2/2020 | 012 - ME: Trial | 6/2/2020 | |
5/21/2020 | ORD - Order | 5/22/2020 | |
NOTE: RE: PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS | |||
5/19/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/19/2020 | |
5/15/2020 | NOT - Notice | 5/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law | |||
5/14/2020 | 048 - ME: Informal Conference | 5/14/2020 | |
5/13/2020 | REQ - Request | 5/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant City of Phoenix's Request for Court Reporter | |||
5/8/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 5/8/2020 | |
5/8/2020 | NOT - Notice | 5/11/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law | |||
4/24/2020 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 4/24/2020 | |
4/21/2020 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 4/21/2020 | |
4/16/2020 | STA - Statement | 4/17/2020 | |
NOTE: Amended Joint Pretrial Statement | |||
4/13/2020 | MEM - Memorandum | 4/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Trial Memorandum | |||
4/13/2020 | STA - Statement | 4/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Joint Pretrial Statement | |||
4/13/2020 | MEM - Memorandum | 4/16/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant City of Phoenix's Trial Memorandum | |||
4/10/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 4/10/2020 | |
4/10/2020 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/10/2020 | |
4/6/2020 | RES - Response | 4/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2 re: Evidence of the Systemic Effects of GPLET on Property Tax Rolls | |||
4/6/2020 | RES - Response | 4/8/2020 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 re: Evidence of the "Stewart Project" | |||
4/2/2020 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 4/2/2020 | |
3/20/2020 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 3/23/2020 | |
NOTE: Motion in Limine No. 2 re Evidence of Systemic Effects of GPLET on Property Tax Rolls | |||
3/20/2020 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 3/23/2020 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: EVIDENCE OF THE “STEWART PROJECT" | |||
3/2/2020 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated | 3/2/2020 | |
3/2/2020 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 3/2/2020 | |
2/27/2020 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 2/27/2020 | |
2/12/2020 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 2/12/2020 | |
2/6/2020 | NOT - Notice | 2/10/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Michael Scott Powell Under Rule 702 | |||
2/5/2020 | ORD - Order | 2/5/2020 | |
NOTE: EXTENDING THE DEADLINES FOR PARTIES TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMORANDA FROM 02/06/2020-02/24/2020 | |||
2/5/2020 | NOT - Notice | 2/7/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Expert Witness | |||
2/4/2020 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 2/4/2020 | |
1/31/2020 | STP - Stipulation | 2/4/2020 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Submit Settlement Conference Memoranda | |||
1/30/2020 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 1/30/2020 | |
1/27/2020 | REL - Reply | 1/30/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant City's Reply in Support of its Motion for Trial by the Court AND Response to Motion for Advisory Jury in the Alternative | |||
1/17/2020 | 095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset | 1/17/2020 | |
1/15/2020 | MOT - Motion | 1/21/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Michael Scott Powell Under Rule 702 | |||
1/15/2020 | ORD - Order | 1/15/2020 | |
NOTE: Order | |||
1/10/2020 | NOT - Notice | 1/13/2020 | |
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Trial by the Court | |||
1/10/2020 | MOT - Motion | 1/14/2020 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Opinions of Michael Scott Powell Under Rule 702 | |||
12/30/2019 | RES - Response | 12/31/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant City's Motion for Trial by the Court and Motion for Advisory Jury in the Alternative | |||
12/11/2019 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 12/11/2019 | |
12/9/2019 | ORD - Order | 12/9/2019 | |
NOTE: RESETTING ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
12/4/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 12/4/2019 | |
12/3/2019 | MOT - Motion | 12/6/2019 | |
NOTE: Unopposed Motion to Reset Oral Argument | |||
12/3/2019 | NOT - Notice | 12/6/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Trial by the Court | |||
11/21/2019 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 11/21/2019 | |
11/20/2019 | MOT - Motion | 11/22/2019 | |
NOTE: Motion for Trial by the Court | |||
11/15/2019 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 11/15/2019 | |
11/8/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 11/8/2019 | |
11/7/2019 | ORD - Order | 11/7/2019 | |
NOTE: extending the deadline for the parties to conduct the settlement conference until February 28, 2020; and / referring this matter to the Court’s Alternative Dispute Resolution Office for conducting the settlement conference contemplated herein and under the Court’s October 1, 2019 Minute Entry | |||
11/4/2019 | MOT - Motion | 11/5/2019 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Conduct Settlement Conference and to Refer Case for Settlement Conference | |||
