Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2017-001200 | Judge: | Coury, Christopher |
File Date: | 1/31/2017 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Kenneth Fields | Plaintiff | Male | Colin Campbell |
Gerald Porter | Plaintiff | Male | Colin Campbell |
Elected Officials Retirement Plan, The | Defendant | Bennett Cooper | |
State Of Arizona | Defendant | Charles Grube |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
9/28/2020 | MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear | 9/30/2020 | |
NOTE: AFFIRMED | |||
9/28/2020 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 9/30/2020 | |
6/7/2019 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 6/10/2019 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
6/7/2019 | AIX - Appeals Index | 6/10/2019 | |
NOTE: AMENDED | |||
5/20/2019 | MEM - Memorandum | 5/21/2019 | |
10/2/2018 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 10/3/2018 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
10/2/2018 | AIX - Appeals Index | 10/3/2018 | |
NOTE: AMENDED ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
9/19/2018 | ANA - Amended Notice Of Appeal | 9/20/2018 | |
NOTE: Amended Notice of Appeal | |||
9/18/2018 | JUD - Judgment | 9/18/2018 | |
NOTE: REVISED FINAL | |||
9/14/2018 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/17/2018 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Objection to States Proposed Revised Final Judgment & Notice of Lodging Alternative Form of Judgment | |||
9/13/2018 | NOT - Notice | 9/14/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging of Proposed Revised Final Judgment | |||
9/10/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/10/2018 | |
9/4/2018 | REL - Reply | 9/6/2018 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Reply in Support of Motion to Vacate Injunction Pursuant to Rule 60(b) | |||
8/20/2018 | RES - Response | 8/22/2018 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO STATE’S MOTION TO VACATE INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO RULE 60(b) AND CROSSMOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER RULE 60(b) | |||
8/13/2018 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 8/15/2018 | |
7/30/2018 | MVJ - Motion To Vacate Judgment | 8/1/2018 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Motion to Vacate Injunction Pursuant to Rule 60(b) | |||
7/6/2018 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 7/9/2018 | |
4/11/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/11/2018 | |
4/2/2018 | MOT - Motion | 4/4/2018 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Motion for Stay of Judgment Pending Appellate Review | |||
3/22/2018 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 3/23/2018 | |
3/15/2018 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 3/16/2018 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMISSION RECEIPT | |||
3/15/2018 | AIX - Appeals Index | 3/16/2018 | |
NOTE: ELECTRONIC INDEX OF RECORD | |||
2/27/2018 | NOT - Notice | 2/28/2018 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Notice of Transcript Ordering | |||
2/23/2018 | NOT - Notice | 2/27/2018 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Notice of Intention Not to Order Additional Transcripts Designated by Plaintiffs | |||
2/21/2018 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel | 2/22/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Substitution of Counsel Within Firm | |||
2/21/2018 | NOT - Notice | 2/22/2018 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Designation of Additional Transcripts | |||
2/16/2018 | NOT - Notice | 2/20/2018 | |
NOTE: State of Arizona's Notice Regarding Transcript Order | |||
2/9/2018 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 2/12/2018 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal / CO-CHG $94.00 R#26406436 | |||
1/11/2018 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 1/11/2018 | |
12/21/2017 | REL - Reply | 12/21/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Motion for New Trial on Remedy | |||
12/12/2017 | NOT - Notice | 12/12/2017 | |
NOTE: State's Notice of Change of Address | |||
12/8/2017 | NOT - Notice | 12/11/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for New Trial on Remedy | |||
12/1/2017 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 12/1/2017 | |
11/27/2017 | RES - Response | 11/28/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendant Elected Officials' Retirement Plan's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for New Trial on Remedy | |||
11/27/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 11/28/2017 | |
NOTE: STATE'S OPPOSITION TO Plaintiffs' Motion for New Trial on Remedy | |||
11/14/2017 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 11/15/2017 | |
11/14/2017 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 11/15/2017 | |
11/6/2017 | MOT - Motion | 11/7/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for New Trial on Remedy | |||
10/25/2017 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 10/25/2017 | |
