« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2016-053784 Judge: Brnovich, Susan
File Date: 6/24/2016 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Larry Goldman   Plaintiff  Male  Dustin Vidrine 
U S Collections West   Defendant    Alan Zimmerman 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/16/2016  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  12/16/2016   
NOTE: ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice 
11/30/2016  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  11/30/2016   
11/1/2016  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  11/1/2016   
10/4/2016  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  10/4/2016   
8/31/2016  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  8/31/2016   
8/19/2016  REL - Reply  8/22/2016   
NOTE: Reply in support of Motion to dismiss PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS  
8/9/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  8/10/2016   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)6 AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO ARS 12-349 
7/26/2016  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  7/26/2016   
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
7/22/2016  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  7/25/2016   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
7/22/2016  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  7/25/2016   
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO ARS 12-349 
7/8/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/15/2016   
NOTE: US COLLECTIONS WEST 
6/24/2016  COM - Complaint  6/28/2016   
6/24/2016  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  6/28/2016   
6/24/2016  CSH - Coversheet  6/28/2016   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/30/2016  10:00  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center