10/18/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/18/2019 | |
10/10/2019 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 10/10/2019 | |
10/10/2019 | REQ - Request | 10/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Request for Telephonic Status Conference | |||
9/20/2019 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/25/2019 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
9/18/2019 | 003 - ME: Hearing Reset | 9/18/2019 | |
8/30/2019 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 8/30/2019 | |
8/29/2019 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 8/29/2019 | |
7/2/2019 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 7/2/2019 | |
6/27/2019 | RES - Response | 6/28/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Strike | |||
6/21/2019 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 6/21/2019 | |
6/20/2019 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 6/20/2019 | |
6/18/2019 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 6/20/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Objections to Plaintiffs' Additional Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed With Their Reply | |||
6/18/2019 | MOT - Motion | 6/19/2019 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS’ ADDITIONAL SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED WITH THEIR REPLY | |||
6/7/2019 | REL - Reply | 6/10/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
6/7/2019 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 6/10/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Statement of Additional Facts and Plaintiffs' Additional Supplemental Statement of Facts | |||
6/7/2019 | REL - Reply | 6/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment No. 4 (All Counts: Lack of Standing) | |||
6/7/2019 | REL - Reply | 6/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment No. 1 (Count One: Gift Clause) | |||
6/7/2019 | REL - Reply | 6/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment No. 3 (Count Six: Slum Blight Designation) | |||
6/7/2019 | REL - Reply | 6/11/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment No. 2 (Count Four: Conveyance to Evade Taxation) | |||
5/17/2019 | RES - Response | 5/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Omnibus Separate Statement of Facts and Plaintiffs' Supplemental Statement of Facts | |||
5/17/2019 | RES - Response | 5/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
5/17/2019 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 5/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Controverting Statement of Facts and Additional Facts | |||
5/17/2019 | RES - Response | 5/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment No. 4 (Taxpayer Standing) | |||
5/17/2019 | RES - Response | 5/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant City's Motion for Summary Judgment No. 1 (Count One: Gift Clause) | |||
5/17/2019 | RES - Response | 5/21/2019 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CITY’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO. 3 (COUNT SIX: SLUM/BLIGHT DESIGNATION) | |||
5/17/2019 | RES - Response | 5/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant City's Motion for Summary Judgment No. 2 (Count Four: Conveyance to Evade Taxation)Count | |||
5/15/2019 | ORD - Order | 5/15/2019 | |
NOTE: expanding the page limit of the Citys response to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment to 20 pages, and expanding the page limit of Plaintiffs reply to 14 pages | |||
5/13/2019 | MOT - Motion | 5/14/2019 | |
NOTE: JOINT MOTION TO EXPAND PAGE LIMITS OF REMAINING BRIEFS FOR PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
4/12/2019 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 4/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
4/12/2019 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 4/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment | |||
4/12/2019 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 4/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment No. 3 (Count Six Slum/Blight Designation) | |||
4/12/2019 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 4/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment No. 2 (Count Four Conveyance to Evade Taxation) | |||
4/12/2019 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 4/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment No. 1 (Count One Gift Clause) | |||
4/12/2019 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 4/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment No. 4 (All Counts Lack of Standing) | |||
4/12/2019 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 4/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Omnibus Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment | |||
3/22/2019 | ORD - Order | 3/22/2019 | |
NOTE: modifying the current deadline for dipositive motions. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is hereby extended to April 12, 2019. The deadlines for filing responses remains May 17, 2019 and the deadline for filing replies remains June 7, 2019 | |||
3/20/2019 | MOT - Motion | 3/21/2019 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion for Extension of Dispositive Motion Deadline | |||
3/19/2019 | ORD - Order | 3/19/2019 | |