10/24/2017 | JUD - Judgment | 10/26/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
10/21/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/23/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ELECTED OFFICIALS’ RETIREMENT PLAN’S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS’ PROPOSED FINAL DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION | |||
10/20/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/23/2017 | |
NOTE: State's Objection to Proposed Judgment | |||
10/17/2017 | 016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted | 10/17/2017 | |
10/16/2017 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 10/17/2017 | |
10/13/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/13/2017 | |
10/12/2017 | NOT - Notice | 10/13/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of First Extension of Time to File Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Final Declaratory Judgment and Injunction | |||
10/11/2017 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 10/12/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
10/5/2017 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 10/5/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Proposed Final Declaratory Judgment and Injunction | |||
9/28/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/28/2017 | |
9/28/2017 | REL - Reply | 9/28/2017 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion that Court Treat the State of Arizona's Notice of Appeal as a Nullity and Rule on the Pending Attorneys' Fee Motion and Enter Judgment | |||
9/28/2017 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 9/29/2017 | |
NOTE: C2C TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT | |||
9/28/2017 | AIX - Appeals Index | 9/29/2017 | |
9/27/2017 | NOT - Notice | 9/28/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of State of ARizona's Request to Suspend Appeal | |||
9/27/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/27/2017 | |
NOTE: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Application for Attorneys' Fees by State of Arizona | |||
9/26/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/26/2017 | |
NOTE: Opposition to Plaitiffs' Motion To Treat Notice of Appeal as a Nullity, Etc., by State of Arizona | |||
9/22/2017 | NOT - Notice | 9/25/2017 | |
NOTE: Supplemental Brief Concerning Attorneys' Fees by State of Arizona | |||
9/22/2017 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 9/25/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing of Trial Transcript by State of Arizona | |||
9/22/2017 | NOT - Notice | 9/25/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Simultaneous Brief on the Availability of Attorneys' Fees | |||
9/19/2017 | ORD - Order | 9/22/2017 | |
NOTE: RE BRIEFING OF ATTORNEY FEE ISSUE | |||
9/14/2017 | STP - Stipulation | 9/15/2017 | |
NOTE: Stipulation re Briefing of Attorney Fee Issue | |||
9/13/2017 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 9/13/2017 | |
9/12/2017 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 9/13/2017 | |
NOTE: Supplement to Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs for Time Incurred After August 1, 2017 | |||
9/7/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/8/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion that Court Treat the State of Arizona's Notice of Appeal as a Nullity and Rule on the Pending Attorneys' Fees Motion and Enter Judgment | |||
9/7/2017 | NOT - Notice | 9/11/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Transcript Order by State of Arizona | |||
8/31/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 8/31/2017 | |
8/31/2017 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 9/1/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
8/28/2017 | REL - Reply | 8/30/2017 | |
NOTE: Reply Supporting Motion for Clarification of Injunction by State of Arizona | |||
8/25/2017 | REL - Reply | 8/28/2017 | |
NOTE: Reply to EORP's Response to Plaintiffs' Response to State of Arizona's Motion to Clarify | |||
8/23/2017 | RES - Response | 8/24/2017 | |
NOTE: Defendant Elected Officials' Retirement Plan's Response to Plaintiffs' Response to State of Arizona's Motion to Clarify | |||
8/23/2017 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 8/24/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appeal by State of Arizona/COCHARGE | |||
8/21/2017 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 8/23/2017 | |
NOTE: OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES BY STATE OF ARIZONA | |||
8/16/2017 | RES - Response | 8/17/2017 | |
NOTE: Response to State of Arizona's Motion to Clarify | |||
8/15/2017 | MOT - Motion | 8/16/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion for Clarification of Injunction by Sttae of Arizona | |||
8/7/2017 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 8/7/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs | |||
8/7/2017 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 8/11/2017 | |
7/24/2017 | 926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling | 7/24/2017 | |
