« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2016-091384 Judge: Kiley, Daniel
File Date: 1/15/2016 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Dream Steam L L C   Plaintiff    Sean Berberian 
John Doe   Defendant  Unknown  Daniel Warner 
Verde Dispensary Inc   Plaintiff    Pro Per 
O.Pen Vape L L C   Defendant    DOUGLAS ALLSWORTH 
A Z Open L L C   Defendant    Daniel Warner 
Catalina Hills Botanical Care Inc   Defendant    Daniel Warner 
Organa Labs   Defendant    DOUGLAS ALLSWORTH 
Steve Cottrell   Defendant  Male  Daniel Warner 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/23/2019  047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal  7/23/2019   
5/9/2019  375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar  5/9/2019   
11/6/2018  ORD - Order  11/6/2018   
NOTE: PROTECTIVE 
10/30/2018  MOT - Motion  10/31/2018   
NOTE: Joint Motion for Protective Order 
9/24/2018  005 - ME: Hearing  9/24/2018   
7/23/2018  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  7/23/2018   
7/12/2018  REL - Reply  7/16/2018   
NOTE: Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss 
7/6/2018  RES - Response  7/10/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
6/14/2018  NOT - Notice  6/18/2018   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS. 
6/7/2018  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  6/7/2018   
NOTE: ORDER RE: AZ OPEN, LLC AND CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE, INC.’S EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
6/7/2018  ANS - Answer  6/8/2018   
NOTE: Answer to Third Amended Complaint 
6/7/2018  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  6/8/2018   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
5/30/2018  NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney  6/1/2018   
NOTE: AZ OPEN, LLC AND CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE, INC.’S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 
5/15/2018  REP - Report  5/17/2018   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Report Regarding Status of Settlement Discussions 
4/10/2018  ORD - Order  4/10/2018   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR AZ OPEN, LLC, CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE, INC. AND STEVE COTTRELL TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING 
4/3/2018  STP - Stipulation  4/5/2018   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR AZ OPEN, LLC, CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE, INC., AND STEVE COTTRELL TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING 
3/9/2018  AMC - Amended Complaint  3/13/2018   
NOTE: Third Amended Complaint 
3/9/2018  NOT - Notice  3/13/2018   
NOTE: Notice of Change in Firm Name and Address 
2/21/2018  ORD - Order  2/21/2018   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR AZ OPEN, LLC AND CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE, INC. TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING 
2/14/2018  STP - Stipulation  2/15/2018   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEADLINE FOR AZ OPEN, LLC AND CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE, INC. TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING 
2/1/2018  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  2/1/2018   
1/29/2018  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  1/29/2018   
11/22/2017  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/22/2017   
11/17/2017  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset  11/17/2017   
9/22/2017  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  9/22/2017   
9/5/2017  REL - Reply  9/7/2017   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement 
8/24/2017  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  8/24/2017   
8/21/2017  RES - Response  8/23/2017   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS DREAM STEAM AND VERDE DISPENSARY’S RESPONSE TO NATIONAL CONCESSIONS GROUP’S MOTION TO DISMISS 
8/14/2017  ORD - Order  8/14/2017   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR AZ OPEN, LLC AND CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE, INC. TO ANSWER DREAM STEAM, LLC AND VERDE DISPENSARY, INC.’S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 
8/9/2017  STP - Stipulation  8/10/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline for AZ Open, LLC and Catalina Hills Botanical Care, Inc. to Answer Dream Steam, LLC and Verde Dispensary, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint 
8/7/2017  ORD - Order  8/7/2017   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES 
8/1/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  8/3/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement 
7/31/2017  STP - Stipulation  8/1/2017   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Certain Pretrial Deadlines 
7/20/2017  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  7/21/2017   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service 
7/14/2017  AMC - Amended Complaint  7/17/2017   
NOTE: Second Amended Complaint 
7/11/2017  REL - Reply  7/12/2017   
NOTE: Defendants AZ Open, LLC and Catalina Hills Botanical Care, Inc.'s Joinder in Defendants Steve Cottrell and Jane Doe Cottrell's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss 
7/7/2017  ORD - Order  7/7/2017   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO (1) ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (2) SUSPEND BRIEFING ON THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFENDANTS O.PEN VAPE, LLC AND ORGANA LABS 
7/3/2017  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  7/3/2017   
7/3/2017  PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order  7/3/2017   
NOTE: Order 
6/30/2017  STP - Stipulation  7/5/2017   