NOTE: modifying the current deadline for responses and replies to dispositive motions / continuing the telephonic Trial Setting Conference | |||
3/13/2019 | MOT - Motion | 3/15/2019 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion for Extension of Time | |||
2/21/2019 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 2/21/2019 | |
NOTE: SECOND AMENDED | |||
2/18/2019 | MOT - Motion | 2/19/2019 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion for Extension of Time | |||
10/10/2018 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 10/10/2018 | |
NOTE: AMENDING | |||
10/8/2018 | MTA - Motion To Amend | 10/9/2018 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order | |||
9/14/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/14/2018 | |
8/17/2018 | REL - Reply | 8/20/2018 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS NO. 7 (COUNT SIX: BLIGHT DESIGNATION) | |||
8/6/2018 | ORD - Order | 8/6/2018 | |
NOTE: GRANTING STIPULATION | |||
7/31/2018 | STP - Stipulation | 8/2/2018 | |
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant City of Phoenix's Reply in Support of its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 7 (Count Six: Blight Designation) | |||
7/26/2018 | RES - Response | 7/27/2018 | |
NOTE: Taxpayers' Response to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 7 (Count Six - Blight Designation) | |||
7/2/2018 | ORD - Order | 7/2/2018 | |
NOTE: Order that Plaintiffs’ Motion deadline to respond to Defendants’ Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 7 (Count Six: Blight Designation) is extended to July 27, 2018 | |||
6/27/2018 | MOT - Motion | 6/28/2018 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time | |||
6/22/2018 | MOT - Motion | 6/26/2018 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 7 (Count Six: Blight Designation) | |||
5/17/2018 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 5/17/2018 | |
NOTE: REVISED | |||
5/14/2018 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 5/15/2018 | |
NOTE: Parties' Revised Joint Report | |||
5/10/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/10/2018 | |
5/8/2018 | NOT - Notice | 5/10/2018 | |
4/17/2018 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel | 4/19/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Same Firm | |||
2/1/2018 | MOT - Motion | 2/2/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel | |||
1/10/2018 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 1/10/2018 | |
NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
12/19/2017 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 12/20/2017 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal of Plaintiff Culver Park - 120 East Willetta, LLC | |||
11/15/2017 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 11/15/2017 | |
11/3/2017 | RES - Response | 11/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendants Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment on Pleadings No. 6 Count 6 Blight Designation | |||
11/3/2017 | RES - Response | 11/6/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS NO. 1 (COUNT ONE: GIFT CLAUSE) | |||
11/3/2017 | RES - Response | 11/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendants Reply in Support of ITS Motion for Judgment on THE Pleadings No. 4 (Count FOUR: Conveyance to Evade Taxation) | |||
11/3/2017 | REL - Reply | 11/6/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS NO. 5 | |||
11/3/2017 | REL - Reply | 11/6/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS NO. 3 (COUNT THREE: SPECIAL LAWS CLAUSE) | |||
11/3/2017 | RES - Response | 11/6/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS NO. 2 (COUNT TWO: UNIFORMITY CLAUSE) | |||
10/24/2017 | REQ - Request | 10/24/2017 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX’S REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER FOR NOVEMBER 8, 2017 ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
10/20/2017 | RES - Response | 10/23/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 2 (Count Two: Uniformity Clause) | |||
10/20/2017 | RES - Response | 10/23/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 3 (Count Three: Special Laws Clause) | |||
10/20/2017 | RES - Response | 10/23/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 4 (Count Four: Conveyance to Evade Taxation) | |||
10/20/2017 | RES - Response | 10/23/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 6 (Count 6 - Blight Designation) | |||
10/20/2017 | RES - Response | 10/23/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 1 (Count One: Gift Clause) | |||
10/20/2017 | RES - Response | 10/23/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 5 (Count Five: Competitive Bidding) | |||
10/19/2017 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 10/19/2017 | |
10/13/2017 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 10/13/2017 | |
10/10/2017 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 10/10/2017 | |
10/4/2017 | MOT - Motion | 10/4/2017 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion to Stay Case Deadlines | |||
10/2/2017 | MOT - Motion | 10/3/2017 | |
NOTE: Joint Motion to Update Case Caption | |||
9/26/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/26/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 6 (Count Six: Blight Designation) | |||
9/20/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/21/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 3 (Count Three: Special Laws Clause) | |||