7/19/2017 | NOT - Notice | 7/20/2017 | |
NOTE: Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by State Of Arizona | |||
7/12/2017 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 7/12/2017 | |
7/11/2017 | DPR - Deposition Report | 7/13/2017 | |
NOTE: JARED SMOUT 05/26/17 BY KELLY SUE OBLESBY | |||
7/11/2017 | DPR - Deposition Report | 7/13/2017 | |
NOTE: GABRIEL ROEDER SMITH & CO TESTIMONY OF JAMES ANDERS TELEPHONIC 06/26/2017 BY KELLY SUE OGESBY | |||
7/10/2017 | MOT - Motion | 7/10/2017 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT ELECTED OFFICIALS’ RETIREMENT PLAN’S MOTION RE TIMING OF JARED SMOUT’S TRIAL TESTIMONY | |||
7/6/2017 | STA - Statement | 7/7/2017 | |
NOTE: Joint Pretrial Statement | |||
7/3/2017 | NOT - Notice | 7/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits by State of Arizona | |||
6/29/2017 | REQ - Request | 6/30/2017 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW | |||
6/29/2017 | MEM - Memorandum | 6/30/2017 | |
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Trial Memorandum | |||
6/29/2017 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 6/30/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Proposed Final Declaratory Judgment and Injunction | |||
6/29/2017 | STA - Statement | 6/30/2017 | |
NOTE: Trial Brief by State of Arizona | |||
6/1/2017 | ANS - Answer | 6/5/2017 | |
NOTE: Answer of State of Arizona | |||
5/22/2017 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 5/22/2017 | |
5/17/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 5/17/2017 | |
5/4/2017 | RES - Response | 5/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Supplemental Response to State of Arizona's Motion to Dismiss | |||
5/4/2017 | STA - Statement | 5/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Supplemental Brief Supporting Motion to Dismiss by State of Arizona | |||
4/21/2017 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 4/21/2017 | |
4/21/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 4/21/2017 | |
4/17/2017 | REL - Reply | 4/19/2017 | |
NOTE: Reply Supporting Motion to Dismiss by State of Arizona | |||
4/12/2017 | STP - Stipulation | 4/13/2017 | |
NOTE: Stipulation re Class Allegations | |||
4/5/2017 | RES - Response | 4/6/2017 | |
NOTE: Response to State of Arizona's Motion to Dismiss | |||
3/17/2017 | ANS - Answer | 3/20/2017 | |
NOTE: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ELECTED OFFICIALS’ RETIREMENT PLAN / CO-CHARGE R# 25812754 | |||
3/17/2017 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 3/20/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss by State of Arizona | |||
3/13/2017 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 3/13/2017 | |
3/9/2017 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 3/10/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance for State of Arizona-CO CHG REC#25793906 | |||
2/22/2017 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 2/24/2017 | |
2/16/2017 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 2/22/2017 | |
2/15/2017 | MOT - Motion | 2/17/2017 | |
NOTE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REQUEST TO CONSOLIDATE TRIAL ON THE MERITS WITH PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING | |||
2/2/2017 | SUM - Summons | 2/7/2017 | |
2/2/2017 | SUM - Summons | 2/7/2017 | |
2/2/2017 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 2/2/2017 | |
2/2/2017 | NOT - Notice | 2/6/2017 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF CLAIM OF UNCONSTITUTIONALITY REGARDING LEGISLATIVE CHANGES TO A.R.S. § 38-810(C) | |||
2/2/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/8/2017 | |
NOTE: THE ELECTED OFFICIALS RETIREMENT PLAN | |||
2/2/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/8/2017 | |
NOTE: STATE OF ARIZONA | |||
1/31/2017 | COM - Complaint | 2/1/2017 | |
1/31/2017 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 2/1/2017 | |
1/31/2017 | CSH - Coversheet | 2/1/2017 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
3/8/2017 | 8:30 | Order To Show Cause |
3/10/2017 | 8:30 | Order To Show Cause |
5/16/2017 | 9:00 | Oral Argument |
7/11/2017 | 9:00 | Trial |
1/8/2018 | 15:00 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
9/18/2018 | F:Kenneth Fields | $1,899.00 | One Time | Costs | |
F:Gerald Porter | |||||
A: State Of Arizona | |||||
9/18/2018 | F:Kenneth Fields | $46,088.80 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
F:Gerald Porter | |||||
A: State Of Arizona | |||||
9/18/2018 | F:Kenneth Fields | $1,899.00 | One Time | Costs | |
F:Gerald Porter | |||||
A: State Of Arizona | |||||
9/18/2018 | F:Kenneth Fields | $46,088.80 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
F:Gerald Porter | |||||
A: State Of Arizona | |||||
10/24/2017 | F:Kenneth Fields | $1,899.00 | One Time | Costs | |
F:Gerald Porter | |||||
A: Elected Officials Retirement Plan, The | |||||
A: State Of Arizona | |||||
10/24/2017 | F:Kenneth Fields | $43,628.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
F:Gerald Porter | |||||
A: Elected Officials Retirement Plan, The | |||||
A: State Of Arizona |