NOTE: STIPULATION TO: (1) ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND (2) SUSPEND BRIEFING ON THE MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFENDANTS O.PEN VAPE, LLC AND ORGANA LABS 
6/29/2017  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel  6/29/2017   
NOTE: Order 
6/29/2017  NOT - Notice  6/30/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Association of Counsel 
6/23/2017  REL - Reply  6/26/2017   
NOTE: Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss 
6/22/2017  MOT - Motion  6/22/2017   
NOTE: DEFENDANTS AZ OPEN, LLC AND CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE, INC.’S EX PARTE MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT 
6/16/2017  PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application  6/20/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice 
6/13/2017  NOT - Notice  6/14/2017   
NOTE: NOTICE OF FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS O.PEN VAPE, LLC AND ORGANA LABS’ MOTION TO DISMISS 
6/13/2017  RES - Response  6/15/2017   
NOTE: DREAM STEAM, LLC AND VERDE DISPENSARY, INC.’S RESPONSE TO: (1) STEVE COTTRELL’S MOTION TO DISMISS AND (2) AZ OPEN, LLC AND CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE, INC.’S JOINDER IN STEVE COTTRELL’S MOTION TO DISMISS 
6/6/2017  ORD - Order  6/6/2017   
NOTE: EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND 
5/30/2017  STP - Stipulation  6/1/2017   
NOTE: STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS STEVE COTTRELL AND JANE DOE COTTRELL’S MOTION TO DISMISS 
5/25/2017  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  5/25/2017   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
5/24/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  5/25/2017   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for a More Definite Statement 
5/16/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/19/2017   
NOTE: O. PEN VAPE, LLC 
5/16/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/19/2017   
NOTE: ORGANA LABS 
5/10/2017  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  5/11/2017   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
5/10/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  5/11/2017   
NOTE: Joinder in Motion to Dismiss 
5/10/2017  ANS - Answer  5/12/2017   
NOTE: Answer to First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial 
5/9/2017  ANS - Answer  5/10/2017   
NOTE: Answer to First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial 
5/9/2017  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  5/10/2017   
NOTE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 
4/21/2017  SUM - Summons  4/25/2017   
4/21/2017  SUM - Summons  4/25/2017   
4/21/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/26/2017   
NOTE: CATALINA HILLS BOTANICAL CARE INC 
4/21/2017  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/26/2017   
NOTE: AZ OPEN LLC 
4/4/2017  AMC - Amended Complaint  4/6/2017   
NOTE: First Amended Complaint 
2/28/2017  029 - ME: Status Conference  2/28/2017   
1/24/2017  019 - ME: Ruling  1/24/2017   
1/9/2017  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  1/9/2017   
12/27/2016  019 - ME: Ruling  12/27/2016   
9/23/2016  MEM - Memorandum  9/23/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANT DOE’S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DOE’S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS 
9/23/2016  STA - Statement  9/26/2016   
NOTE: DREAM STEAM’S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH 
9/12/2016  029 - ME: Status Conference  9/12/2016   
9/6/2016  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  9/6/2016   
8/2/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  8/3/2016   
NOTE: ORDER RE: SPECIAL ACTION 
8/2/2016  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  8/3/2016   
6/27/2016  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  6/28/2016   
NOTE: ORDER RE: SPECIAL ACTION 
6/8/2016  060 - ME: Case Transfer Cc  6/8/2016   
4/11/2016  022 - ME: Order Signed  4/11/2016   
4/8/2016  ORD - Order  4/12/2016   
NOTE: GRANTING DEFENDANT DOES EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS 
4/7/2016  RES - Response  4/7/2016   
NOTE: Dream Steam's Preliminary Response to Defendant's Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings 
4/7/2016  REL - Reply  4/8/2016   
NOTE: Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Doe's Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings 
4/6/2016  MOT - Motion  4/6/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANT Doe's Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings 
4/6/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  4/6/2016   
3/28/2016  REL - Reply  3/28/2016   
NOTE: DEFENDANT DOE’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS 
3/16/2016  RES - Response  3/17/2016   
NOTE: DREAM STEAM Response To Motion to Quash Subpoenas 
2/26/2016  MTQ - Motion To Quash  2/26/2016   
NOTE: Defendant Doe's Motion to Quash Subpoenas 
2/25/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  2/25/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
2/25/2016  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  2/25/2016   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
1/15/2016  COM - Complaint  1/19/2016   
1/15/2016  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  1/19/2016   
1/15/2016  CSH - Coversheet  1/19/2016   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/9/2016  11:00  Status Conference 
1/19/2017  9:00  Status Conference 
1/20/2017  10:00  Status Conference 
2/22/2017  11:00  Status Conference 
8/24/2017  9:00  Oral Argument 
11/8/2017  10:30  Oral Argument 
1/26/2018  13:30  Oral Argument 
9/21/2018  14:00  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center