9/20/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/21/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 4 (Count Four: Conveyance to Evade Taxation) | |||
9/20/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/21/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 5 (Count Five: Competitive Bidding) | |||
9/20/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/21/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 2 (Count Two: Uniformity Clause) | |||
9/20/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/25/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings No. 1 | |||
7/11/2017 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 7/11/2017 | |
NOTE: Order | |||
6/22/2017 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 6/22/2017 | |
NOTE: Greg Stanton, Thelda Williams, Jim Waring, Debra Stark, Laura Pastor, Daniel Valenzuela, Sal DiCiccio, Michael Nowakowski, and Kate Gallego | |||
6/15/2017 | SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal | 6/16/2017 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendants Stanton, Williams, Waring, Stark, Pastor, Valenzuela, DiCiccio, Nowakowski, and Gallego | |||
6/14/2017 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 6/15/2017 | |
NOTE: Joint Report | |||
4/27/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 4/27/2017 | |
4/20/2017 | ANS - Answer | 4/21/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Amended Answer to Complaint | |||
4/18/2017 | ANS - Answer | 4/20/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS’ ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |||
4/18/2017 | NOT - Notice | 4/20/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Errata of Defendants' Amended Answer To Complaint | |||
3/28/2017 | ANS - Answer | 3/29/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendants' Answer to Complaint - Co-chg $237.00 Receipt # 25836550 | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: COUNCILMEMBER SAL DICICCIO | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: GREG STANTON | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: COUNCILMEMBER VICE MAYOR KATE GALLEGO | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: COUNCILMEMBER DEBRA STARK | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: COUNCILMEMEBER MICHAEL NOWAKOWSKI | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: COUNCILMEMBER JIM WARING | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: COUNCIL MEMBER THELDA WILLIAMS | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: COUNCILMEMBER DANIEL VALENZUELA | |||
3/13/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/17/2017 | |
NOTE: COUNCILMEMBER LAURA PASTOR | |||
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/13/2017 | SUM - Summons | 3/15/2017 | |
3/1/2017 | CSH - Coversheet | 3/2/2017 | |
3/1/2017 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/2/2017 | |
3/1/2017 | COM - Complaint | 3/2/2017 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/10/2017 | 10:30 | Status Conference |
11/8/2017 | 14:00 | Oral Argument |
4/13/2018 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
2/8/2019 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/3/2019 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/25/2019 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/18/2019 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
8/27/2019 | 13:30 | Oral Argument |
9/26/2019 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/1/2019 | 9:15 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/13/2019 | 9:15 | Status Conference |
2/7/2020 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
2/19/2020 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
2/20/2020 | 9:00 | Settlement Conference |
2/27/2020 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
2/27/2020 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
3/9/2020 | 9:00 | Settlement Conference |
4/20/2020 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/21/2020 | 9:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
5/21/2020 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
6/1/2020 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/2/2020 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/3/2020 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/4/2020 | 13:15 | Trial |
6/8/2020 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/9/2020 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/10/2020 | 9:30 | Trial |
6/11/2020 | 9:30 | Trial |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
8/17/2020 | F:Mat Englehorn | $3,574.46 | One Time | Costs | |
F:Hopelessly Urban L L C | |||||
F:Flying E, L L C | |||||
F:Bramley Paulin | |||||
F:Culver Park-1129 North First Street L L C | |||||
F:Austin Shea Arizona-7th Street And Van Buren L L C | |||||
A: Sal Diciccio | |||||
A: Michael Nowakowski | |||||
A: Kate Gallego | |||||
A: City Of Phoenix | |||||
8/17/2020 | F:Mat Englehorn | $50,000.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
F:Hopelessly Urban L L C | |||||
F:Flying E, L L C | |||||
F:Bramley Paulin | |||||
F:Culver Park-1129 North First Street L L C | |||||
F:Austin Shea Arizona-7th Street And Van Buren L L C | |||||
A: Sal Diciccio | |||||
A: Michael Nowakowski | |||||
A: Kate Gallego | |||||
A: City Of Phoenix |