Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2016-006985 Judge: Brodman, Roger
File Date: 6/9/2016 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Advocates For Individuals With Disabilities Foundation Inc   Plaintiff    Peter Strojnik 
Crismon & Baseline L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
Walh L L C   Defendant    Pro Per 
O M P C Unit Owners Assocation   Defendant    Pro Per 
State Of Arizona   Intervenor    Matthew Du Mee 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/26/2016  CME - Credit Memo  9/26/2016   
NOTE: Credit Memo 
9/19/2016  MCD - Motion To Consolidate  9/21/2016   
NOTE: State of Arizona's Motion to Consolidate Cases for Limited Purposes, Set a Scheduling Conference, Allow Leave to Serve by Other Means and Request For Expedited Consideration 
8/12/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/19/2016   
NOTE: OMPC UNIT OWNERS ASSOCIATION 
8/12/2016  SUM - Summons  8/16/2016   
NOTE: ALIAS 
8/2/2016  AMC - Amended Complaint  8/3/2016   
NOTE: FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT 
7/5/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/12/2016   
NOTE: CRISMON & BASELINE LLC AND WAHL LLC 
7/5/2016  SUM - Summons  7/7/2016   
6/9/2016  COM - Complaint  6/13/2016   
6/9/2016  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  6/13/2016   
6/9/2016  CSH - Coversheet  6/13/2016   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file